This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2022 at 20:56:45 (UTC).

In Re Wells Fargo Collateral Protection Insurance Litigation

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 In Re Wells Fargo Collateral Protection Insurance Litigation was filed as an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew J. Guilford and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:17-ML-02797

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew J. Guilford

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Interested Parties

Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs

Gene Conklin

Bryan Tidwell

Keith Preston

Gregory Smith

Caroline Miller

Brandon Haag

Dee Lenz

Brian Miller

James Layne

Odis Cole

Blaine Boone

Robert Neal

Burl Howard

Consolidated Plaintiff

Tianna Membreno

Defendants and In Re

Wells Fargo Auto Insurance Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation

Liaison Counsel for Defendants

NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION

National General Insurance Company

Wells Fargo and Company

Intervenor and Plaintiff

Dee Lenz

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gretchen Freeman Cappio

1201 Third Avenue Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Derek W Loeser

1201 Third Avenue Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Lynn L Sarko

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1201 Third Avenue Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Craig L Briskin

Attorney at Mehri and Skalet PLLC

1250 Connecticut Avenue Nw Suite 300

Wasington, DC 20036

Jeffrey L Koenig

Attorney at Hecht Kleeger and Damashek pc

19 West 44Th Street Suite 1500

New York, NY 10036

Charles E Schaffer

510 Walnut Street Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 91906

Franklin D Azar

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014

Paul R Wood

Attorney at Franklin D Azar and Associates PC

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014

Roman M Silberfeld

Attorney at Robins Kaplan L.L.P.

2049 Century Park East Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3208

Jennifer L Joost

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer and Check LLP

One Sansome Street Suite 1850

San Francisco, CA 94104

Peter A Muhic

Attorney at LEVAN LAW GROUP, LLC

One Logan Square -- 27Th Floor, 18Th & Cherry Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Macy D Hanson

Attorney at The Law Office of Macy D Hanson PLLC

102 First Choice Drive

Madison, MS 39110

Intervenor Attorney

Eamon O'Kelly

Attorney at Dewey Ballantine

1301 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6092

Other Attorneys

Jeremy Keith Robinson

Attorney at Casey Gerry Schenk Francavilla Blatt and Penfield LLP

110 Laurel Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Curt D Marshall

Attorney at Weltz and Luxenberg PC

700 Broadway

New York, NY 10003

Christopher D Jennings

Attorney at Johnson Vines PLLC

2226 Cottondale Lane Suite 210

Little Rock, AR 72202

Jack Atnip, III

Attorney at Hellmuth and Johnson PLLC

8050 West 78Th Street

Edina, MN 55439

Charles Lance Gould

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis and Miles PC

Po Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103

Jeffrey J Chapman

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1345 Avenue Of The Americas 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10105-0106

Gayle M Blatt

Attorney at Casey Gerry Schenk Francavilla Blatt and Penfield LLP

110 Laurel Street

San Diego, CA 92101

87 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#347

(#347) [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER DENYING COURT ORDERED MEDIATION by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court has reviewed the request and responses. The Court finds it is not proper to order mediation, "no-cost" or otherwise. Objectors Varallos' motion is DENIED. (See order.) (es) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#346

(#346) JOINDER filed by Defendants National General Holdings Corp, National General Insurance Company joining in Response, #345 . (Worcester, Richard) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#345

(#345) RESPONSE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo & Companyto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #343 Defendants Wells Fargo & Company And Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., D/B/A Wells Fargo Dealer Services Response Regarding Courts Order Re Motion For Court Ord Red Mediation [DKT No. 343] (Powell, David) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#343

(#343) [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR COURT ORDERED MEDIATION by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court is disappointed it received a letter from Objectors Michael Varallos and Ruth Varallos two days before Christmas. The letter from Objectors requests an order for "no-cost mediation" by the Court. The parties can either arrange the "no-cost mediation," perhaps through the Court's settlement panel, or notify the Court by January 10, 2020 why the request is improper. (es) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#342

