This case was last updated from PACER on 09/30/2018 at 08:11:16 (UTC).

In Re: Richard Edward Hunt

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 In Re Richard Edward Hunt was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr, Susie Morgan, Janis van Meerveld and Barry W Ashe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-07237

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judges

Susie Morgan

Barry W Ashe

 

Party Details

Appellant

Issis R Elwin

New Orleans, LA 70115-4221

Defendant and Appellee

Richard Edward Hunt

Metairie, LA 70002

Trustee

U.S. Trustee

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2110

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Susie Morgan, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

1 #1

USBC Orders Appealed

#4

(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadline to File Initial Brief and to Coordinate Appeal by Issis R Elwin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jls) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

1 #3

USBC Transmittal Letter

2 #1

USBC Notice of Appeal with Exhibit

4 #1

Proposed Order

2 #2

USBC Docket Sheet

2 #3

USBC Pleadings

#3

(#3) Bankruptcy Scheduling Order: Appellant Brief due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Clerk.(bwn) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #2

USBC Docket Sheet

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Judge Magner. Copy of Notice of Appeal and Designation(s) of Record received; filed by Issis R Elwin. (Attachments: #1 USBC Orders Appealed, #2 USBC Docket Sheet, #3 USBC Transmittal Letter)(jls) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#2

(#2) DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Issis R Elwin re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, and NOTICE of Complete Record received from US Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 USBC Notice of Appeal with Exhibit, #2 USBC Docket Sheet, #3 USBC Pleadings)(jls) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Susie Morgan, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadline to File Initial Brief and to Coordinate Appeal by Issis R Elwin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jls) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Bankruptcy Scheduling Order: Appellant Brief due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Clerk.(bwn) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Issis R Elwin re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, and NOTICE of Complete Record received from US Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 USBC Notice of Appeal with Exhibit, #2 USBC Docket Sheet, #3 USBC Pleadings)(jls) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Judge Magner. Copy of Notice of Appeal and Designation(s) of Record received; filed by Issis R Elwin. (Attachments: #1 USBC Orders Appealed, #2 USBC Docket Sheet, #3 USBC Transmittal Letter)(jls) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.