This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 07:13:57 (UTC).

In Re: Gawker Media, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 In Re Gawker Media, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alison J. Nathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-08252

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alison J. Nathan

 

Party Details

Appellant

Ryan Goldberg

Defendant, In Re and Debtor

Gawker Media, LLC

Appellees

Randall James Busak

Pregame LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Chelsea Kelly

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP (DC)

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Thomas G. Hentoff

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP (DC)

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Dipesh Patel

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

1270 Avenue Of The America Suite 2005

New York, NY 10020

James Charles Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP (NY)

One Battery Park Plaza

New York, NY 10004

Karen Margaret Chau

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

One Battery Park Plaza

New York, NY 10004

Christopher K. Kiplok

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP (NY)

One Battery Park Plaza

New York, NY 10004

Erin Eileen Diers

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed

One Battery Park Plaza

New York, NY 10004

Appellee Attorneys

Jonathan Laurence Flaxer

Attorney at Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe LLP

711 Third Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Michael Scott Weinstein

Attorney at Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe LLP

437 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Pursuant to the Court's October 11, 2018 Order (ECF No. 5), the parties have conferred and submit the following proposed briefing schedule to the Court: 1. Appellant's brief in this matter must be served and filed by December 17, 2018; 2. Appellees' response brief to appellant's brief must be served and filed by February 15, 2019; and 3. Appellant's reply brief must be served and filed by March 18, 2019. SO ORDERED., ( Appellant Brief due by 12/17/2018., Appellant Reply Brief due by 3/18/2018.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/18/2018) (ama) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#10

(#10) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ryan Goldberg. (Kiplok, Christopher) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Eileen Diers on behalf of Ryan Goldberg. (Diers, Erin) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Margaret Chau on behalf of Ryan Goldberg. (Chau, Karen) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Charles Fitzpatrick on behalf of Ryan Goldberg. (Fitzpatrick, James) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher K. Kiplok on behalf of Ryan Goldberg. (Kiplok, Christopher) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER: The above case has been assigned to me for all purposes. The parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule on or before October 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/11/2018) (jca) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#4

(#4) DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Ryan Goldberg. (bkar) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Dipesh Patel on behalf of Ryan Goldberg. New Address: Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP, 1270 Avenue of the Americas, Suite 2005, New York, New York, United States of America 10020, (212) 980-7200. (Patel, Dipesh) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Stuart M. Bernstein dated August 21, 2018. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 16-B-11700 (SMB). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Ryan Goldberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(bkar) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 12/17/2018. Appellant Reply Brief due by 3/18/2019. Appellee Brief due by 2/15/2019. (ama) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Pursuant to the Court's October 11, 2018 Order (ECF No. 5), the parties have conferred and submit the following proposed briefing schedule to the Court: 1. Appellant's brief in this matter must be served and filed by December 17, 2018; 2. Appellees' response brief to appellant's brief must be served and filed by February 15, 2019; and 3. Appellant's reply brief must be served and filed by March 18, 2019. SO ORDERED., ( Appellant Brief due by 12/17/2018., Appellant Reply Brief due by 3/18/2018.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/18/2018) (ama) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ryan Goldberg. (Kiplok, Christopher) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Eileen Diers on behalf of Ryan Goldberg. (Diers, Erin) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Margaret Chau on behalf of Ryan Goldberg. (Chau, Karen) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Charles Fitzpatrick on behalf of Ryan Goldberg. (Fitzpatrick, James) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher K. Kiplok on behalf of Ryan Goldberg. (Kiplok, Christopher) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: The above case has been assigned to me for all purposes. The parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule on or before October 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/11/2018) (jca) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Ryan Goldberg. (bkar) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Dipesh Patel on behalf of Ryan Goldberg. New Address: Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP, 1270 Avenue of the Americas, Suite 2005, New York, New York, United States of America 10020, (212) 980-7200. (Patel, Dipesh) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bkar) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Stuart M. Bernstein dated August 21, 2018. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 16-B-11700 (SMB). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Ryan Goldberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(bkar) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.