Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2018 at 17:08:17 (UTC).

In Re Subpoenas to Venclose, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/27/2018 In Re Subpoenas to Venclose, Inc was filed as a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan van Keulen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-MC-80063

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan van Keulen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Covidien Holding Inc.

Covidien LP

Defendants

Subpoenas to Venclose, Inc.

Brady Esch

H. Gerald Gibson

Venclose, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick M. Arenz

Attorney at Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, 2800 Lasalle Plaza

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Emily E. Niles

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Christine Yun Sauer

Attorney at Robins and Kaplan

2440 W El Camino Real, Suite 100

Mountain View, CA 94040

Christine S. Yun Sauer

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2800 Lasalle Plaza, 800 Lasalle Avenue

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2015

Defendant Attorneys

Jon Mark Thacker

Attorney at Ropers, Majeski, Kohn & Bentley

50 W. San Fernando Street, Suite 1400

San Jose, CA 95113

Lita Monique Verrier

Attorney at Ropers, Majeski, Kohn & Bentley

50 W. San Fernando St., #1400

San Jose, CA 95113

Marie Elizabeth Sobieski

Attorney at Ropers, Majeski, Kohn and Bentley, PC

1001 Marshall Street, Suite 500

Redwood City, CA 94063

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) ORDER REGARDING #37 JUNE 14, 2018 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/19/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

#38

(#38) EXHIBITS re #3 Declaration in Support, Unredacted Exhibit B to Declaration of Christine Yun Sauer in Support of Covidien's Motion to Compel Venclose to Comply with Subpoenas to Produce Documents, things, and Deposition Testimony "ECF 3" filed byCovidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Niles, Emily) (Filed on 6/19/2018) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

37 #1

Declaration of Peter Osborne ISO Venclose

#37

(#37) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Covidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Osborne ISO Venclose)(Arenz, Patrick) (Filed on 6/14/2018) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

13 #16

*Restricted*

13 #15

Redacted Ex G Yun Sauer Decl. ISO Mot. Compel Depo

13 #14

Ex F Yun Sauer Decl. ISO Mot. Compel Depo

13 #13

Ex E Yun Sauer Decl. ISO Mot. Compel Depo

13 #11

*Restricted*

3 #5

Z

3 #4

Y

3 #3

Q-X

3 #2

M-P

3 #1

A-L

#3

(#38) EXHIBITS re #3 Declaration in Support, Unredacted Exhibit B to Declaration of Christine Yun Sauer in Support of Covidien's Motion to Compel Venclose to Comply with Subpoenas to Produce Documents, things, and Deposition Testimony "ECF 3" filed byCovidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Niles, Emily) (Filed on 6/19/2018) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

#2

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Covidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP re #2 Memorandum in Support, #1 MOTION to Compel, #3 Declaration in Support, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

1 #1

receipt

#1

(#33) OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY (In re: Dkt. Nos. #1 , #16 , #18 , #27 and #30 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/14/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018) (Entered: 05/14/2018)

183 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2018
  • (#40) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. In Chambers Conference held on 6/27/2018 re Mid-Deposition Dispute. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER REGARDING #37 JUNE 14, 2018 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/19/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) EXHIBITS re #3 Declaration in Support, Unredacted Exhibit B to Declaration of Christine Yun Sauer in Support of Covidien's Motion to Compel Venclose to Comply with Subpoenas to Produce Documents, things, and Deposition Testimony "ECF 3" filed byCovidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Niles, Emily) (Filed on 6/19/2018) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Covidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Osborne ISO Venclose)(Arenz, Patrick) (Filed on 6/14/2018) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING COVIDIEN'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL (In re: ECF Nos. #5 , #13 , #14 and #22 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/22/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018) (Entered: 05/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) FURTHER ORDER REGARDING #34 COVIDIEN'S MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/21/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018) (Entered: 05/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Dkt. No. 33 filed by Covidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP. (Arenz, Patrick) (Filed on 5/17/2018) (Entered: 05/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY (In re: Dkt. Nos. #1 , #16 , #18 , #27 and #30 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/14/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018) (Entered: 05/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Discovery Letter Brief - Covidien's Opposition to Venclose's Motion to Quash (DI 27) filed by Covidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Arenz, Patrick) (Filed on 5/11/2018) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Discovery Letter Brief- Covidien's Opposition to Venclose's Motion for Ex Parte Relief (DI 30) filed by Covidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Arenz, Patrick) (Filed on 5/10/2018) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Christine S. Yun Sauer (Yun Sauer, Christine) (Filed on 4/11/2018) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1 MOTION to Compel ) filed byBrady Esch, Venclose, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lita M. Verrier, #2 Exhibit A to Dec. of L. Verrier, #3 Exhibit B to Dec. of L. Verrier, #4 Exhibit C to Dec. of L. Verrier, #5 Exhibit D to Dec. of L. Verrier, #6 Exhibit E to Dec. of L. Verrier, #7 Declaration of Marie E. Sobieski, #8 Exhibit 1 to Dec. of M. Sobieski, #9 Declaration of Brady Esch, #10 Declaration of H. Gerald Gibson, #11 Exhibit 1 to Dec. of H. Gerald Gibson)(Verrier, Lita) (Filed on 4/10/2018) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #7 MOTION to Seal Case Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Covidien LP, Covidien Holding Inc. (cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018) (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) UNREDACTED documents re: #5 (Attachments: #1 unredacted version of Declaration of Chriunrecated stine Yun Sauer in Support of Covidien's Motion to Compel Venclose to Comply with Subpoenas to Produce Documents, Things and Deposition Testimony, #2 unredacted version of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Covidien's Motion to Compel Venclose to Comply with Subpoenas to Produce Documents, Things and Deposition Testimony)(Yun Sauer, Christine) (Filed on 3/29/2018) Modified text on 3/29/2018, (to confirm with document posted by counsel). (cvS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/5/2018 (cvS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Covidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP re #2 Memorandum in Support, #1 MOTION to Compel, #3 Declaration in Support, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Covidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Order re #1 MOTION to Compel by Covidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REDACTED Declaration of Christine Yun Sauer in Support of #1 MOTION to Compel filed byCovidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP. (Attachments: #1 A-L, #2 M-P, #3 Q-X, #4 Y, #5 Z)(Related document(s) #1 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REDACTED MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 MOTION to Compel filed byCovidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP. (Related document(s) #1 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Compel Venclose to Comply with Subpoenas to produce documents filed by Covidien Holding Inc., Covidien LP. Responses due by 4/10/2018. Replies due by 4/17/2018. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2018: #1 receipt) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Venclose Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where COVIDIEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marie Elizabeth Sobieski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lita Monique Verrier