This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2018 at 07:42:02 (UTC).

Industrial Packaging Supplies, Inc. v. Channell et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 Industrial Packaging Supplies, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Channell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M Cain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-02544

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Industrial Packaging Supplies Inc

Defendants

Axis Packaging LLC

Matthew Channell

John England

Davidson Brothers Equity LLC

DBE Solutions LLC

Geordy Davidson

Christina Davidson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Giles M Schanen, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough

Po Box 10084

Greenville, SC 29603-0084

Stephen W. Heil

Attorney at Cray Huber Horstman Heil & VanAusdal LLC

303 West Madison Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

Nicholas Sean Graber

Attorney at Cray Huber Horstman Heil & Vanausdal Llc

303 W. Madison St. Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

William H Foster, III

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC (GVL)

220 N Main Street, Suite 500

Greenville, SC 29601

Defendant Attorneys

Peter James Gillespie

Attorney at Laner Muchin, Ltd.

515 N. State Street, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

James J. Convery

Attorney at Laner Muchin, Ltd.

515 North State Street, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654-4688

Kurt Matthew Rozelsky

Attorney at Smith Moore Leatherwood LLP

2 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Greenville, SC 29601

Emily Irene Bridges

Attorney at Smith Moore Leatherwood LLP

2 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Greenville, SC 29601

Steven Edward Buckingham

Attorney at The Law Office of Steven Edward Buckingham

16 Wellington Avenue

Greenville, SC 29609

Brian P Murphy

Attorney at Stephenson and Murphy

207 Whitsett Street

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

#91

#90

#89

86 #2

Exhibit Gillespie Declaration

86 #1

Exhibit Convery Declaration

#86

#84

#83

#81

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Affidavit

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Steven Edward Buckingham for December 12-31, 2018. (kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 4/10/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/18/18. (kmca) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/7/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/21/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 11/21/2018, ADR/Mediation Statement due by 11/21/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/2/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/1/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/4/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/4/2019, Discovery due by 4/3/2019, Motions due by 4/17/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/5/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 8/5/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/18/18. (kmca) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) TEXT ORDER granting #86 Consent Motion to Substitute Attorney. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/3/18.(kmca) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Matthew Channell. Response to Motion due by 10/17/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Convery Declaration, #2 Exhibit Gillespie Declaration)No proposed order.(Buckingham, Steven) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Matthew Channell.(Buckingham, Steven) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Edward Buckingham on behalf of Matthew Channell (Buckingham, Steven) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Christina Davidson, Davidson Brothers Equity LLC.(Murphy, Brian) (Main Document 81 replaced on 9/28/2018: to replace with corrected document as provided by filing user) (kmca). (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Industrial Packaging Supplies Inc.(Foster, William) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Axis Packaging LLC, DBE Solutions LLC, Geordy Davidson, John England.(Rozelsky, Kurt) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM by Industrial Packaging Supplies, Inc. in support of motion to expedite #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - I)(Heil, Stephen) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by Plaintiff Industrial Packaging Supplies, Inc. to expedite Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heil, Stephen) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM by Industrial Packaging Supplies, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heil, Stephen) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Industrial Packaging Supplies, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Heil, Stephen) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Axis Packaging, LLC, Matthew Channell (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Daniel G. Martin. (meg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Industrial Packaging Supplies, Inc. by Stephen W. Heil (Heil, Stephen) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Heil, Stephen) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Industrial Packaging Supplies, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13983589. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Affidavit)(Heil, Stephen) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen W. Heil

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Giles M Schanen, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William H Foster, III