This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2018 at 08:11:11 (UTC).

In re: Dunne

Case Summary

On 09/07/2018 In re Dunne was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judges overseeing this case are Vanessa L. Bryant and Jeffrey A. Meyer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01518

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Vanessa L. Bryant

Jeffrey A. Meyer

 

Party Details

Appellant

Richard M. Coan

Defendant

Dunne

Appellees

Mountbrook USA, LLC

Barclay Beattie & Brown, LLC

350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 5720

New York, NY 10118

151 Milbank, LLC

Heagney Lennon & Slane, LLP

SRQ, LLC

Gayle Killilea

Molly Blossom LLC

TDJ21, LLC

John Dunne

Wahl, LLC

Not Classified By Court

US Trustee

150 Court St., Room 302

New Haven, CT 06510-7016

In Re

Sean Dunne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Timothy D. Miltenberger

Attorney at Coan, Lewendon, Gulliver & Miltenberger

495 Orange St.

New Haven, CT 06511

Appellee Attorneys

Timothy A. Smith

Attorney at Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - STMFD

707 Summer Street 3Rd Floor, Suite 300

Stamford, CT 06901-1026

Peter M. Nolin

Attorney at Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - STMFD

707 Summer Street 3Rd Floor, Suite 300

Stamford, CT 06901-1026

Liam S. Burke

Attorney at Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - STMFD

707 Summer Street 3Rd Floor, Suite 300

Stamford, CT 06901-1026

Michael D Margulies

Attorney at Bressler, Amery & Ross, P.C. - NJ

325 Columbia Tpke. Suite 301

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Alec P. Ostrow

Attorney at Becker, Glynn, Muffly, Chassin & Hosinski LLP

299 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10171

Philip D. Russell

Attorney at Philip Russell, L.L.C.

66 Field Point Road, P.O. Box 1437

Greenwich, CT 06836

Not Classified By Court Attorney

US Trustee

Attorney at U.S. Trustee Office

150 Court St., Room 302

New Haven, CT 06510-7016

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Richard M. Coan.Responses due by 10/22/2018 (Miltenberger, Timothy) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Richard M. Coan of Appellant Designation of the Record (Miltenberger, Timothy) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/19/2018. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Richard M. Coan of Previous Appeal Decided by Judge Meyer (Miltenberger, Timothy) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER RE: CHAMBERS PRACTICES Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/7/2018. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/7/2018. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/7/2018. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#2

(#2) USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

1 #1

Order #462

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 15-05019 13-50484, filed by Richard M. Coan. (Attachments: #1 Order #462) (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL. The Court GRANTS (Doc. #9 ) the motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal absent objection. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/2/2018. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Richard M. Coan.Responses due by 10/22/2018 (Miltenberger, Timothy) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Richard M. Coan of Appellant Designation of the Record (Miltenberger, Timothy) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/19/2018. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Richard M. Coan of Previous Appeal Decided by Judge Meyer (Miltenberger, Timothy) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER RE: CHAMBERS PRACTICES Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/7/2018. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/7/2018. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/7/2018. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 15-05019 13-50484, filed by Richard M. Coan. (Attachments: #1 Order #462) (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.