This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2018 at 07:14:12 (UTC).

In Re Marc G. Reich

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 In Re Marc G Reich was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and John D. Early. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-MC-00024

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jose R. Valdez

United States of America

Defendants and Petitioners

Marc G. Reich

Newport Beach, CA 92660

PMC Medicare Choice, Inc.

MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc.

Aveta, Inc.

MMM Holdings, Inc.

MMM Healthcare, Inc.

In Re

Marc G. Reich Subpoena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Marc G Reich

Attorney at Reich Radcliffe and Hoover LLP

4675 Macarthur Court Suite 550

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Adam T Hoover

Attorney at Reich Radcliffe and Hoover LLP

4675 Macarthur Court Suite 550

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

Russell Hayman

Attorney at McDermott Will and Emery LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3218

Jennifer Routh

Attorney at McDermott Will and Emery LLP

500 North Capitol Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Michael S Nadel

Attorney at McDermott Will and Emery LLP

600 13Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005-3096

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

15 #2

Proposed Order

15 #1

Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#10

1 #5

Appendix Index and Appendix of Reich Exhibits

1 #4

Declaration Declaration and Exhibits of Routh

1 #3

Declaration Declaration of Spach

1 #2

Declaration Declaration of Hoover

1 #1

Declaration Declaration of Reich

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) (IN CHAMBERS) The Court sets the Movant Marc G. Reich's Objections #17 to the Order of Magistrate Judge Early #16 for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 1:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. Any response to the objections shall be filed by 10/1/2018 and any reply to the response is due by 10/9/2018. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) OBJECTIONS to Order on Motion to Quash Subpoena #16 filed by Movant Marc G. Reich. (Hoover, Adam) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE MOTION TO QUASH #1 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: The Motion to Quash is DENIED. (see document for further information) (hr) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer B. Routh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Aveta, Inc., MMM Healthcare, Inc., MMM Holdings, Inc., MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc., PMC Medicare Choice, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 8/17/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22276078) filed by Defendants in Underlying Action Aveta, Inc., MMM Healthcare, Inc., MMM Holdings, Inc., MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc., PMC Medicare Choice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Hayman, Russell) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) BRIEF filed by Plaintiff-Relator Jose R. Valdez. regarding MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District,, #1 . (Williams, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer B. Routh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Aveta, Inc., MMM Healthcare, Inc., MMM Holdings, Inc., MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc., PMC Medicare Choice, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previou #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer B. Routh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Aveta, Inc., MMM Healthcare, Inc., MMM Holdings, Inc., MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc., PMC Medicare Choice, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/17/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22276078) filed by Defendants Aveta, Inc., MMM Healthcare, Inc., MMM Holdings, Inc., MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc., PMC Medicare Choice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hayman, Russell) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Nadel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Aveta, Inc., MMM Healthcare, Inc., MMM Holdings, Inc., MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc., PMC Medicare Choice, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22276894) filed by Defendants Aveta, Inc., MMM Healthcare, Inc., MMM Holdings, Inc., MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc., PMC Medicare Choice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hayman, Russell) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer B. Routh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Aveta, Inc., MMM Healthcare, Inc., MMM Holdings, Inc., MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc., PMC Medicare Choice, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22276078) filed by Defendants Aveta, Inc., MMM Healthcare, Inc., MMM Holdings, Inc., MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc., PMC Medicare Choice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hayman, Russell) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE BRIEFING OF MOTION TO QUASH #1 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: As there currently is no hearing date, the Court hereby sets the filing deadline for any supplemental memoranda as fourteen days from the date of this Order, at which time, barring further order of the Court, the matter will be under submission. (see document for further information) (hr) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants in Underlying Action Aveta, Inc., MMM Healthcare, Inc., MMM Holdings, Inc., MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc., PMC Medicare Choice, Inc., identifying Collaborative Care Holdings, LLC; Optum Health Holdings, LLC; Optum, Inc.; United HealthCare Services, Inc.; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (publicly traded); Innovacare, Inc.. (Hayman, Russell) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re: Proposed Order on Motion to Quash re MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District,, #1 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoover, Adam) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: MISC - JOINT STIPULATION RE: MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA SERVED ON MARC G. REICH-Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Proposed Order is Missing (ghap) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer Routh. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael Nadel. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Marc G. Reich, (Hoover, Adam) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) JOINT STIPULATION RE: MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA SERVED ON MARC G. REICH-MOTION RELATED TO A SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: 0973-22190728 - Fee: $47, filed by Movant Marc G. Reich. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Reich, #2 Declaration Declaration of Hoover, #3 Declaration Declaration of Spach, #4 Declaration Declaration and Exhibits of Routh, #5 Appendix Index and Appendix of Reich Exhibits) (Attorney Adam T Hoover added to party Marc G. Reich(pty:mov))(Hoover, Adam) Modified on 8/2/2018 (ghap). (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MMM Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Hayman