This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2018 at 08:21:15 (UTC).

In re: United States Department of Justice

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 In re United States Department of Justice was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert M. Spector and Victor A. Bolden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-MC-00088

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Robert M. Spector

Victor A. Bolden

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DFAT, LLC

Alan Tuchmann

Defendant and In Re

United States Department of Justice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Tara Leigh Knight

Attorney at Knight & Cerritelli, LLC

2 Lincoln Street

New Haven, CT 06510

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 8/29/2018. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Quash Subpoena, filed by Alan Tuchmann, DFAT, LLC.Responses due by 9/19/2018 (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • (#3) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 09/10/2018. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden. Judge Robert M. Spector no longer assigned to the case. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 8/29/2018. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Filing fee received from Knight & Cerritelli: $ 47.00, receipt number CTXN0001785 (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Quash Subpoena, filed by Alan Tuchmann, DFAT, LLC.Responses due by 9/19/2018 (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.