This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/03/2018 at 05:25:50 (UTC).

In Re: J.T. Thorpe, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 In Re J T Thorpe, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia A. Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01451

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

 

Party Details

Appellants

Michael J. Mandelbrot

Novato, CA 94945

The Mandelbrot Law Firm

Debtors

Thorpe Insulation Company

J.T. Thorpe, Inc.

Defendant

J.T. Thorpe, Inc. et al

Appellees

J.T. Thorpe Settlement Trust

Thorpe Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Michael J Mandelbrot

Attorney at Mandelbrot Law Firm

1223 Grand Avenue Suite C

Novato, CA 94945

Appellee Attorneys

Daniel Jay Bussel

Attorney at Klee Tuchin Bogdanoff and Stern LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars 39Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6049

Sasha M Gurvitz

Attorney at Klee Tuchin Bogdanoff and Stern LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars 39Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

USBC Docket Sheet

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (et) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 2/20/2018. (et) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION. Re: Supplemental Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered on 2/8/2018 by Bankruptcy Judge Sheri Bluebond, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 2/20/2018. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:02-bk-14216-BB, Adversary number: 2:12-ap-02182-B, BAP case number: NONE., filed by Appellants Michael J. Mandelbrot, The Mandelbrot Law Firm. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket Sheet) (et) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JT THORPE & SON INC is a litigant

Latest cases where THORPE INSULATION COMPANY is a litigant