This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2021 at 19:42:16 (UTC).

In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 In Re National Prescription Opiate Litigation was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804) and Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-MD-02804

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of Toledo

City of Lorain

County of Cuyahoga

Richland County Children's Services

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

National Prescription Opiate Litigation

McKesson Corporation

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Actavis, Inc.

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

Perry Fine

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Russell Portenoy

Actavis LLC

Allergan Finance LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

849 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph L. Ciaccio

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik

400 Broadhollow Road

Melville, NY 11747

Patrick G. Warner

Attorney at Leist Warner

513 East Rich Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean O. Morris

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer - Los Angeles

777 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Alana V. Tanoury

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson - Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Daniel J. Buckley

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease - Cincinnati

3500 Great American Tower, 301 East Fourth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

John R. Mitchell

Attorney at Thompson Hine - Cleveland

3900 Key Tower, 127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Martin L. Roth

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis - Chicago

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Timothy W. Knapp

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis - Chicago

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Joseph L. Franco

Attorney at Richardson Wright

2300 U.S. Bancorp Tower, 111 Southwest Fifth Avenue

Portland, OR 97204

Gregory D. Brunton

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Jason J. Blake

Attorney at Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Columbus

1200 Huntington Center, 41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Steven A. Reed

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer - New York

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

O. Judson Scheaf, III

Attorney at Hahn, Loeser & Parks - Columbus

65 East State Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Other Attorneys

Sandra K. Zerrusen

Attorney at Jackson Kelly - Akron

50 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

James A. DeRoche

Attorney at Garson Johnson

1600 Midland Bldg., 101 Prospect Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44115

Justin E. Rice

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Alvin L. Emch

Attorney at Jackson Kelly - Charleston

500 Lee Street, P.O. Box 553

Charleston, WV 25322

Shannon E. McClure

Attorney at Reed Smith - Philadelphia

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Andrew N. Schock

Attorney at Jackson Kelly - Akron

50 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

920 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#3956

(#3956) Plaintiffs' Bench Brief Regarding Excluding Unvaccinated Jurors From Venire Panel filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel. (Weinberger, Peter) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

3955 #2

Proof of Service

3955 #1

Schedule

3955 #3955

Main Document

3954 #2

Certificate of Service to Appearance

3954 #1

Schedule

3954 #3954

Main Document

#3953

(#3953) Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part Pharmacy Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Anna Lembke (Related Doc #3802 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/17/21.(P,R) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

3802 #1

Summary Sheet

3802 #3802

Main Document

#8

(#8) Attorney Appearance of Gretchen Freeman Cappio by Derek W. Loeser filed by on behalf of City of Tacoma. (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#7

(#7) Notice of Organizational Meeting for Plaintiffs' Counsel ONLY scheduled for Monday, December 18, 2017 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#6

(#6) Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on December 13, 2017 before Judge Polster, Court Reporter: George Staiduhar. Requested completion date: 12/15/17 filed by City of Tacoma. (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#5

(#5) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the action(s) on the attached schedule to the Northern District of Ohio. (C,KA) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#4

(#4) Minutes of Teleconference and Scheduling Order. The Court held an initial teleconference with Counsel in this Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) on December 13, 2017. No later than 12:00 noon Eastern Time on Wednesday, December 20, 2017, Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a Motion to Approve Liaison Counsel and Steering Committees. All agreed with the Court's suggestion that it would be beneficial to appoint a Special Master to assist in handling this MDL. So, no later than 12:00 noon Eastern Time on Wednesday, December 20, 2017, Counsel shall caucus and file any recommendations of specific persons. There are currently pending 16 cases with remand motions where Defendants removed the case to federal court based ostensibly on diversity jurisdiction, contending that the non-diverse Distributor Defendants were fraudulently joined. The Court explained that it would be better to leave the motions pending for the time being for reasons stated on the record, and Counsel agreed. There is, however, one remand motion pending in a case that Defendants removed to federal court a second time, after the district judge granted plaintiffs' motion to remand. State of West Virginia, et al. v. McKesson Corp., C.A. No. 2:17-03555. The Court has directed the Clerk of Court to transfer that case back to the transferor court for a ruling on the pending motion to remand. Should the district judge deny the motion, it shall transfer the case back to this MDL. The Court has scheduled a conference beginning at 9:00 a.m. on Tuesday, January 9, 2018. This is an in-person conference for Counsel only. The Court agreed that Plaintiffs and Defendants may each email to the Court, no later than 12:00 noon Eastern Time on Friday, January 5, 2018, suggestions they believe will assist the Court in organizing and managing this MDL. The Court granted Counsel's verbal request to extend the deadline for achieving service to 60 days after the expiration of the time period under Federal Rule Civil Procedure 4(m). Because the Court is still in the early stages of organizing the MDL, the Court has put a moratorium on all filings, other than the ones mentioned herein, for 60 days. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/14/2017 (C,KA) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#3