(#342) Mail Returned addressed to Eve H Cervantez Altshuler Berzon LLP 177 Post Street Suite 300 San Francisco, CA 94108 re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #337 (es) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#341

(#341) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER REGARDING NOTICE RE: ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE OF RELATED AND CONSOLIDATED CASES. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#340

(#340) NOTICE RE: ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE OF RELATED AND CONSOLIDATED CASES filed by Plaintiffs Angelina Camacho, Odis Cole, Nyle Davis, Duane Fosdick, Regina Gonzalez-Phillips, Brandon Haag, Paul Hancock, Dustin Harvard, Brian Miller, Analisa Moskus, Keith Preston, Victoria Reimche, Dennis Small, Bryan Tidwell. (Tellis, Roland) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#339

(#339) FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement: 1. The Settlement Agreement, the Final Approval Order, and this Judgment are binding on and have res judicata and preclusive effect in all pending and future lawsuits or other proceedings encompassed by (1) the Settlement Class Released Claims maintained by or on behalf of the Settlement Class Releasors, and (2) the Wells Fargo and National General Released Claims maintained by or on behalf of the Wells Fargo and National General Releasors; *SEE JUDGMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.* (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#337

(#342) Mail Returned addressed to Eve H Cervantez Altshuler Berzon LLP 177 Post Street Suite 300 San Francisco, CA 94108 re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #337 (es) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Order

