This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2021 at 13:53:02 (UTC).

IN RE: Takata Airbag Products Liability Litigation

Case Summary

On 02/05/2015 IN RE Takata Airbag Products Liability Litigation was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Federico A. Moreno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-MD-02599

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Loren Petersen

Plaintiffs Lead Counsel

Bernadette Heard

Nicholas Kinney

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Ann Xiaoyan Chen

Kathryn Commiciotto

Lynndon Bais

Ellen Bonet

Juan Falcon-Cosme

Zulemarie Rivera

John Huebner

Kenneth G. Desie

Jossellin M. Resto

John Considine

Kelly R Denny

Defendant and In Re

Takata Airbag Products Liability Litigation

Consolidated Defendants, Cross Claimants and Consolidated 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

American Honda Motor Co., Inc.,

Mazda Motor Corporation

Ford Motor Company

Honda Engineering Co Ltd

2,880 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Consolidated Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Cari K. Dawson

Attorney at Alston & Bird

1201 W Peachtree Street, 1 Atlantic Center

Atlanta, GA 30309

Mary T. Novacheck

Attorney at Bowman & Brooke

150 South 5Th Street, Suite 3000

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4244

Lauren P. Scott

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219-3916

Other Attorneys

Steven K. Jensen

Attorney at Siegried & Jensen

5664 S. Green Street

Murray, UT 84123

Steven Augustine Andreacchi

Attorney at Lindabury, McCormick, Estabrook, & Cooper P.C.

53 Cardinal Drive

Westfield, NJ 07090

Robert L. Lieff

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Michael L. Mallow

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West Fifth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Paul W. Schmidt

Attorney at Covington & Burling

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Ara Ray Jabagchourian

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlington, CA 94010

Aron K. Liang

Attorney at Minamit Tamaki, LLP

30 Post Street, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Jack W. Lee

Attorney at Minami Tamaki, LLP

360 Post Street, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Patrick E. Cafferty

Attorney at Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP

101 N. Main Street, Suite 565

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Daniel Frech

Attorney at Spangenberg, Shibley & LIber

1001 Lakeside Avenue, E., Suite 1700

Cleveland, OH 44114

Joseph A. Power, Jr.

Attorney at Power Rogers & Smith

70 West Madison Street, 55Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Robert N. Kaplan

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

850 3Rd Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Emily Ullman

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Jason Timothy Shipp

Attorney at Goldberg, Persky & White, P. C.

11 Stanwix Street, Suite 1800

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Steven D. Jansma

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

300 Convent Street Suite 2100

San Antonio, TX 78205

Megan A. Richmond

Attorney at Megan Richmond Law Offices APC

9255 Towne Centre Drive, Suite 500

Sand Diego, CA 92121

Derek S. Whitefield

Attorney at Dykema Gossett LLP

333 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

837 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#4119

(#4119) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct (4118 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1839 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1162 in 1:15-cv-20664-FAM) Order,, Unopposed Motion for Entry of an Amended Order Granting Partial Order of Dismissal of Plaintiff Cunningham Brothers Auto Parts, LLC's Claims Against Defendant Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 10/1/2021 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Salas, Henry) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#4118

(#4118) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re ( #4117 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1838 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1161 in 1:15-cv-20664-FAM) Plaintiff Cunningham Brothers Auto Parts LLCs and Defendant Ford Motor Company's Joint Stipulation for Partial Order of Dismissal. This Cause is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/10/2021. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (mc) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

4117 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4117 #1161

Main Document

#4115

(#4115) ORDER granting in part ( #4107 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, (1833) in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) New GM's Expedited Motion to Amend Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/2/2021. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

4107 #3

Exhibit 3 - Text of Proposed Order

4107 #2

Exhibit 2

4107 #1

Exhibit 1

4104 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4104 #1830

Main Document

#10

(#10) STATUS CONFERENCE AGENDA. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/12/2015. (gp) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING: Status Conference set for 2/20/2015 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/12/2015. (gp) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

#7

(#7) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Michigan, Case Number 2:14-14209 Morris, et al. v. Takata Corporation, et al, with enclosed copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gp) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

