This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/27/2022 at 00:01:34 (UTC).

In re: Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust Litigation

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 In re Treasury Securities Auction Antitrust Litigation was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul G. Gardephe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-MD-02673

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Gardephe

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Beaver County Employees' Retirement Fund

Central Laborers' Pension Fund

Robert L. Teel

Lackawanna County Employees' Retirement Fund

M & N Trading

Rock Capital Markets, LLC

Boston Retirement System

Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company

CNB Bancorp, Inc.

Consolidated Plaintiffs

American Federation of Teachers

UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH

Rogers Varner, Jr.

Laborers Local 231 Pension Fund

Richard Corbett

Laborers Local 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund

Defendants

TD Securities (USA) LLC

Jeffries LLC

Barclays Bank, PLC

The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.

J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC

88 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Daniel J Veroff

Attorney at Pillsbury & Coleman LLP

600 Montgomery Street, 31St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Peter Anthony Barile, III

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

Gabrielle Lisa Gould

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, LLP (NYC)

The New York Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018-1405

Paul J. Scarlato

Attorney at Rosca Scarlato LLC

161 Washington Street, Ste 1025

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Richard A. Rosen

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Lauren Kristina Collogan

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Paul Madison Eckles

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

134 Meeting Street, Suite 500

Charleston, SC 29401

David Elbaum

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP (NY)

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Garrett J. Bradley

Attorney at Thornton & Naumes, LLP

100 Summer Street

Boston, MA 02110

Ingrid S Leverett

Attorney at Pillsbury & Coleman LLP

600 Montgomery Street, 31St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Adam Block Schwartz

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

401 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20004

Jeff D. Friedman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP (CA)

715 Hearst Avenue, Suite 202

Berkely, CA 94710

Jennifer Kennedy Park

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Linda P. Nussbaum

Attorney at Nussbaum Law Group, P.C.

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Michael Walter Stocker

140 Broadway, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Walter W. Noss

Attorney at Scott+ Scott Attorneys at Law LLP

600 W. Broadway, Suite 3300

San Diego, CA 92101

Kenneth Bruce Pickle

Attorney at Radice Law Firm PC

34 Sunset Blvd.

Long Beach, NJ 08008

Heidi M. Silton

Attorney at Lockridge, Grindal, Nauen P.L.L.P.

100 Washington Ave. S, Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55401-2179

Robert N. Kaplan

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP (NYC)

850 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Jesse T. Smallwood

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

255 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

430 #1

Right to Appeal

430 #430

Main Document

#429

(#429) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: #412 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (ECF Nos. 403 and 407) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory S. Asciolla, Daniel L. Brockett and Michael B. Eise filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Accordingly, leave to amend will be denied. For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint are granted. Plaintiffs' motion for oral argument (Dkt. No. 412) is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. Nos. 403, 407, 412), and to close this consolidated case and all member cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/31/2022) (ks) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#428

(#428) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Anthony F. Fata on behalf of Rock Capital Markets, LLC. New Address: Kirby McInerney LLP, 211 West Wacker Dr., Suite 550, Chicago, Illinois, United States 60606, (312) 767-5180..(Fata, Anthony) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#427

(#427) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT UBS AG: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Plaintiffs hereby voluntarily dismiss all claims against UBS AG without prejudice to reassert such claims against UBS AG at a later time should evidence arise in discovery or otherwise that reveals information providing a basis for joining UBS AG on the claims being litigated in this case, and the Parties agree that any statute of limitations, statute of repose, or other time-related defense or claim shall be tolled as to UBS AG only such that any claim will be deemed to have been filed on November 16, 2017, the filing date of the Consolidated Complaint, and which tolling shall extend until the earlier of the final adjudication (after all appeals) of the dismissal of this action or the conclusion of fact discovery in this action. The Parties also agree that UBS AG will not assert a statute of limitations or statute of repose defense based on this dismissal without prejudice or the time period excluded by the tolling agreement herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/24/2022) (ks) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#426

(#426) ORDER: On May 14, 2021, Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case requested leave to file an unredacted Amended Consolidated Complaint under seal. (Dkt. No. 379) On June 8, 2021, this Court denied Plaintiffs' request without prejudice and stated that, barring the filing of a renewed motion to seal by June 15, 2021, the Court would provide public access to the unredacted Amended Consolidated Complaint. (Dkt. No. 384) No such motion has been filed. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to place the unredacted Amended Consolidated Complaint - Docket Number 380 and its attachments - on the public docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/20/2022) (ks) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#425

(#425) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael P. Canty on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, State-Boston Retirement System..(Canty, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#424

(#424) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Daniel L. Brockett, Michael B. Eisenkraft, and Gregory Asciolla dated November 10, 2021 re: Response to Defendants' November 4, 2021 letter. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#412

(#429) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: #412 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (ECF Nos. 403 and 407) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory S. Asciolla, Daniel L. Brockett and Michael B. Eise filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Accordingly, leave to amend will be denied. For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint are granted. Plaintiffs' motion for oral argument (Dkt. No. 412) is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. Nos. 403, 407, 412), and to close this consolidated case and all member cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/31/2022) (ks) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 03/31/2022)