#4

#3

#2

#1

530 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#347) [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER DENYING COURT ORDERED MEDIATION by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court has reviewed the request and responses. The Court finds it is not proper to order mediation, "no-cost" or otherwise. Objectors Varallos' motion is DENIED. (See order.) (es) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#346) JOINDER filed by Defendants National General Holdings Corp, National General Insurance Company joining in Response, #345 . (Worcester, Richard) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#345) RESPONSE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo & Companyto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #343 Defendants Wells Fargo & Company And Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., D/B/A Wells Fargo Dealer Services Response Regarding Courts Order Re Motion For Court Ord Red Mediation [DKT No. 343] (Powell, David) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#344) NOTICE FROM THE CLERK: A copy of the Courts Order Regarding Motion for Court Ordered Mediation #343 was served via First Class U.S. Mail on the following parties: Michael & Ruth Varallo, Charles Shaffer, Roman Silberfeld, David Martinez, Aaron Sheanin, Kellie Lerner, Benjamin Steinberg, Eric Gibbs, Paul Novak, Roland Tellis, and David Casey on January 7, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#343) [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR COURT ORDERED MEDIATION by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court is disappointed it received a letter from Objectors Michael Varallos and Ruth Varallos two days before Christmas. The letter from Objectors requests an order for "no-cost mediation" by the Court. The parties can either arrange the "no-cost mediation," perhaps through the Court's settlement panel, or notify the Court by January 10, 2020 why the request is improper. (es) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#342) Mail Returned addressed to Eve H Cervantez Altshuler Berzon LLP 177 Post Street Suite 300 San Francisco, CA 94108 re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #337 (es) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#341) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER REGARDING NOTICE RE: ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE OF RELATED AND CONSOLIDATED CASES. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#340) NOTICE RE: ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE OF RELATED AND CONSOLIDATED CASES filed by Plaintiffs Angelina Camacho, Odis Cole, Nyle Davis, Duane Fosdick, Regina Gonzalez-Phillips, Brandon Haag, Paul Hancock, Dustin Harvard, Brian Miller, Analisa Moskus, Keith Preston, Victoria Reimche, Dennis Small, Bryan Tidwell. (Tellis, Roland) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#339) FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement: 1. The Settlement Agreement, the Final Approval Order, and this Judgment are binding on and have res judicata and preclusive effect in all pending and future lawsuits or other proceedings encompassed by (1) the Settlement Class Released Claims maintained by or on behalf of the Settlement Class Releasors, and (2) the Wells Fargo and National General Released Claims maintained by or on behalf of the Wells Fargo and National General Releasors; *SEE JUDGMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.* (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#336) NOTICE OF (1) UPDATED CLASS MEMBER OPT-OUT LIST AND (2) CLASS MEMBER'S WITHDRAWAL OF SOLE OBJECTION TO CLASS COUNSELS' FEE REQUEST filed by Plaintiffs Angelina Camacho, Odis Cole, Nyle Davis, Duane Fosdick, Regina Gonzalez-Phillips, Brandon Haag, Paul Hancock, Dustin Harvard, Brian Miller, Analisa Moskus, Keith Preston, Victoria Reimche, Dennis Small, Bryan Tidwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tellis, Roland) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
328 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Curt D Marshall on behalf of Plaintiff Juan A Thomas (Marshall, Curt) (Entered: 11/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeff S Westerman counsel for Plaintiff Juan A Thomas. Adding Jeff S. Westerman as counsel of record for Juan A. Thomas for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Juan A. Thomas. (Attorney Jeff S Westerman added to party Juan A Thomas(pty:pla))(Westerman, Jeff) (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Paul F Novak on behalf of Plaintiff Juan A Thomas (Novak, Paul) (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew D Stolper on behalf of Plaintiffs Misty Alexander, Blaine Boone, Charles Heiman, Brian Miller, Caroline Miller, Dianne Neal, Robert Neal (Attorney Andrew D Stolper added to party Misty Alexander(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew D Stolper added to party Blaine Boone(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew D Stolper added to party Charles Heiman(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew D Stolper added to party Brian Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew D Stolper added to party Caroline Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew D Stolper added to party Dianne Neal(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew D Stolper added to party Robert Neal(pty:pla))(Stolper, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #4 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Steven Parrott counsel for Plaintiff Caroline Miller. Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Caroline Miller Jonathan Parrott. (Attorney Jonathan Steven Parrott added to party Caroline Miller(pty:pla))(Parrott, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hollis L Salzman on behalf of Plaintiffs Dee Lenz, Kaylani Ross (Attachments: #1 Order)(Attorney Hollis L Salzman added to party Dee Lenz(pty:pla), Attorney Hollis L Salzman added to party Kaylani Ross(pty:pla))(Salzman, Hollis) (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER SETTING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. By order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (J.P.M.L.), the captioned actions were transferred to this district and assigned to this Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 or, if pending within this district, this Court has accepted their transfer. Additional tag along actions may be transferred. Because these cases merit special attention as complex litigation, the Court ORDERS: 1. Conference. Counsel for all parties shall appear for a conference on December 11, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10-D of the Ronald Regan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse at 411 W. Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA, 92701. (see document for details). (dro) (Entered: 10/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO INCLUDE CASES IN MDL by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. The Court orders that the above cases, SACV 17-1345, SACV 17-1395, SACV 17-1473, SACV 17-1718, and all related civil cases and potential tag-along cases identified in the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Conditional Transfer Order be added as member cases to the master docket in MDL case SA ML17-2797 AG(KESx). The Court orders all hearings and deadlines in cases SACV 17-1345, SACV 17-1395, SACV 17-1473 and SACV 17-1718 VACATED pending issuance of further order in the MDL case. The Court further orders that all attorneys and parties from all member cases be added to the master docket in MDL case SA ML17-2797 AG(KESx), including attorneys and parties from member cases that are transferred in the future. (dro) (Entered: 10/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation received creating Master Docket MDL 8:17-ml-2797, In Re: Wells Fargo Auto Insurance Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation. Case assigned to Judge Andrew J. Guilford for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E Scott for Discovery. Consolidating Cases: 8:17-cv-1814 AG (KESx), 8:17-cv-1815 AG (KESx), 8:17-cv-1816 AG (KESx),8:17-cv-1817 AG (KESx), 8:17-cv-1818 AG (KESx), 8:17-cv-1819 AG (KESx), 8:17-cv-1821 AG (KESx), 8:17-cv-1822 AG (KESx), 8:17-cv-1823 AG (KESx), 8:17-cv-1824 AG (KESx). (ghap) (Entered: 10/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL GENERAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where National General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack Atnip, III