This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2018 at 08:14:14 (UTC).

In Re: Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 In Re Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Percy Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-07845

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Appellants

Paulina Lopez Lopez

Maribel Juarez Duran

Gregorio Gonzalez Martinez

Rosaelia Lopez Lopez

Araceli Zaragoza Osorio

Cesar Zaragoza Osorio

Gustavo Vegas Morales

Appellees and Debtors

Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC

Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC

Defendant

Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC et al

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Ana Karina Vicente De Castro

Attorney at California Rural Legal Assistance Inc

3 Williams Road

Salinas, CA 93905

Jose Raul Alcantar Villagran

Attorney at Nasssiri and Jung LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd 46Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Appellee Attorneys

Kevin Harvey Morse

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein and Lehr LLP

161 North Clark Street Suite 4200

Chicago, IL 60601

Barry Andrew Chatz

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein and Lehr LLP

161 North Clark Street Suite 4200

Chicago, IL 60601

David L Neale

Attorney at Levene Neale Bender Yoo and Brill LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

John-Patrick M Fritz

Attorney at Levene Neale Bender Yoo and Brill LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 11/19/2018. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#12

(#12) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment, #7 . (mrgo) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John-Patrick M Fritz counsel for Appellee Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC. Adding John-Patrick M. Fritz as counsel of record for Liquidating Trustee for Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Liquidating Trustee to Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC Liquidating Trustee to Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC. (Attorney John-Patrick M Fritz added to party Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC(pty:e))(Fritz, John-Patrick) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David L Neale counsel for Appellee Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC. Adding David L. Neale as counsel of record for Liquidating Trustee for Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Liquidating Trustee to Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC Liquidating Trustee to Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC. (Attorney David L Neale added to party Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC(pty:e))(Neale, David) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Appellants Maribel Juarez Duran, Paulina Lopez Lopez, Rosaelia Lopez Lopez, Gregorio Gonzalez Martinez identifying N/A as Corporate Parent. (Villagran, Jose) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Statement of Issues; Designation of Record, and Notice of Transcript not filed forwarded to Judge Percy Anderson. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Appellees Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC, Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC, identifying Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC; Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC; Rosalyn Farms, LLC. (Morse, Kevin) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#7

(#7) AMENDED JOINT NOTICE OF APPEAL: Re: Order Granting Objection to Claim No. 6; Order Granting Objection to Claim No. 8; Order Granting Objection to Claim No. 3; Order Granting Objection to Claim No. 16 entered on 9/11/18; 9/11/18; 9/12/18; 9/13/18 by Bankruptcy Judge Barry Russell, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 9/19/18. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:18-bk-10443 BR, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellants Paulina Lopez Lopez, Gregorio Gonzalez Martinez, Rosaelia Lopez Lopez, Maribel Juarez Duran, Araceli Zaragoza Osorio, Gustavo Vegas Morales, Cesar Zaragoza Osorio. (Attorney Ana Karina Vicente De Castro added to party Gustavo Vegas Morales(pty:a), Attorney Jose Raul Alcantar Villagran added to party Gustavo Vegas Morales(pty:a), Attorney Ana Karina Vicente De Castro added to party Cesar Zaragoza Osorio(pty:a), Attorney Jose Raul Alcantar Villagran added to party Cesar Zaragoza Osorio(pty:a), Attorney Ana Karina Vicente De Castro added to party Araceli Zaragoza Osorio(pty:a), Attorney Jose Raul Alcantar Villagran added to party Araceli Zaragoza Osorio(pty:a)) (mrgo) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Percy Anderson. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 9/10/2018. (car) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

1 #1

USBC Docket

#1

(#1) JOINT NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Various Lodged Orders Granting Objection to Claim [ORDERS NOT ENTERED AS OF 9/6/2018] Re: Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:18-bk-10443-BR, Adversary number: NONE, BAP case number: NONE., filed by Appellants Paulina Lopez Lopez, Gregorio Gonzalez Martinez, Rosaelia Lopez Lopez, Maribel Juarez Duran. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 11/19/2018. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment, #7 . (mrgo) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John-Patrick M Fritz counsel for Appellee Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC. Adding John-Patrick M. Fritz as counsel of record for Liquidating Trustee for Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Liquidating Trustee to Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC Liquidating Trustee to Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC. (Attorney John-Patrick M Fritz added to party Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC(pty:e))(Fritz, John-Patrick) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David L Neale counsel for Appellee Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC. Adding David L. Neale as counsel of record for Liquidating Trustee for Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Liquidating Trustee to Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC Liquidating Trustee to Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC. (Attorney David L Neale added to party Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC(pty:e))(Neale, David) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Appellants Maribel Juarez Duran, Paulina Lopez Lopez, Rosaelia Lopez Lopez, Gregorio Gonzalez Martinez identifying N/A as Corporate Parent. (Villagran, Jose) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Statement of Issues; Designation of Record, and Notice of Transcript not filed forwarded to Judge Percy Anderson. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Appellees Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC, Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC, identifying Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC; Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC; Rosalyn Farms, LLC. (Morse, Kevin) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED JOINT NOTICE OF APPEAL: Re: Order Granting Objection to Claim No. 6; Order Granting Objection to Claim No. 8; Order Granting Objection to Claim No. 3; Order Granting Objection to Claim No. 16 entered on 9/11/18; 9/11/18; 9/12/18; 9/13/18 by Bankruptcy Judge Barry Russell, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 9/19/18. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:18-bk-10443 BR, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellants Paulina Lopez Lopez, Gregorio Gonzalez Martinez, Rosaelia Lopez Lopez, Maribel Juarez Duran, Araceli Zaragoza Osorio, Gustavo Vegas Morales, Cesar Zaragoza Osorio. (Attorney Ana Karina Vicente De Castro added to party Gustavo Vegas Morales(pty:a), Attorney Jose Raul Alcantar Villagran added to party Gustavo Vegas Morales(pty:a), Attorney Ana Karina Vicente De Castro added to party Cesar Zaragoza Osorio(pty:a), Attorney Jose Raul Alcantar Villagran added to party Cesar Zaragoza Osorio(pty:a), Attorney Ana Karina Vicente De Castro added to party Araceli Zaragoza Osorio(pty:a), Attorney Jose Raul Alcantar Villagran added to party Araceli Zaragoza Osorio(pty:a)) (mrgo) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Percy Anderson. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 9/10/2018. (car) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) JOINT NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Various Lodged Orders Granting Objection to Claim [ORDERS NOT ENTERED AS OF 9/6/2018] Re: Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:18-bk-10443-BR, Adversary number: NONE, BAP case number: NONE., filed by Appellants Paulina Lopez Lopez, Gregorio Gonzalez Martinez, Rosaelia Lopez Lopez, Maribel Juarez Duran. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.