This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2018 at 07:46:08 (UTC).

In Re: Seaboard Hotel Member Associates, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2018 In Re Seaboard Hotel Member Associates, LLC was filed as a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa L. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01588

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa L. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NCA Investors Liquidating Trust

Defendants

Seaboard Hotel Member Associates, LLC et al

A. PappaJohn Construction Company

In Re

Seaboard Hotel Member Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren McNair

Attorney at Green & Sklarz, LLC

700 State Street, Suite 100

New Haven, CT 06511

Jeffrey M. Sklarz

Attorney at Green & Sklarz LLC

700 State Street, Suite 100

New Haven, CT 06511

Kellianne Baranowsky

Attorney at Green & Sklarz, LLC

700 State Street, Suite 100

New Haven, CT 06511

Lawrence S. Grossman

Attorney at Green & Sklarz LLC

700 State St, Suite 100

New Haven, CT 06511

Defendant Attorneys

Peter E. Strniste, Jr.

Attorney at Robinson & Cole, LLP-HTFD

280 Trumbull St.

Hartford, CT 06103

Davis Lee Wright

Attorney at Montgomery, McCracken, Walker & Rhoads - DE

1105 N. Market Street, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Patrick M. Birney

Attorney at Robinson & Cole, LLP-HTFD

280 Trumbull St.

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

#130

(#130) MOTION for Davis Lee Wright to Withdraw as Attorney by A. PappaJohn Construction Company. (Birney, Patrick) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#129

(#129) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #125 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) until December 21, 2018 by NCA Investors Liquidating Trust. (Sklarz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#128

(#128) NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Grossman on behalf of NCA Investors Liquidating Trust (Grossman, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

126 #3

Exhibit 2

126 #2

Exhibit 1

#125

(#125) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by A. PappaJohn Construction Company.Responses due by 11/19/2018 (Birney, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#124

(#124) MOTION for Extension of Time until October 29, 2018 To File An Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint #59 Complaint by A. PappaJohn Construction Company. (Birney, Patrick) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#123

ORDER denying #122 Motion to Reassign Case. Although the instant case and the cited "Related Cases" all involve entities allegedly affected by the same "fraudulent scheme," the cases each involve different entities and will have distinct legal theories. See #123 at 1-3. The Court is unconvinced that reassigning the case is in the interest of the effective administration of justice. See D. Conn. Local R. 40(a). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/1/2018. (Mattessich, William) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#122

ORDER denying #122 Motion to Reassign Case. Although the instant case and the cited "Related Cases" all involve entities allegedly affected by the same "fraudulent scheme," the cases each involve different entities and will have distinct legal theories. See #123 at 1-3. The Court is unconvinced that reassigning the case is in the interest of the effective administration of justice. See D. Conn. Local R. 40(a). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/1/2018. (Mattessich, William) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#63

(#63) MOTION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by A. PappaJohn Construction Company. (Delaware Doc #5) (Blough, B.) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#62

(#62) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for A. PappaJohn Construction Company. (Delaware Doc #4) (Blough, B.) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

60 #2

Affidavit of Service

60 #1

Notice of Dispute Resolutions Alternatives

#60

(#60) NOTICE of SUMMONS by NCA Investors Liquidating Trust (Attachments: #1 Notice of Dispute Resolutions Alternatives, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Blough, B.) (Delaware doc #2) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

59 #1

Exhibit A

#59

(#124) MOTION for Extension of Time until October 29, 2018 To File An Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint #59 Complaint by A. PappaJohn Construction Company. (Birney, Patrick) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

58 #1

Order of Transfer

#58

(#58) DISTRICT OF DELAWARE DOCKET SHEET AND ORDER OF TRANSFER. (Attachments: #1 Order of Transfer)(Blough, B.) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

140 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#132) ORDER granting #129 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #125 MOTION to Dismiss until 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/13/2018. (Mattessich, William) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#131) ORDER granting #130 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Davis Lee Wright terminated. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/13/2018. (Mattessich, William) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#130) MOTION for Davis Lee Wright to Withdraw as Attorney by A. PappaJohn Construction Company. (Birney, Patrick) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#129) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #125 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) until December 21, 2018 by NCA Investors Liquidating Trust. (Sklarz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Grossman on behalf of NCA Investors Liquidating Trust (Grossman, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER denying #122 Motion to Reassign Case. Although the instant case and the cited "Related Cases" all involve entities allegedly affected by the same "fraudulent scheme," the cases each involve different entities and will have distinct legal theories. See #123 at 1-3. The Court is unconvinced that reassigning the case is in the interest of the effective administration of justice. See D. Conn. Local R. 40(a). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/1/2018. (Mattessich, William) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) ORDER granting #124 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/30/2018. (Mattessich, William) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#126) Memorandum in Support re #125 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by A. PappaJohn Construction Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Birney, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#125) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by A. PappaJohn Construction Company.Responses due by 11/19/2018 (Birney, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#124) MOTION for Extension of Time until October 29, 2018 To File An Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint #59 Complaint by A. PappaJohn Construction Company. (Birney, Patrick) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) MOTION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by NCA Investors Liquidating Trust. (Delaware Doc #8) (Blough, B.) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) MOTION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by NCA Investors Liquidating Trust. (Delaware Doc #7) (Blough, B.) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) STIPULATION to extend time to Answer RE: Complaint. (Delaware Doc #6) (Blough, B.) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) MOTION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by A. PappaJohn Construction Company. (Delaware Doc #5) (Blough, B.) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for A. PappaJohn Construction Company. (Delaware Doc #4) (Blough, B.) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • (#61) $ 350.00 FEE RECEIVED, Delaware receipt number #8684932 (Delaware Doc #3) (Blough, B.) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) NOTICE of SUMMONS by NCA Investors Liquidating Trust (Attachments: #1 Notice of Dispute Resolutions Alternatives, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Blough, B.) (Delaware doc #2) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) ADVERSARY COMPLAINT against A. PappaJohn Construction Company, filed by NCA Investors Liquidating Trust. (Delaware doc #1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blough, B.) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) DISTRICT OF DELAWARE DOCKET SHEET AND ORDER OF TRANSFER. (Attachments: #1 Order of Transfer)(Blough, B.) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 17-51858-LSS (Adversary Proceeding). Electronic file with documents numbered 1-57, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.(Blough, B.) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence S. Grossman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey M. Sklarz