This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2018 at 08:02:42 (UTC).

Ingebretsen v. Tempe, City of et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2018 Ingebretsen filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Tempe, City of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are G Murray Snow and Eileen S Willett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02616

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

G Murray Snow

Referral Judge

Eileen S Willett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brett Ingebretsen

Defendants

Heith Fink

Sylvia Moir

Andrew Brooks

Unknown Allison

Unknown Brooks

Unknown Parties

Unknown Palmaioli

Tempe, City of

Lena Palmaioli

Unknown Fink

Unknown Moir

Brandon Allison

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Adrian Hutzler

Attorney at Canton Injury Lawyers PLC

2 Renaissance, 40 N Central Ave., Ste. 2320

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Robert Niederbaumer

Attorney at Tempe City Attorneys Office

P.O. Box 5002

Tempe, AZ 85280

Judith R Baumann

Attorney at Tempe City Attorneys Office

P.O. Box 5002

Tempe, AZ 85280

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (REK) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#27

(#27) ORDER: Plaintiff must either serve each Defendant or seek a waiver of service for each Defendant. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Amended Complaint on a Defendant within days of the filing of the Complaint, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. Defendants must answer the Amended Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. An answer or response must state the specific Defendant by name on whose behalf it is filed. The Court may strike any answer, response, or other motion or paper that does not identify the specific Defendant by name on whose behalf it is filed. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure and to the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot pursuant to General Order 17-08. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/09/2018. (REK) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#26

(#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants filed by Brett Ingebretsen.(Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#25

(#25) Tempe Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Andrew Brooks, Unknown Brooks, Heith Fink, Unknown Fink, Sylvia Moir, Unknown Moir, Lena Palmaioli, Unknown Palmaioli, Tempe, City of.(Niederbaumer, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#24

(#24) *Plaintiff's NOTICE Regarding 28 U.S.C. 1915(h) re: #22 Order by Brett Ingebretsen . (Hutzler, Jason) *Modified text and added document link on 10/3/2018 (REK). (Entered: 10/02/2018)

23 #1

Exhibit FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Brett Ingebretsen . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)(Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#22

(#22) ORDER: Within 7 days of the filing date of this Order, Plaintiff must submit a notice to the Court stating whether he was a prisoner within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1915(h) at the time he filed the Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/27/18. (EJA) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

21 #5

Summons

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Submitted by Brett Ingebretsen. (Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Submitted by Brett Ingebretsen. (Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Submitted by Brett Ingebretsen. (Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Submitted by Brett Ingebretsen. (Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Submitted by Brett Ingebretsen. (Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#5

(#5) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Brett Ingebretsen. (Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15859330. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-02616-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#1

(#25) Tempe Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Andrew Brooks, Unknown Brooks, Heith Fink, Unknown Fink, Sylvia Moir, Unknown Moir, Lena Palmaioli, Unknown Palmaioli, Tempe, City of.(Niederbaumer, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (REK) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER: Plaintiff must either serve each Defendant or seek a waiver of service for each Defendant. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Amended Complaint on a Defendant within days of the filing of the Complaint, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. Defendants must answer the Amended Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. An answer or response must state the specific Defendant by name on whose behalf it is filed. The Court may strike any answer, response, or other motion or paper that does not identify the specific Defendant by name on whose behalf it is filed. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure and to the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot pursuant to General Order 17-08. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/09/2018. (REK) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants filed by Brett Ingebretsen.(Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Tempe Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Andrew Brooks, Unknown Brooks, Heith Fink, Unknown Fink, Sylvia Moir, Unknown Moir, Lena Palmaioli, Unknown Palmaioli, Tempe, City of.(Niederbaumer, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) *Plaintiff's NOTICE Regarding 28 U.S.C. 1915(h) re: #22 Order by Brett Ingebretsen . (Hutzler, Jason) *Modified text and added document link on 10/3/2018 (REK). (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Brett Ingebretsen . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)(Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER: Within 7 days of the filing date of this Order, Plaintiff must submit a notice to the Court stating whether he was a prisoner within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1915(h) at the time he filed the Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/27/18. (EJA) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Summons Issued as to Brandon Allison, Unknown Allison, Andrew Brooks, Unknown Brooks, Heith Fink, Unknown Fink, Sylvia Moir, Unknown Moir, Lena Palmaioli, Unknown Palmaioli, Tempe, City of. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(JJH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SUMMONS Submitted by Brett Ingebretsen. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (MCO) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Submitted by Brett Ingebretsen. (Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Submitted by Brett Ingebretsen. (Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Submitted by Brett Ingebretsen. (Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Submitted by Brett Ingebretsen. (Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Submitted by Brett Ingebretsen. (Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Brett Ingebretsen. (Hutzler, Jason) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Brett Ingebretsen. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15859330. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-02616-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15859330 filed by Brett Ingebretsen. (Hutzler, Jason) (MCO) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.