This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2021 at 03:31:15 (UTC).

In Re: RFC and RESCAP Liquidating Trust Litigation

Case Summary

On 12/12/2013 In Re RFC and RESCAP Liquidating Trust Litigation was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Hildy Bowbeer and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:13-CV-03451

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Hildy Bowbeer

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Defendants and Counter Claimants

PMC Bancorp

First Tennessee Bank, N.A.

Pemm. Tek Mortgage Services, LLC

CTX Mortgage Company, LLC

Mortgage Access Corp.

PHH Mortgage Corp.

Amnet Mortgage LLC

Circle Mortgage Corp.

Guaranty Bank

MortgageIT, Inc.

Edward Danielczyk

First Mariner Bank

Provident Funding Associates, L.P.

Lenox Financial Mortgage Corp.

Broadview Mortgage Corp.

BMO Harris Bank, N.A.

Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.

SouthTrust Mortgage Corporation

HSBC Finance Corporation

Pulte Homes, Inc.

92 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Adrian K. Felix

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg

1450 Brickell Avenue, Ste 23Rd Floor

Miami, FL 33131

James R Andreen

Attorney at Erstad & Riemer, P.A.

8009 34Th Avenue South, Suite 200

Minneapolis, MN 55425-4409

Michael O. Ware

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1675 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Other Attorneys

Gregory G Brown

Attorney at Brown and Charbonneau LLP

420 Exchange Ste 270

Irvine, CA 92606

Susan Jill Rice

Attorney at Alward Fisher Rice Rowe & Graf, PLC

202 East State Street, Suite 100

Traverse City, MI 49684

David A. Crichlow

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

575 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022-2585

Guyon H. Knight

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Ave., Ste 22Nd Fl.

New York, NY 10010

Kannon K. Shanmugam

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Richard C St John

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson

355 S Grand Ave Ste 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kate E Cassidy

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Ave 22Nd Fl

New York, NY 10010

Nicholas C. Perros

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-6807

Richard Allen Schirtzer

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

865 S. Figuoera Street, Suite 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Isaac Nesser

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Victor L Hayslip

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

420 North 20Th Street Ste 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Zena Jacobsen

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

865 S. Figueroa Street, 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Robert Jason Becher

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Anne T Regan

Attorney at Hellmuth & Johnson

8050 West 78Th St.

Edina, MN 55439

Andrew David Atkins

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

301 S. College Street, Ste 34Th Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202

Kathleen Marie Sullivan

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Linda J. Brewer

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

491 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#5529

5528 #1

Civil Notice - appeal

#5528

#5527

#5526

#5525

#5524

#5523

#5522

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A-B

#1

7,758 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5529) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/17/2020.(SMD) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5528) JUDGMENT AS TO PRIMARY RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(kt) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5527) FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc., No. 16-cv-4070. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/14/2020.(SMD) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5526) Defendant Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc.'s Exhibit List - List of Exhibits Admitted at Trial. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. (SMD) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5525) Plaintiff ResCap Liquidating Trust's Trial Exhibit List - List of Exhibits Admitted at Trial. This document relates to: ResCap Liquidating Trust v. Primary Residential Mortgage, Inc. (SMD) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5524) ORDER on #5522 Stipulation of Dismissal of Individual Case. This document relates to: Residential Funding Company, LLC v. Hometown Mortgage Services, Inc., No. 13-cv-3509. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/3/2020.(SMD) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5523) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5522 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Heeman, Donald) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5522) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by ResCap Liquidating Trust. Jointly Signed by Hometown Mortgage Services, Inc. (Heeman, Donald) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5521) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jessica J Nelson (Nelson, Jessica) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5520) LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by ResCap Liquidating Trust . (Nelson, Jessica) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5,482 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David M. Souders. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3828300 by Academy Mortgage Corporation. (Forman, James) (Entered: 01/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER that the Stipulation (ECF Docket No. 7) is ADOPTED and the time in which Defendant Academy Mortgage Corporation shall answer, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including February 14, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 1/8/14. (jam) (Entered: 01/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSED ORDER re #7 STIPULATION by Academy Mortgage Corporation (Forman, James) Modified on 1/7/2014 (kt). (Entered: 01/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Academy Mortgage Corporation. Jointly Signed by Residential Funding Company, LLC. (Forman, James) (Entered: 01/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Academy Mortgage Corporation. (Forman, James) (Entered: 01/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James L Forman on behalf of Academy Mortgage Corporation. (Forman, James) (Entered: 01/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Academy Mortgage Corporation. (akl) (Entered: 12/13/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Please use case number 13cv3451 SRN/JSM. (akl) (Entered: 12/13/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Gary S. Lee, Jamie A. Levitt, Kayvan B. Sadeghi, Jeffrey A. Lipps, Jennifer A. L. Battle as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (akl) (Entered: 12/13/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Academy Mortgage Corporation. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-3800307.) Filed by Residential Funding Company, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kelly, Daniel) (Entered: 12/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Mariner Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Lenox Financial Mortgage Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Access Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Circle Mortgage Corp. is a litigant