(#3) Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 12/13/17 before Judge Polster, Court Reporter: George Studehar. Requested completion date: 12/15/17 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#2

(#2) Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on December 13, 2017 before Judge Polster, Court Reporter: George Staiduhar. Requested completion date: December 18, 2017 filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Buckley, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#1

(#1) Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the 64 listed cases to the Northern District of Ohio. (C,KA) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

3,303 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3956) Plaintiffs' Bench Brief Regarding Excluding Unvaccinated Jurors From Venire Panel filed by Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel. (Weinberger, Peter) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3955) FILING ERROR - FILED ON WRONG DOCKET Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noramco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule, #2 Proof of Service)(Mowen, Kelly) Modified on 9/20/2021 (P,R). (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3954) FILING ERROR - FILED ON WRONG DOCKET Attorney Appearance for CTO 204 and 206 by Kelly Calder Mowen in WVS/2:21-cv-00461, WVS/5:21-cv-00463, and WVS/5 :21-cv-00473 filed by on behalf of Noramco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule, #2 Certificate of Service to Appearance)(Mowen, Kelly) Modified on 9/20/2021 (P,R). (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3953) Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part Pharmacy Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Anna Lembke (Related Doc #3802 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/17/21.(P,R) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3952) Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by County of Trumbull. (Gallucci, Frank) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3951) Order Permitting Remote Livestreaming of Trial Testimony and Proceedings. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/16/21. (P,R) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3950) Marginal Entry Order regarding Defendants' Motion To Exclude Certain Expert Testimony Based on Track One Arguments (Related Doc #3797 ). The motion is denied, for the reasons stated in the Court's orders addressing all of the parties' Daubert motions filed in Track One, which are incorporated by reference. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/14/21.(P,R) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3949) Opinion and Order denying #3804 Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Craig McCann. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/13/21. (P,R) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3948) Opinion and Order denying #3805 Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Dr. Caleb Alexander. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/13/21. (P,R) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3947) Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part Defendants Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Carmen Catizone. (Related Doc #3800 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/13/21.(P,R) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,114 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Attorney Appearance of Gretchen Freeman Cappio by Derek W. Loeser filed by on behalf of City of Tacoma. (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Organizational Meeting for Plaintiffs' Counsel ONLY scheduled for Monday, December 18, 2017 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on December 13, 2017 before Judge Polster, Court Reporter: George Staiduhar. Requested completion date: 12/15/17 filed by City of Tacoma. (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the action(s) on the attached schedule to the Northern District of Ohio. (C,KA) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Minutes of Teleconference and Scheduling Order. The Court held an initial teleconference with Counsel in this Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) on December 13, 2017. No later than 12:00 noon Eastern Time on Wednesday, December 20, 2017, Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a Motion to Approve Liaison Counsel and Steering Committees. All agreed with the Court's suggestion that it would be beneficial to appoint a Special Master to assist in handling this MDL. So, no later than 12:00 noon Eastern Time on Wednesday, December 20, 2017, Counsel shall caucus and file any recommendations of specific persons. There are currently pending 16 cases with remand motions where Defendants removed the case to federal court based ostensibly on diversity jurisdiction, contending that the non-diverse Distributor Defendants were fraudulently joined. The Court explained that it would be better to leave the motions pending for the time being for reasons stated on the record, and Counsel agreed. There is, however, one remand motion pending in a case that Defendants removed to federal court a second time, after the district judge granted plaintiffs' motion to remand. State of West Virginia, et al. v. McKesson Corp., C.A. No. 2:17-03555. The Court has directed the Clerk of Court to transfer that case back to the transferor court for a ruling on the pending motion to remand. Should the district judge deny the motion, it shall transfer the case back to this MDL. The Court has scheduled a conference beginning at 9:00 a.m. on Tuesday, January 9, 2018. This is an in-person conference for Counsel only. The Court agreed that Plaintiffs and Defendants may each email to the Court, no later than 12:00 noon Eastern Time on Friday, January 5, 2018, suggestions they believe will assist the Court in organizing and managing this MDL. The Court granted Counsel's verbal request to extend the deadline for achieving service to 60 days after the expiration of the time period under Federal Rule Civil Procedure 4(m). Because the Court is still in the early stages of organizing the MDL, the Court has put a moratorium on all filings, other than the ones mentioned herein, for 60 days. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/14/2017 (C,KA) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 12/13/17 before Judge Polster, Court Reporter: George Studehar. Requested completion date: 12/15/17 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weinberger, Peter) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on December 13, 2017 before Judge Polster, Court Reporter: George Staiduhar. Requested completion date: December 18, 2017 filed by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Buckley, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the 64 listed cases to the Northern District of Ohio. (C,KA) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (C,KA) Modified filed date 12/12/2017 (C,KA). (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketJudge Dan Aaron A. Polster(MDL2804) assigned to case. (C,KA) (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Prescription Opiate Litigation is a litigant

Latest cases where Allergan Finance LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Insys Therapeutics, Inc. is a litigant