This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2019 at 08:11:07 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cynthia Reed Eddy and Marilyn J. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01522

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cynthia Reed Eddy

Presiding Judge

Marilyn J. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Counter Defendants, Cross Defendants and Counter Claimants

IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC

AMHERST MADISON, INC

JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC.

Defendants, Counter Defendants, Cross Defendants and Counter Claimants

AMHERST MADISON, INC

JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC.

Defendant, Counter Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant

JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant, Cross Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Eugene J. Mattioni

Attorney at Mattioni, Ltd.

Federal Reserve Bank Building, 100 N. Independence Mall West, Suite 5A Nw

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Stephen J. Galati

Attorney at Mattioni, Ltd.

Federal Reserve Bank Building, 100 N. Independence Mall, Suite 5A Nw

Philadelphia, PA 19106

David M. McQuiston

Attorney at Thomson, Rhodes & Cowie

1010 Two Chatham Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Christopher D Kuebler

Attorney at Ray Robinson Law Co., LPA

6100 Oak Tree Blvd., Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44131

Sandra M. Kelly

Attorney at Ray Robinson Law Co., LPA

6100 Oak Tree Blvd., Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44131

Counter Defendant, Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

David M. McQuiston

Attorney at Thomson, Rhodes & Cowie

1010 Two Chatham Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Christopher D Kuebler

Attorney at Ray Robinson Law Co., LPA

6100 Oak Tree Blvd., Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44131

Sandra M. Kelly

Attorney at Ray Robinson Law Co., LPA

6100 Oak Tree Blvd., Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44131

Counter Defendant, Counter Claimant, Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Christopher D Kuebler

Attorney at Ray Robinson Law Co., LPA

6100 Oak Tree Blvd., Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44131

Sandra M. Kelly

Attorney at Ray Robinson Law Co., LPA

6100 Oak Tree Blvd., Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44131

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Summons

#17

(#17) Summons Issued as to AMHERST MADISON, INC, JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (sdp) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

16 #5

Summons Amherst Madison, Inc.

16 #4

Summons Murray American Transportation, Inc.

16 #3

Summons John's Towing Services, Inc.

16 #2

Summons Gulf Material, LLC

16 #1

Summons Campbell Transportation Company, Inc.

#16

(#16) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Campbell Transportation Company, Inc., #2 Summons Gulf Material, LLC, #3 Summons John's Towing Services, Inc., #4 Summons Murray American Transportation, Inc., #5 Summons Amherst Madison, Inc.) (Mattioni, Eugene) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#15

(#15) Imperial River Transport's ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, of John's Towing Service, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC. by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (Galati, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra M. Kelly on behalf of JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC.. (Kelly, Sandra ) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER: Should Plaintiff seek to have this court enter the Order at ECF No. 1-4, it shall file a separate motion in accordance with local rules by December 6, 2018. It is further ORDERED that Imperial River Transport, LLC shall file a separate motion and proposed order for leave to deposit money with the Clerk of Court in accordance with Rule F.(1) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, 46 U.S.C. 30501, et seq., Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 67 and Western District of Pennsylvania Local Rule LCvR 67.2.C. by December 6, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/3/2018. (ajt) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/16/2018. (sms) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Proposed Order

1 #3

Stipulation for value

1 #2

Affidavit regarding pending freight

1 #1

Affidavit regarding value

#1

(#11) Respondent John's Towing Service, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC, AMHERST MADISON, INC, COUNTERCLAIM against IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC, AMHERST MADISON, INC by JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC.. (Kuebler, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Summons Issued as to AMHERST MADISON, INC, JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (sdp) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Campbell Transportation Company, Inc., #2 Summons Gulf Material, LLC, #3 Summons John's Towing Services, Inc., #4 Summons Murray American Transportation, Inc., #5 Summons Amherst Madison, Inc.) (Mattioni, Eugene) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Imperial River Transport's ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, of John's Towing Service, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC. by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (Galati, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Notice issued. (sdp) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM LIMITATION OF LIABILITY by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC re #12 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, (Mattioni, Eugene) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER (1) APPROVING FILING OF AD INTERIM STIPULATION FOR VALUE AND LETTER OF UNDERTAKING, (2) DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF REQUIRED NOTICE AND (3) ISSUANCE OF INJUNCTION, granting #6 Motion to Approve Filing of Ad Interim Stipulation for Limitation Fund and granting #7 Motion to Approve the Order Setting Deadline to File Claims, Approving Publication and Service of Notice to Claimants, and Restraining Filing of Prosecution of Certain Claims. Notice to be published for four consecutive weeks prior to February 1, 2019, the date fixed for filing of claims. Further details as indicated in Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/17/18. (rtw) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Respondent John's Towing Service, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC, AMHERST MADISON, INC, COUNTERCLAIM against IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC, AMHERST MADISON, INC by JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC.. (Kuebler, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion to set deadline,, filed by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (sdp) (sdp) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BRIEF in Support re #6 Motion to approve filing, filed by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (sdp) Modified text on 12/7/2018. (sdp) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, #6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in support. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D Kuebler on behalf of JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC.. (Kuebler, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Approve the Order Setting Deadline to File Claims, Approving Publication and Service of Notice to Claimants, and Restraining Filing of Prosecution of Certain Claims by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Petitioner's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Set Deadline to File Claims, Approve Publication and Service of Notice to Claimants, and Restraining Filing or Prosecution of Certain Actions, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order Setting Deadline to File Claims, Approving Publication and Service of Notice to Claimants, and Restraining Filing or Prosecution of Certain Actions) (Mattioni, Eugene) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Approve Filing of Ad Interim Stipulation for Value for Limitation Fund and Costs, by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Petitioner's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Approve Filing of Ad Interim Stipulation for Value for Limitation Fund and Costs, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order Approving Filing of Ad Interim Stipulation For Limitation Fund and Costs) (Mattioni, Eugene) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. McQuiston on behalf of AMHERST MADISON, INC. (McQuiston, David) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra M. Kelly on behalf of JOHN'S TOWING SERVICE, INC.. (Kelly, Sandra ) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: Should Plaintiff seek to have this court enter the Order at ECF No. 1-4, it shall file a separate motion in accordance with local rules by December 6, 2018. It is further ORDERED that Imperial River Transport, LLC shall file a separate motion and proposed order for leave to deposit money with the Clerk of Court in accordance with Rule F.(1) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, 46 U.S.C. 30501, et seq., Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 67 and Western District of Pennsylvania Local Rule LCvR 67.2.C. by December 6, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/3/2018. (ajt) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Judge Marilyn J. Horan presiding and Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy referred. (nll) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy no longer presiding in case. (nll) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/16/2018. (sms) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-4930944), filed by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit regarding value, #2 Affidavit regarding pending freight, #3 Stipulation for value, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less