Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 12:27:14 (UTC).

In Re: Monsanto Company Genetically-Engineered Wheat Litigation

Case Summary

On 10/18/2013 In Re Monsanto Company Genetically-Engineered Wheat Litigation was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gwynne E. Birzer and Kathryn H. Vratil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:13-MD-02473

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gwynne E. Birzer

Presiding Judge

Kathryn H. Vratil

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

High Hopes, Inc.

Crouch Farms Partnership

Joseph Kent Farms, LLC

Michelle Hyer

William R. Bass

Kurt Hinkle

Shirley Wishon

DPJV

Othel Gamble, Jr.

Ed Eakin

Center for Food Safety

Dreger Enterprises

Behrend, Behrend & Knittel Farms

Neil Jeske

Dwight Ediger

Rudolf Farm, LLC

Ernest Barnes

Gene Crouch

Dianne Eakin

In Re

All Plaintiffs (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY)

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Sean Biviano

Attorney at Scott Law Group

926 West Sprague, Suite 680

Spokane, WA 99201-5076

Joseph Guglielmo

Attorney at Scott + Scott Attorneys at Law LLP

405 Lexington Avenue, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Gregory L. Davis

Attorney at Davis & Taliaferro LLC

7031 Halcyon Park Drive

Montgomery, AL 36117

Patrick W. Pendley

Attorney at Pendley Baudin & Coffin, LLP

Po Box 71

Plaquemine, LA 70765-0071

Kim D. Stephens

Attorney at Tousley Brain Stephens PLLC

1700 Seventh Avenue, Suite 2200

Seattle, WA 98101-7332

Mindy Pava

Attorney at Hausfeld LLP

1700 K. Street Northwest, Suite 650

Washington, DC 20006

Donna F. Solen

Attorney at Kimbrell Kimbrell & Solen LLC

660 Pennsylvania Avenue Se, Suite 302

Washington, DC 20003

Steven B. Andersen

Attorney at Andersen Banducci PLLC

101 S. Capitol Blvd., Suite 1600

Boise, ID 83702

Robert Ahdoot

Attorney at Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC

1016 Palm Avenue

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Theodore W. Maya

Attorney at Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC

1016 Palm Avenue

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Larry D. Lahman

Attorney at Mitchell & Declerck PLLC

202 West Broadway

Enid, OK 73701

Nicholas A. Kahl

Attorney at D'Amore Law Group, PC

4230 Galewood Street, Suite 200

Lake Oswego, OR 97035

Other Attorneys

Andrew D. Prins

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP - DC

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Daniel C. Occhipinti

Attorney at Stoel Rives, LLP - Portland

900 Sw Fifth Avenue, Suite 2600

Portland, OR 97204

David R. Goodnight

Attorney at Stoel Rives, LLP - Seattle

600 University Street, Suite 3600

Seattle, WA 98101

Edward C. Duckers

Attorney at Stoel Rives, LLP - San Francisco

Three Embarcadero Center, Suite 1120

San Francisco, CA 94111

Christopher M. Staine

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy - OKC

20 North Broadway Avenue, Suite 1800

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Sarah Sterling Starns

Attorney at Barrett Law Group, PA

Po Box 927, 404 Court Square North

Lexington, MS 39095

Weldon N. Johnson

Attorney at Weldon N. Johnson, LLC

10 Moselle, Suite 100

Florissant, MO 63031

Drew C. Ensign

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP - DC

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

110 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#77

(#77) MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Plaintiffs Gene Crouch, Crouch Farms Partnership. (Byrd, John) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

#75

(#75) ORDER sustaining #74 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice as to Case No. 5:14-cv-04059-DDC-GLR Lois E. Barnes, et al vs. Monsanto Co.; Case No. 2:13-cv-02570-KHV-KMH William R. Bass, et al vs. Monsanto Co.; Case No. 2:13-cv-02573-KHV-KHM Michael G. Gamble, et al vs. Monsanto Co.; Case No. 2:13-cv-02567-KHV-KHM Haskell Family Partnership vs. Monsanto Co.; Case No. 2:13-cv-02559-KHV-KHM Howard Hinkle, et al vs. Monsanto Co.; Case No. 2:13-cv-02565-KHV-KHM Joseph Kent Farms LLC vs. Monsanto Co.; and Case No. 2:13-cv-02557-KHV-KHM Little Omega Farms vs. Monsanto Co. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 05/07/2015. (mg) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#73

(#73) ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE Regarding #14-4059: Parties shall file their stipulation of dismissal by 05/23/2015 in both this MDL, and also in individual case #14-4059-KHV. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 03/23/2015. (mg) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

#72

(#72) ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE Regarding #13-2573: Parties shall file their stipulation of dismissal by 05/23/2015 in both this MDL, and also in individual case #13-2573-KHV. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 03/23/2015. (mg) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

