This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2018 at 15:07:47 (UTC).

In Re: Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/06/2016 In Re Sabine Oil Gas Corporation was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-02561

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Appellant

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Appellees and Debtors

Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation

Barclays Bank PLC

Duane Radtke

James Lightner

Sabine Investor Holdings LLC

Loren Carroll

David Sambrooks

James Lee

First Reserve GP XI, L.P.

Alex Krueger

Wilmington Trust, N.A.

Patrick R. McDonald

Victor Wind

Joshua Weiner

FRC Founders Corporation

Brooks Shughart

Michael France

Dod Fraser

First Reserve GP XI, Inc.

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Christopher Thomas Brown

Justin Florence

D. Ross Martin(Designation Retained)

Mark Rodney Somerstein(Designation Retained)

Keith Howard Wofford(Designation Retained)

Debtor Attorneys

Gabor Balassa

Adrianne Katrine Jakola

Appellee Attorneys

Fredric Sosnick(Designation Retained)

Theresa Ann Foudy(Designation Retained)

Kevin Arthur Meehan(Designation Retained)

Michael Joseph Moscato

Kenneth R. David

Daniel Alexander Fliman

Andrew J. Rossman

Paul Basta(Designation Retained)

James H.M. Sprayregen(Designation Retained)

Kyle James Kimpler(Designation Retained)

Moses Silverman(Designation Retained)

Other Attorneys

Margot B. Schonholtz(Designation Retained)

Robert H. Trust(Designation Retained)

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#39

#48

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court has considered all of the arguments of the parties. To the extent not specifically discussed above, the arguments are either moot or without merit. The motion to certify the direct appeal to the Court of Appeals is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/24/2016) (rjm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) OPINION AND ORDER. The Court has considered all the parties' arguments. To the extent not specifically addressed above, the parties' arguments are either moot or without merit. For the foregoing reasons, the Bankruptcy Court's order is affirmed. The Clerk is directed to close all pending motions and to close this case. The Appellants should report to the Court by July 1, 2016, on the status of the related cases, 16-cv-2937 and 16-cv-2949. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/24/2016) (rjm)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRC Founders Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Sabine Oil & Gas Corporation is a litigant