This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:14 (UTC).

In Re Steve S. Suh

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 In Re Steve S Suh was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Percy Anderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-07385

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Appellant, Defendant and Not Yet Classified

Steve S. Suh

Appellee

Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Andrew K Kim

Attorney at Andrew K Kim Law Offices APC

3470 Wilshire Blvd Suite 885

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Appellee Attorney

Howard D Hall

Attorney at Hall Griffin LLP

1851 East First Street 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705-4052

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Percy Anderson. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. On August 23, 2018, this Court issued a Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. The Notice provides: Each party must comply with all applicable rules of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. As provided in said rules, within fourteen days after filing the notice of appeal, Appellant must file the following with the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court: A designation of record; A statement of issues on appeal; A notice regarding the ordering of transcripts. To date, Appellant has not filed either a designation of record, a statement of issues on appeal, or a notice regarding the ordering of transcripts. Appellant shall have until October 9, 2018 to file these documents. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 8/22/2018. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #1

USBC Docket

#9

(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Appellant did not timely file the required documents. On September 25, 2018, the Court, on its own motion, extended the deadline to file the documents to October 9, 2018 and warned Appellant that if "Appellant fails to file the required documents by that date, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further warning." To date, Appellant has not filed the required documents and has not attempted to explain why he has not done so. Taking all of the above factors into account, dismissal is appropriate. The Court therefore dismisses this appeal. (See document for listed factors). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) (Entered: 10/14/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Statement of Issues, Designation of Record, and Notice of Transcript were not filed forwarded to Judge Percy Anderson. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: [Does not include copy of order, judgment, or decree] Re: Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:17-bk-19072-SK, Adversary number: NONE, BAP case number: NONE, filed by Appellant Steve S. Suh. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY Regarding The Notice of Appeal does not include entered stamped copy of order, judgment, or decree. forwarded to Judge Percy Anderson. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Appellant did not timely file the required documents. On September 25, 2018, the Court, on its own motion, extended the deadline to file the documents to October 9, 2018 and warned Appellant that if "Appellant fails to file the required documents by that date, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further warning." To date, Appellant has not filed the required documents and has not attempted to explain why he has not done so. Taking all of the above factors into account, dismissal is appropriate. The Court therefore dismisses this appeal. (See document for listed factors). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) (Entered: 10/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. On August 23, 2018, this Court issued a Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. The Notice provides: Each party must comply with all applicable rules of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. As provided in said rules, within fourteen days after filing the notice of appeal, Appellant must file the following with the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court: A designation of record; A statement of issues on appeal; A notice regarding the ordering of transcripts. To date, Appellant has not filed either a designation of record, a statement of issues on appeal, or a notice regarding the ordering of transcripts. Appellant shall have until October 9, 2018 to file these documents. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Statement of Issues, Designation of Record, and Notice of Transcript were not filed forwarded to Judge Percy Anderson. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 8/22/2018. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY Regarding The Notice of Appeal does not include entered stamped copy of order, judgment, or decree. forwarded to Judge Percy Anderson. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Percy Anderson. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: [Does not include copy of order, judgment, or decree] Re: Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:17-bk-19072-SK, Adversary number: NONE, BAP case number: NONE, filed by Appellant Steve S. Suh. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.