This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2018 at 08:11:57 (UTC).

In Re: James Quezada and Simona Quezada

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 In Re James Quezada and Simona Quezada was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00797

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Appellants and In Re

James Quezada

Simona Quezada

Defendant

James Quezada and Simona Quezada

Appellee

Internal Revenue Service

Trustee

U.S. Trustee's Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and In Re Attorneys

Michael V. Baumer

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Baumer

7600 Burnet Road, Suite 530

Austin, TX 78757

Michael Lynn Cook

Attorney at Cook Brooks Johnson PLLC

7800 N. Mopac Expressway, Suite 215

Austin, TX 78759

Appellee Attorney

Thomas M. Herrin

Attorney at U.S. Dept. of Justice

717 N. Harwood, Ste. 400

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension

#6

(#6) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief by James Quezada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension)(Cook, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance of Counsel Michael L. Cook by James Quezada. (Cook, Michael) Modified on 11/9/2018 to correct event (td). (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ORAL ARGUMENT. Appellant Brief due by 11/19/2018, Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/2/2019, Appellee Brief due by 12/19/2018, Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 1/18/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) Modified on 11/9/2018 (td). (Entered: 10/22/2018)

3 #3

Complete Docket Sheet

3 #2

Individual Designations

3 #1

Appellant's Designation

#3

(#3) Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. COMPLETE RECORD Filed (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation, #2 Individual Designations, #3 Complete Docket Sheet) (Wallace, Adam) Plaintiffs and Defendants Exhibits introduced at trial not available electronically. Modified on 10/22/2018 to add text (td). (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#2

(#2) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted. (afd) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

1 #4

List of Parties

1 #3

Docket sheet

1 #2

Order and Judgment

1 #1

Notice of Appeal

#1

(#1) Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order and Judgment, #3 Docket sheet, #4 List of Parties) (kc) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief by James Quezada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension)(Cook, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction: re #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Michael L. Cook. Filer selected wrong event, correction has been made. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (td) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction: re #4 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings. Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 1/18/2019 02:00 PM. (td) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Appearance of Counsel Michael L. Cook by James Quezada. (Cook, Michael) Modified on 11/9/2018 to correct event (td). (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 1/18/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ORAL ARGUMENT. Appellant Brief due by 11/19/2018, Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/2/2019, Appellee Brief due by 12/19/2018, Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 1/18/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) Modified on 11/9/2018 (td). (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. COMPLETE RECORD Filed (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation, #2 Individual Designations, #3 Complete Docket Sheet) (Wallace, Adam) Plaintiffs and Defendants Exhibits introduced at trial not available electronically. Modified on 10/22/2018 to add text (td). (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted. (afd) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order and Judgment, #3 Docket sheet, #4 List of Parties) (kc) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.