This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2020 at 22:09:57 (UTC).

In Re: Gold King Mine Release in San Juan County, Colorado, on August 5, 2015

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 In Re Gold King Mine Release in San Juan County, Colorado, on August 5, 2015 was filed as an Other - Environment lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judge overseeing this case is William P. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-MD-02824

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Counter Defendants

Navajo Nation

State of New Mexico

Fannie Marie Jim

Leonard Lee

Rosina T Merritt

Jean Jones

George L Sisco

Rosemary Hart

Anita Hayes

Defendants, In Re, Cross Defendants and Counter Claimants

Gold King Mine Release in San Juan County, Colorado, on August 5, 2015

Gold King Mines Corporation

John Does

Harrison Western Corporation

Kinross Gold Corporation

Kinross Gold USA, Inc

Sunnyside Gold Corporation

United States of America

United States Environmental Protection Agency

Gina McCarthy

Environmental Restoration, LLC

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff, Cross Claimant, Counter Claimant and Cross Defendant

Environmental Restoration, LLC

Defendants, Cross Claimants, Cross Defendants and Counter Claimants

Sunnyside Gold Corporation

United States of America

United States Environmental Protection Agency

Environmental Restoration, LLC

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants, Counter Defendants and Counter Claimants

Navajo Nation

State of New Mexico

Kinross Gold Corporation

Sunnyside Gold Corporation

United States Environmental Protection Agency

Environmental Restoration, LLC

Defendant and In Re

Gold King Mine Release in San Juan County, Colorado, on August 5, 2015

336 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Andrew K Walsh

Attorney at Hueston Hennigan LLP

523 West 6Th Street, Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90014

John C Hueston

Attorney at Hueston Hennigan LLP

620 Newport Center Drive, Suite 1300

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Kasey L Mitchell

Attorney at Hueston Hennigan LLP

523 West 6Th Street, Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Moez M Kaba

Attorney at Hueston Hennihan LLP

523 West 6Th Street, Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Paul Spruhan

Attorney at Navajo Nation Department of Justice

P.O. Drawer 2010

Window Rock, AZ 86515

Cholla Khoury

Attorney at New Mexico Attorney Genderal's Office

408 Galisteo Street

Santa Fe, NM 87501

William James Jackson

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

Ann L. Al-Bahish

Attorney at Jackson Gilmour & Dobbs, PC

515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

John D.S. Gilmour

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

Jordan A Rodriguez

Attorney at Jackson Gilmour & Dobbs, PC

515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

Cross Defendant, Defendant, Cross Claimant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Bradford C. Berge

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

Post Office Box 2208, 110 N. Guadalupe St., Suite 1

Santa Fe, NM 87504-2208

Paul C. Collins

Attorney at Crowley Fleck

Po Box 2529

Billings, MT 59103-2529

Jeffery J Oven

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

Po Box 2529

Billings, MT 59103-2529

Christopher C. Stoneback

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

Post Office Box 2529

Billings, MT 59103-2529

Neil G Westesen

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

P.O. Box 10969

Bozeman, MT 59715

William G. Powers

Attorney at Barron & Budd

600 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw, 10Th Floor

Washington, DC 20037

Sarah Williams

Attorney at USDOJ

1331 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw, Room 8020S

Washington, DC 20004

Brian H. Lynk

Attorney at US Department of Justice

601 D Street Nw, #2121, Post Office Box 23986-20026-3986

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Andriy Pazuniak

Attorney at Glaser, Weil, Fink, Howard LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd., 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Brittany M. Sayer

Attorney at Childress Law Firm, LLC

6000 Uptown Blvd. Ne,, Suite 305

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Counter Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Andrew K Walsh