#53

No Description Available

#48

No Description Available

#43

No Description Available

#35

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

21 #1

Exhibit

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

11 #1

ECF Registration Form

#6

No Description Available

#1

(#2) LETTER sent to all designated District Courts on Schedule A of the #1 Transfer Order requesting electronic case transfer pursuant to the #1 Transfer Order by the MDL Panel filed 10/18/13. (mm) (Entered: 10/18/2013)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2015
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. See Docket Annotation of 08/14/2015. (mg) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Pursuant to docket entries #75 and #78 these MDL proceedings have concluded and MDL 2473 has been flagged as CLOSED. (mg) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) ORDER sustaining #77 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. The matter entitled Case No. 2:14-cv-02285 Gene Crouch, et al. v. Monsanto Co. be and hereby is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 08/14/2015. (mg) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Plaintiffs Gene Crouch, Crouch Farms Partnership. (Byrd, John) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • (#76) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Gwynne E. Birzer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 07/02/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aa) (Entered: 07/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) ORDER sustaining #74 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice as to Case No. 5:14-cv-04059-DDC-GLR Lois E. Barnes, et al vs. Monsanto Co.; Case No. 2:13-cv-02570-KHV-KMH William R. Bass, et al vs. Monsanto Co.; Case No. 2:13-cv-02573-KHV-KHM Michael G. Gamble, et al vs. Monsanto Co.; Case No. 2:13-cv-02567-KHV-KHM Haskell Family Partnership vs. Monsanto Co.; Case No. 2:13-cv-02559-KHV-KHM Howard Hinkle, et al vs. Monsanto Co.; Case No. 2:13-cv-02565-KHV-KHM Joseph Kent Farms LLC vs. Monsanto Co.; and Case No. 2:13-cv-02557-KHV-KHM Little Omega Farms vs. Monsanto Co. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 05/07/2015. (mg) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Plaintiffs Lois E. Barnes, William R. Bass, Gamble Cattle, Dianne Eakin, Ed Eakin, Michael G. Gamble, Othel Gamble, Jr., Haskell Family Partnership, Howard Hinkle, Kurt Hinkle, Hinkle Cattle Comany, Inc., Joseph Kent Farms, LLC, Keller Grain Company, Inc., Little Omega Farms, Aurelia K. Moyer. (Pendley, Patrick) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE Regarding #14-4059: Parties shall file their stipulation of dismissal by 05/23/2015 in both this MDL, and also in individual case #14-4059-KHV. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 03/23/2015. (mg) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE Regarding #13-2573: Parties shall file their stipulation of dismissal by 05/23/2015 in both this MDL, and also in individual case #13-2573-KHV. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 03/23/2015. (mg) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE Regarding #13-2570: Parties shall file their stipulation of dismissal by 05/23/2015 in both this MDL, and also in individual case #13-2570-KHV. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 03/23/2015. (mg) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2013
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Esatern District of Washington, Civil Case 13-2554-KHV-KMH pursuant to MDL 2473 Transfer Order. (mm) (Entered: 11/04/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER sent to all designated District Courts on Schedule A of #3 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) requesting electronic case transfer. (mm) (Entered: 10/30/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) Bass et al. v. Monsanto Company (ILS), Joseph Kent Farms LLC. v. Monsanto Company (LAM), Little Omega Farms v. Monsanto Company (MSS), Delta AG v. Monsanto Company (MOE), Wishon et al. v. Monsanto Company (OKW), Hyer et al. v. Monsanto Company (OKW), Ediger v. Monsanto Company (OR), Howard v. Monsanto Company (TXN) and Jeske v. Monsanto Company (WAE). (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(mm) (Entered: 10/30/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from District of Idaho, Civil Case 13-2545-KHV-KMH pursuant to MDL 2473 Transfer Order. (mm) (Entered: 10/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from District of Oregon, Civil Case 13-2543-KHV-KMH pursuant to MDL 2473 Transfer Order. (mm) (Entered: 10/22/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Washington, Civil Case 13-2541-KHV-KMH pursuant to MDL 2473 Transfer Order. (mm) (Entered: 10/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from Eastern District of Washington, Civil Case 13-2537-KHV-KMH pursuant to MDL 2473 Transfer Order. (mm) (Entered: 10/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Receipt of original record from District of Kansas, Civil Case 13-1218-KHV-KMH pursuant to MDL 2473 Transfer Order. (mm) (Entered: 10/18/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LETTER sent to all designated District Courts on Schedule A of the #1 Transfer Order requesting electronic case transfer pursuant to the #1 Transfer Order by the MDL Panel filed 10/18/13. (mm) (Entered: 10/18/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRANSFER ORDER by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Monsanto Company Genetically-Engineered Wheat Litigation (MDL 2473). Signed by deputy clerk on 10/18/2013. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(mm) (Entered: 10/18/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward C. Duckers

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher M. Staine

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew D. Prins