This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2018 at 07:39:09 (UTC).

In re: F-Squared Investment Management LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 In re F-Squared Investment Management LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01214

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Appellant

Craig Jalbert

Defendant

F-Squared Investment Management LLC, et al

Appellees

John Greg Whitaker

Rooker Price

Walter Hartford

Zachary Zeltsan

Stephen Degnan

Svitlana Senenko

Evgeny Burnaev

Michael Fardy

William Monahan

William McNamara

Lisa Quinn

Nicole Miller

Brian Doherty

Adam Graves

Elena Zarubina

Shannon Price

Mark Ramunno

Robert Gottlieb

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Jason Anthony Gibson

Attorney at The Rosner Law Group LLC

824 Market Street, Suite 810

Wilmington, DE 19801

Frederick Brian Rosner

Attorney at The Rosner Law Group LLC

824 Market Street, Suite 810

Wilmington, DE 19801

Appellee Attorney

Julia Bettina Klein

Attorney at Klein LLC

919 N. Market Street, Suite 600

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#9

#12

10 #1

Transmittal

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

#2

1 #3

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

1 #2

Order regarding Reconsidereation of Prior Order

1 #1

Order on Appeal

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST for Oral Argument by Craig Jalbert re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter /Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction. (Gibson, Jason) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORAL ORDER: Having received a recommendation #9 from Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge that this matter be withdrawn from the mandatory referral for mediation and proceed through the appellate process of this Court, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the recommendation is ACCEPTED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/4/18. (ntl) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Denying Motion To Waive Fees In Connection With Filing Notices of Appeal. Signed by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein on 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal) (nmg) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/13/18. (cak) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter /Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction (Corrected Reply to Address Formatting Errors in Case Caption and Paragraph 11) filed by Evgeny Burnaev, Stephen Degnan, Brian Doherty, Michael Fardy, Robert Gottlieb, Adam Graves, Walter Hartford, Craig Jalbert, Kate Kinlin, William McNamara, Emily Meyer, Nicole Miller, William Monahan, Alexey Panchekha, Rooker Price, Shannon Price, Lisa Quinn, Mark Ramunno, Svitlana Senenko, John Greg Whitaker, Elena Zarubina, Zachary Zeltsan. (Klein, Julia) (Entered: 09/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter /Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction filed by Evgeny Burnaev, Stephen Degnan, Brian Doherty, Michael Fardy, Robert Gottlieb, Adam Graves, Walter Hartford, Craig Jalbert, Kate Kinlin, William McNamara, Emily Meyer, Nicole Miller, William Monahan, Alexey Panchekha, Rooker Price, Shannon Price, Lisa Quinn, Mark Ramunno, Svitlana Senenko, John Greg Whitaker, Elena Zarubina, Zachary Zeltsan. (Klein, Julia) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) OBJECTIONS by Craig Jalbert to the Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Gibson, Jason) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter /Lack of Appellate Jurisdiction - filed by Evgeny Burnaev, Stephen Degnan, Brian Doherty, Michael Fardy, Robert Gottlieb, Adam Graves, Walter Hartford, Kate Kinlin, William McNamara, Emily Meyer, Nicole Miller, William Monahan, Alexey Panchekha, Rooker Price, Shannon Price, Lisa Quinn, Mark Ramunno, Svitlana Senenko, John Greg Whitaker, Elena Zarubina, Zachary Zeltsan. (Klein, Julia) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Craig Jalbert //Appellant's Statement of Issues and Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gibson, Jason) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Docket(#3) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Tuesday, September 4, 2018, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerk's Office of the District Court. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/10/2018. (fms) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (jcs) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (jcs) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (jcs) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Orders entered on November 27, 2017 and July 30, 2018 by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 15-11469. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Craig Jalbert. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Order regarding Reconsidereation of Prior Order, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(jcs) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where F-Squared Investment Management LLC, et al is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick Brian Rosner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason A. Gibson