This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2018 at 10:34:08 (UTC).

In Re: MF Global Holdings Ltd.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 In Re MF Global Holdings Ltd was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Sweet. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-00742

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Sweet

 

Party Details

Appellant

Allied World Assurance Company, Ltd.

Appellees and Debtors

MF Global Holdings LTD.

MF Global Assigned Assets LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Omid H. Nasab

Daniel Slifkin

Appellee Attorneys

Bruce S Bennett

James Matthew Gross

Edward Michael Joyce

David William Steuber

Jane Rue Wittstein

 

Court Documents

#17

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) OPINION re: (4 in 1:17-cv-00742-RWS) MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Allied World Assurance Company, Ltd.: Defendants Allied World Assurance Co. Ltd. ("Allied World"), Iron-Starr Excess Agency Ltd., Ironshore Insurance Ltd., St arr Insurance & Reinsurance Ltd. (collectively, the "Iron-Starr Defendants" and, collectively with Allied World, the "Bermuda Insurers") have several motions presently before the Court. The Bermuda Insurers seek leave to appeal th e United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York's (the "Bankruptcy Court") January 12, 2017, order granting a preliminary injunction for Plaintiffs MF Global Holdings, Ltd. ("MFGH"), MF Global Assigned Assets LLC ("MFGAA," collectively with MFGH, "Plaintiffs") and finding the Bermuda Insurers in contempt for violating the Bankruptcy Court's December 21, 2016, temporary restraining order. The Bermuda Insurers have also moved , either as of right or with leave of the Court, to appeal the Bankruptcy Court's January 23, 2017, order finding that the Bermuda Insurers violated the Barton doctrine and requiring that their Bermuda proceeding be terminated. For the foregoing reasons, the Allied World's motion to appeal as of right the Bankruptcy Court's Barton Order and motions for leave to appeal the Bankruptcy Court's Barton Order, preliminary injunction, and contempt order are denied. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/28/2017) (jwh) Modified on 6/29/2017 (jwh).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less