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#5

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order

4 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#4

#3

#2

#1

547 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketTerminate Transcript Deadlines Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02673-PGG et al.(km) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#430) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #429 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of Nova Scotia, Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Market Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Dealerweb Inc, Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing L.P., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, J.P.Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merrill Lynch Government Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Tradeweb IDB Markets, Inc., Tradeweb Markets LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Michael St. John against Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, BWT Professional Trading, LLC, Beaver County Employees' Retirement Fund, Boston Retirement System, Breakwater Trading LLC, CNB Bancorp, Inc., Central Laborers' Pension Fund, City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, City of Providence, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Endeavor Trading, LLC, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, M & N Trading, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company, State-Boston Retirement System, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Virgin Islands, The New Jersey Laborers Statewide Funds, The Police Retirement System of St Louis, Torus Capital LLC, United International Insurance Company, Jane Franklin, Jonathan Richard Williamson, Marc Federighi, Michael St. John, Michael J. Smith, Robert L. Teel. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion & Order dated March 31, 2022, Defendants' motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint are granted. Plaintiffs' motion for oral argument is denied as moot; accordingly, the consolidated case and all members cases are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 03/31/2022) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal) (km) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#429) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: #412 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint (ECF Nos. 403 and 407) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gregory S. Asciolla, Daniel L. Brockett and Michael B. Eise filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Accordingly, leave to amend will be denied. For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint are granted. Plaintiffs' motion for oral argument (Dkt. No. 412) is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. Nos. 403, 407, 412), and to close this consolidated case and all member cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/31/2022) (ks) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#428) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Anthony F. Fata on behalf of Rock Capital Markets, LLC. New Address: Kirby McInerney LLP, 211 West Wacker Dr., Suite 550, Chicago, Illinois, United States 60606, (312) 767-5180..(Fata, Anthony) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#427) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT UBS AG: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Plaintiffs hereby voluntarily dismiss all claims against UBS AG without prejudice to reassert such claims against UBS AG at a later time should evidence arise in discovery or otherwise that reveals information providing a basis for joining UBS AG on the claims being litigated in this case, and the Parties agree that any statute of limitations, statute of repose, or other time-related defense or claim shall be tolled as to UBS AG only such that any claim will be deemed to have been filed on November 16, 2017, the filing date of the Consolidated Complaint, and which tolling shall extend until the earlier of the final adjudication (after all appeals) of the dismissal of this action or the conclusion of fact discovery in this action. The Parties also agree that UBS AG will not assert a statute of limitations or statute of repose defense based on this dismissal without prejudice or the time period excluded by the tolling agreement herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/24/2022) (ks) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#426) ORDER: On May 14, 2021, Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case requested leave to file an unredacted Amended Consolidated Complaint under seal. (Dkt. No. 379) On June 8, 2021, this Court denied Plaintiffs' request without prejudice and stated that, barring the filing of a renewed motion to seal by June 15, 2021, the Court would provide public access to the unredacted Amended Consolidated Complaint. (Dkt. No. 384) No such motion has been filed. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to place the unredacted Amended Consolidated Complaint - Docket Number 380 and its attachments - on the public docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/20/2022) (ks) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#425) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael P. Canty on behalf of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, State-Boston Retirement System..(Canty, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#424) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Daniel L. Brockett, Michael B. Eisenkraft, and Gregory Asciolla dated November 10, 2021 re: Response to Defendants' November 4, 2021 letter. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating food Industry Employers Tri-State Pension Fund..(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#423) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Y. Sperling, Richard A. Rosen, and David G. Januszewski dated November 4, 2021 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Recent Decision in Litovich v. Bank of America Corp.).(Januszewski, David) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#422) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE on re: #421 Notice (Other) filed by Boston Retirement System, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/8/2021) Attorney Lawrence Alan Sucharow terminated. (ks) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
445 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11810473. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeffries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roellke, Jon) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Rachel M. Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Receipt no. 0208-11801236). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #5 MOTION for John R Kastl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11802110. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for John R Kastl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11802110. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 3RED TRADING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kastl, John) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Rachel M. Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Receipt no. 0208-11801236). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 3RED TRADING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Rachel) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sandra Denise Hauser on behalf of 3RED TRADING LLC. (Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-1)transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Alabama and Illinois, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Paul G. Gardephe, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/17/2015) (sjo) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketCASES ORIGINATING FROM THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK: 1:15-cv-05794(PGG), 1:15-cv-05807(PGG), 1;15-cv-05830(PGG), 1:15-cv-05843(PGG), 1:15-cv-05931(PGG), 1:15-cv-05939(PGG), 1:15-cv-05957(PGG), 1:15-cv-06003(PGG),1:15-cv-06072 (PGG), 1:15-cv-06129(PGG), 1:15-cv-06139(PGG), 1:15-cv-06474(PGG), 1:15-cv-06782(PGG), 1:15-cv-06853(PGG), 1:15-cv-06892(PGG), 1:15-cv-07006(PGG), 1:15-cv-07111(PGG), 1:15-cv-07325(PGG), 1:15-cv-07329(PGG), 1:15-cv-07385(PGG), 1:15-cv-07390(PGG), 1:15-cv-07420(PGG), 1:15-cv-07481(PGG). (sjo) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sjo) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (sjo) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Illinis, New York and Virgin Islands, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Paul G. Gardephe, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/08/2015) (sjo) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Laborers Local 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund is a litigant