This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:28 (UTC).

In Re: Erick Estrada Greene

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 In Re Erick Estrada Greene was filed as a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sean P. Flynn and James S. Moody, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-MC-00073

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

 

Party Details

Defendant and In Re

Erick Estrada Greene

Tampa, FL 33682

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) AFFIDAVIT of Ownership by Erick Estrada Greene. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LSS) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

2 #1

Mailing Envelope

1 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of service by Erick Estrada Greene. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LSS) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of service by Erick Estrada Greene. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LSS) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) AFFIDAVIT of Ownership by Erick Estrada Greene. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LSS) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.