Attorney at Hueston Hennigan LLP

523 West 6Th Street, Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90014

John C Hueston

Attorney at Hueston Hennigan LLP

620 Newport Center Drive, Suite 1300

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Kasey L Mitchell

Attorney at Hueston Hennigan LLP

523 West 6Th Street, Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Moez M Kaba

Attorney at Hueston Hennihan LLP

523 West 6Th Street, Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Paul Spruhan

Attorney at Navajo Nation Department of Justice

P.O. Drawer 2010

Window Rock, AZ 86515

Cholla Khoury

Attorney at New Mexico Attorney Genderal's Office

408 Galisteo Street

Santa Fe, NM 87501

William James Jackson

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

Ann L. Al-Bahish

Attorney at Jackson Gilmour & Dobbs, PC

515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

John D.S. Gilmour

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

Jordan A Rodriguez

Attorney at Jackson Gilmour & Dobbs, PC

515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

Bradford C. Berge

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

Post Office Box 2208, 110 N. Guadalupe St., Suite 1

Santa Fe, NM 87504-2208

Paul C. Collins

Attorney at Crowley Fleck

Po Box 2529

Billings, MT 59103-2529

Jeffery J Oven

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

Po Box 2529

Billings, MT 59103-2529

Christopher C. Stoneback

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

Post Office Box 2529

Billings, MT 59103-2529

Neil G Westesen

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

P.O. Box 10969

Bozeman, MT 59715

William G. Powers

Attorney at Barron & Budd

600 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw, 10Th Floor

Washington, DC 20037

Sarah Williams

Attorney at USDOJ

1331 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw, Room 8020S

Washington, DC 20004

Brian H. Lynk

Attorney at US Department of Justice

601 D Street Nw, #2121, Post Office Box 23986-20026-3986

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Andriy Pazuniak

Attorney at Glaser, Weil, Fink, Howard LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd., 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Brittany M. Sayer

Attorney at Childress Law Firm, LLC

6000 Uptown Blvd. Ne,, Suite 305

Albuquerque, NM 87110

74 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#413

#412

#411

#410

#409

#408

#407

#406

#405

#8

#7

#6

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

#4

#3

#1

736 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#413) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe C Allen Plaintiffs' (Ferlic, Katherine) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#412) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe C Allen Plaintiffs' (Ferlic, Katherine) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#411) ORDER Canceling December 20, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference by Special Master Hon. Alan C. Torgerson. (Torgerson, Alan) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#410) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America Ninth Production of Documents (Lai, Albert) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#409) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America Eighth Production of Documents (Lai, Albert) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#408) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of New Mexico New Mexicos Objections and Responses to Environmental Restoration, LLCs Requests for Production of Documents, Set One and Special Interrogatories, Set One (Rowenko, Lana) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#407) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Utah RE: STATE OF UTAHS SECOND AMENDED OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO FEDERAL DEFENDANTS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (Hofer, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#406) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Utah RE: STATE OF UTAHS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATIONS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (Hofer, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#405) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Utah RE: STATE OF UTAHS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATIONS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE (Hofer, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#404) NOTICE by Sunnyside Gold Corporation CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Westesen, Neil) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
465 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2018
  • Summons Issued as to United States, United States Attorney and Weston Solutions, Inc. (jg) Modified docket text on 5/31/2018 (ln). (Entered: 05/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gina McCarthy, Environmental Restoration, LLC, Weston Solutions, Inc., United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, Kinross Gold Corporation, Sunnyside Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc., filed by State of New Mexico. (Jackson, William) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gold King Mines Corporation, Environmental Restoration, LLC, Weston Solutions, Inc., United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America, Kinross Gold Corporation, Sunnyside Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc., filed by Navajo Nation. (Kaba, Moez) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting (212) Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints in case 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF; granting (64) Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints in case 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF; granting (5) Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints in case 1:18-md-02824-WJ Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (meq) (Entered: 05/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaints by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (Kaba, Moez) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Gold King Mines Corporation Pursuant to Rule 25(a) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (Edwards, Anthony) (Entered: 04/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. Initial Conference set for 6/19/2018 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 540 Bonito Courtroom before Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (meq) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • (#2) NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 18-md-2824 WJ has been opened and assigned to District Judge William P. Johnson. See Docket for further entries.As the case proceeds, counsel may be alerted to updated case listings, or Case Management Orders in a similar fashion. However, once Liaison Counsel are appointed and shoulder the responsibility of service for documents posted in the lead case, such docket entries will no longer be necessary. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) Modified docket text on 4/5/2018 to include document number and text only language (kdh). (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson assigned. (ng) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407 the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of New Mexico are transferred to the District of New Mexico and assigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (ng) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gold King Mines Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Kinross Gold Corporation is a litigant