This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Infineum USA L.P. v. Chevron Oronite Company LLC

Case Summary

On 02/27/2018 Infineum USA L P filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Chevron Oronite Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leonard P. Stark and Christopher J. Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00323

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

Referral Judge

Christopher J. Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Infineum USA L.P.

Defendant

Chevron Oronite Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Viceconte

Attorney at Gibbons P.C.

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1050

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christopher H. Strate

David E. De Lorenzi

Christine A. Gaddis

Defendant Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Stephen J. Kraftschik

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Naveen Modi, Michael A. Wolfe, Daniel Zeilberger, and Scott F. Peachman - filed by Chevron Oronite Company LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

#14

(#14) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Chevron Oronite Company LLC filed by Chevron Oronite Company LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

#13

(#13) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Chevron Oronite Company LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/4/2018. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Chevron Oronite Company LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

11 #1

Certification

10 #1

Certification

#10

SO ORDERED D.I. #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David E. De Lorenzi filed by Infineum USA L.P., D.I. #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christine A. Gaddis filed by Infineum USA L.P.,and D.I. #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher H. Strate filed by Infineum USA L.P. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/21/2018. (dlb) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

9 #1

Certification

#9

SO ORDERED D.I. #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David E. De Lorenzi filed by Infineum USA L.P., D.I. #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christine A. Gaddis filed by Infineum USA L.P.,and D.I. #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher H. Strate filed by Infineum USA L.P. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/21/2018. (dlb) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

#7

SO ORDERED D.I. #7 Proposed Procedures Order filed by Infineum USA L.P.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/13/2018. (dlb) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chevron Oronite Company LLC on February 28, 2018, filed by Infineum USA L.P.. (Viceconte, Christopher) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Exxon Mobil Corp., Corporate Parent Shell Oil Co., Corporate Parent Infineum International Limited for Infineum USA L.P. filed by Infineum USA L.P. (crb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,723,685 B2. (crb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Chevron Oronite Company LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2331630.) - filed by Infineum USA L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2018
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher H. Strate for Infineum USA L.P. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion referred to Christopher J. Burke.(dlb) (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Naveen Modi, Michael A. Wolfe, Daniel Zeilberger, and Scott F. Peachman - filed by Chevron Oronite Company LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Chevron Oronite Company LLC filed by Chevron Oronite Company LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Chevron Oronite Company LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/4/2018. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Chevron Oronite Company LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney David E. De Lorenzi for Infineum USA L.P. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christine A. Gaddis for Infineum USA L.P. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED D.I. #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David E. De Lorenzi filed by Infineum USA L.P., D.I. #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christine A. Gaddis filed by Infineum USA L.P.,and D.I. #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher H. Strate filed by Infineum USA L.P. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/21/2018. (dlb) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christine A. Gaddis - filed by Infineum USA L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Viceconte, Christopher) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED D.I. #7 Proposed Procedures Order filed by Infineum USA L.P.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/13/2018. (dlb) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED ORDER Procedures Order re 6 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, by Infineum USA L.P.. (Viceconte, Christopher) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • (#6) ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/9/18. (ntl) (Entered: 03/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chevron Oronite Company LLC on February 28, 2018, filed by Infineum USA L.P.. (Viceconte, Christopher) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Chevron Oronite Company LLC on 2/27/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Exxon Mobil Corp., Corporate Parent Shell Oil Co., Corporate Parent Infineum International Limited for Infineum USA L.P. filed by Infineum USA L.P. (crb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,723,685 B2. (crb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Chevron Oronite Company LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2331630.) - filed by Infineum USA L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chevron Oronite Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen J. Kraftschik

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack B. Blumenfeld