This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/21/2018 at 07:31:47 (UTC).

In Re: Katy Industries, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2018 In Re Katy Industries, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01081

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Appellant

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Katy Industries, Inc.

Debtor

Katy Industries, Inc.

Defendant

Katy Industries, Inc. et al

Appellees

Victory Park Management, LLC

Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC

Jansan Acquisition, LLC

VPC SBIC I, L.P.

Charles Asfour

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee and Appellant Attorneys

Steven K. Kortanek

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801-1621

Joseph N. Argentina, Jr.

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801-1621

Patrick A. Jackson

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801-1621

Jeremy W. Ryan

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Robert A. Weber

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Rodney Square, 920 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (jcs) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

1 #3

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

1 #2

Order on Appeal

1 #1

Opinion

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on July 6, 2018 by Judge Kevin J. Carey in Bankruptcy case number 17-50937. - filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Katy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Opinion, #2 Order on Appeal, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(jcs) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • (#3) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Monday, August 13, 2018, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerk's Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/23/2018. (fms) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (jcs) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (jcs) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (jcs) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on July 6, 2018 by Judge Kevin J. Carey in Bankruptcy case number 17-50937. - filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Katy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Opinion, #2 Order on Appeal, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(jcs) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Victory Park Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven K. Kortanek Esq.