#6

(#6) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Central District of California, Case Number 2:14-08447 Archer v. Takata Corporation, et al, with enclosed copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gp) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

#5

(#5) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Central District of California, Case Number: 2:14-08324, Takeda, et al v. Takata Corporation, et al., with enclosed copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gp) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

2 #1

Order Amending Panel Rules

#2

(#2) Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Order Amending Panel Rules) (gp) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

#1

(#1) TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Dated 02/05/2015) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2599 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Federico A. Moreno. (Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel). (gp) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

3,392 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4119) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct (4118 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1839 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1162 in 1:15-cv-20664-FAM) Order,, Unopposed Motion for Entry of an Amended Order Granting Partial Order of Dismissal of Plaintiff Cunningham Brothers Auto Parts, LLC's Claims Against Defendant Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 10/1/2021 Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Salas, Henry) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4118) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re ( #4117 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1838 in 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1161 in 1:15-cv-20664-FAM) Plaintiff Cunningham Brothers Auto Parts LLCs and Defendant Ford Motor Company's Joint Stipulation for Partial Order of Dismissal. This Cause is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/10/2021. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM (mc) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4117) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiff Cunningham Brothers Auto Parts, LLC by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM(Salas, Henry) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4116) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4104 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/8/2021. (zgz) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4115) ORDER granting in part ( #4107 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, (1833) in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) New GM's Expedited Motion to Amend Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/2/2021. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4114) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4088 Motion to Compel. The representations made by Defendants in their pleadings may easily be answered to the questions asked at the depositions under oath. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/2/2021. (zgz) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4113) NOTICE by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC re (4112 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Corrected EXPEDITED MOTION (1) to Compel Compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 and 30 and (2) to Modify the Schedule re (4107 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) EXPEDITED MOTION Requesting confirmation relating to upcoming depositions and / MBUSA'S Joinder in New GM's Expedited Motion (1) to Compel Compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 and 30 and (2) to Modify the Schedule Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (Cantero, Raoul) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4112) Corrected EXPEDITED MOTION (1) to Compel Compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 and 30 and (2) to Modify the Schedule re (4107 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) EXPEDITED MOTION Requesting confirmation relating to upcoming depositions and a schedule modification by General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM(Riley, Laurie) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4111) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4106 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Brian D. Glueckstein representing FCA US LLC (Defendant); Attorney Matthew J. Porpora representing FCA US LLC (Defendant); Attorney Elizabeth A. Rose representing FCA US LLC (Defendant); Attorney Akash M. Toprani representing FCA US LLC (Defendant) withdrawn from case. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Brian Glueckstein, Matthew Porpora, Elizabeth Rose, Akash Toprani. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/2/2021. (zgz) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4110) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3992 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Scott M. O'Brien representing Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Consol Defendant) and Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft (Defendant) withdrawn from case. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Scott O'Brien. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/2/2021. (zgz) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,208 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STATUS CONFERENCE AGENDA. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/12/2015. (gp) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING: Status Conference set for 2/20/2015 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/12/2015. (gp) (Entered: 02/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • (#8) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from the Eastern District of Michigan. Case Number 2:14-cv-14209 with documents 1-15. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:15-cv-20496-FAM. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (gp) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Michigan, Case Number 2:14-14209 Morris, et al. v. Takata Corporation, et al, with enclosed copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gp) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Central District of California, Case Number 2:14-08447 Archer v. Takata Corporation, et al, with enclosed copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gp) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Central District of California, Case Number: 2:14-08324, Takeda, et al v. Takata Corporation, et al., with enclosed copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gp) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • (#4) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 1:14-cv-24087-FAM with documents 1-17. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (gp) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • (#3) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 1:14-cv-24009-FAM with documents 1-102. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (gp) (Entered: 02/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Order Amending Panel Rules) (gp) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Dated 02/05/2015) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2599 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Federico A. Moreno. (Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel). (gp) (Entered: 02/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Takata Airbag Products Liability Litigation is a litigant

Latest cases where MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant