This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/09/2018 at 07:14:56 (UTC).

In Re: Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation, et al.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 In Re Sabine Oil Gas Corporation, was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Paul Oetken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-08200

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Paul Oetken

 

Party Details

Appellants

Nabors Industries, Inc.

Nabors Drilling USA, LP

Appellee, Debtor and In Re

Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

Jonathan S. Henes

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (LA)

333 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This matter coming to be heard on the Parties' Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, the Court having reviewed the Stipulation, and being duly advised, it is HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The above-captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice; and 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees in connection with this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/27/2018) (ama) Modified on 9/28/2018 (ama). Modified on 9/28/2018 (ama). (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation. Document filed by Nabors Industries, Inc., Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff..(Jakola, Adrianne) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bmlo) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: This bankruptcy appeal has been assigned to me for all purposes. The briefing schedule provided in the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedures, specifically in Rule 8018, governs this case. The parties are advised that oral argument will not be held unless and until the Court orders otherwise. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/11/2018) (ama) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bmlo) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bmlo) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Shelley C. Chapman dated 07/12/2018. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 15-B-11835 (SCC). Certified copies of file received. Document filed by Nabors Drilling USA, LP, Nabors Industries, Inc. (bmlo) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nabors Drilling U S A L P is a litigant

Latest cases where Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Nabors Industries Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan S. Henes(Designation Retained)