Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2019 at 08:00:48 (UTC).

In Re Subpoena to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 In Re Subpoena to Wells Fargo Bank, N A was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara Lynn Major, Marilyn L. Huff, Mitchell D. Dembin and Cynthia Bashant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02617

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Barbara Lynn Major

Mitchell D. Dembin

Presiding Judges

Marilyn L. Huff

Cynthia Bashant

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ke e Partners, LLC

Howard Appel

David Cohen

Respondent

Boston National Title Agency, LLC

In Re

In Re Subpoena to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph M. Preis

Attorney at Godes & Preis, LLP

300 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 1420

Irvine, CA 92618

Benjamin G Reynolds

Attorney at Godes and Preis LLP

300 Spectrum Center Drive Suite 1420

Irvine, CA 92618

Benjamin Gerald Reynolds

Attorney at Godes & Preis LLP

300 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 1420

Irvine, CA 92618

Respondent Attorneys

Taylor Reeves Dalton

Attorney at Hall Griffin LLP

1851 East First Street 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Rachel C Witcher

Attorney at Hall Griffin LLP

1851 E First St, 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Howard D Hall

Attorney at Hall Griffin LLP

1851 East First Street, 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Taylor R. Dalton

Attorney at Hall Griffin LLP

1851 E. First Street, 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE OF INTENT TO RESPOND by Howard Appel, David Cohen, Ke e Partners, LLC re #19 Third Party MOTION for Joinder to Motion to Quash Subpoena re #1 Complaint (Reynolds, Benjamin)Attorney Benjamin Gerald Reynolds added to party Howard Appel(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Gerald Reynolds added to party David Cohen(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Gerald Reynolds added to party Ke e Partners, LLC(pty:pla) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

19 #2

Proposed Order

19 #1

Declaration

#19

(#19) Third Party MOTION for Joinder to Motion to Quash Subpoena re #1 Complaint by Concierge Auctions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Rudd, Amy)Attorney Amy Rudd added to party Concierge Auctions, LLC( pty:ip). Modified on 1/10/2019 - Proposed order attached. QC Email sent re ECF Proposed Order policy 2.h and to email Proposed Order to Chambers. Edited text (jah). (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff, Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-00873-BAS-MDD. The new case number is 18cv2617-BAS(MDD). Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/26/2018. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/20/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

16 #1

*Restricted*

#16

(#16) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-mc-00145. Original file received electronically (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO TRANSFER MOTION RELATED TO SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. The Court has determined that the request should be GRANTED. The clerk is hereby directed to TRANSFER defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC's motion to quash and/or modify subpoena to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. #1 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. (see order for further details). Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#14

(#14) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#7

(#7) DECLARATION of Rachel C. Witcher re MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC. (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC. Related Case(s): 3:18-cv-00873-BAS-MDD, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California; and 3:17-cv-02263-BAS-MDD, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC identifying Boston National Holdings, LLC; and Incenter LLC as Corporate Parent. (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC, identifying Howard Appel, Plaintiff in underlying action; David Cohen, Plaintiff in underlying action; Ke'e Partners, LLC, Plaintiff in underlying action; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Non-Party subject to Subpoena; and Concierge Auctions, LLC, Non-Party with interest in subpoenaed information. (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Taylor Reeves Dalton on behalf of Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC. (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

1 #2

Proposed Order

1 #1

Joint Stipulation re: Motion to Quash and/or Modify Subpoena

#1

(#12) NOTICE OF HEARING on NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash and/or Modify Subpoena to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 is set for hearing. Motion set for hearing on 11/27/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/29/2018)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE OF INTENT TO RESPOND by Howard Appel, David Cohen, Ke e Partners, LLC re #19 Third Party MOTION for Joinder to Motion to Quash Subpoena re #1 Complaint (Reynolds, Benjamin)Attorney Benjamin Gerald Reynolds added to party Howard Appel(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Gerald Reynolds added to party David Cohen(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Gerald Reynolds added to party Ke e Partners, LLC(pty:pla) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Third Party MOTION for Joinder to Motion to Quash Subpoena re #1 Complaint by Concierge Auctions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Rudd, Amy)Attorney Amy Rudd added to party Concierge Auctions, LLC( pty:ip). Modified on 1/10/2019 - Proposed order attached. QC Email sent re ECF Proposed Order policy 2.h and to email Proposed Order to Chambers. Edited text (jah). (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff, Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-00873-BAS-MDD. The new case number is 18cv2617-BAS(MDD). Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/26/2018. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/20/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-mc-00145. Original file received electronically (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • (#17) Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (no document attached) (jpp) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO TRANSFER MOTION RELATED TO SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. The Court has determined that the request should be GRANTED. The clerk is hereby directed to TRANSFER defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC's motion to quash and/or modify subpoena to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. #1 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. (see order for further details). Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:18-mc-00145 AB(FFMx). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF HEARING on NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash and/or Modify Subpoena to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 is set for hearing. Motion set for hearing on 11/27/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DECLARATION of Benjamin G. Reynolds re MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC. (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DECLARATION of Joseph M. Preis re MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC. (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DECLARATION of Taylor R. Dalton re MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC. (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DECLARATION of Rachel C. Witcher re MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC. (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC. Related Case(s): 3:18-cv-00873-BAS-MDD, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California; and 3:17-cv-02263-BAS-MDD, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC identifying Boston National Holdings, LLC; and Incenter LLC as Corporate Parent. (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC, identifying Howard Appel, Plaintiff in underlying action; David Cohen, Plaintiff in underlying action; Ke'e Partners, LLC, Plaintiff in underlying action; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Non-Party subject to Subpoena; and Concierge Auctions, LLC, Non-Party with interest in subpoenaed information. (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Taylor Reeves Dalton on behalf of Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC. (Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION RELATED TO A SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: 0973-22650361 - Fee: $47, filed by Defendant Boston National Title Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation re: Motion to Quash and/or Modify Subpoena, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Taylor Reeves Dalton added to party Boston National Title Agency, LLC(pty:dft))(Dalton, Taylor) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard D Hall