Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 20:19:38 (UTC).

IN RE: DOMESTIC AIRLINE TRAVEL ANTITRUST LITIGATION

Case Summary

On 10/13/2015 IN RE DOMESTIC AIRLINE TRAVEL ANTITRUST LITIGATION was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-MC-01404

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen Kollar-Kotelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JACK SNIADO

ARVIND SUNDAR

MICHAEL KROMAR

GAIL WARE

DELIA MELLEN

LARRY HORWITZ

TIMOTHY ST. CYR

ANOOSHIRVAN BIDGOLI

JULIA L. HOLT

MICHAEL MARTIN

BRADFORD TOMLIN

ROBERT DERINGER

LARRY MORRISON

JENNIFER M. MCMAHON

ANGELINA CHANDLER

ELIZABETH WALKER

ELLIOT J. BLUMENTHAL

Defendants

JOHN DOES 1-100

FREDERICK ISAACSON

Special Master

RICHARD A. LEVIE

Washington, DC 20004

154 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard M. Hagstrom

Attorney at HELLMUTH & JOHNSON, PLLC

8050 West 78Th Street

Edina, MN 55439

Other Attorneys

Marc H. Edelson

Attorney at EDELSON & ASSOCIATES, LLC

3 Terry Drive, Suite 205

Newtown, PA 18940

Adam J. Zapala

Attorney at COTCHETT, PITRE & MCCARTHY, LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Brent K. Nakamura

Attorney at BOIES SCHILLER FLEXNER, LLP

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 900

Oakland, CA 94612

Joseph Goldberg

Attorney at FREEDMAN BOYD HOLLANDER GOLDBERG URIAS & WARD, P.A.

20 First Plaza, Suite 700

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Richard E. Shevitz

Attorney at COHEN & MALAD LLP

One Indiana Square, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Craig D. Margolis

Attorney at VINSON & ELKINS LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 500 West

Washington, DC 20037

Linda P. Nussbaum

Attorney at NUSSBAUM LAW GROUP, P.C.

1211 Avenue Of The Americas, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10036-8718

Jack W. Lee

Attorney at MINAMI TAMAKI LLP

360 Post Street, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Thomas P. Pier

Attorney at ALIOTO LAW FIRM

One Sansome Street, 35Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Brendan Sepulveda

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Paul Thomas Denis

Attorney at DECHERT LLP

1900 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Robert N. Kaplan

Attorney at KAPLAN FOX & KILSHEIMER LLP

850 Third Avenue, 4Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Benjamin G. Bradshaw

Attorney at O'MELVENY & MYERS, LLP

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Cheryl Anne Falvey

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Terry Gross

Attorney at GROSS & BELSKY P.C.

201 Spear Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Gregory E. Del Gaizo

Attorney at ROBBINS UMEDA LLP

600 B. Street, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Raymond J. Farrow

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Vincent van Panhuys

Attorney at VINSON & ELKINS LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 500 West

Washington, DC 20037

John F. Cove, Jr.

Attorney at BOIES, SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 900

Oakland, CA 94612

134 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#379

(#379) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sweeny on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS, CHEROKII VERDUZCO (Sweeny, Charles) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#378

(#378) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Heaphy on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS, CHEROKII VERDUZCO (Heaphy, Matthew) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#377

(#377) NOTICE of Appearance by Cadio Zirpoli on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS, CHEROKII VERDUZCO (Zirpoli, Cadio) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#376

(#376) ORDER denying as premature James M. Dombroski's #355 Motion for Consideration of his Response in Lieu of Oral Argument. This Motion may be renewed at a later date. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/14/19. (DM) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#355

(#376) ORDER denying as premature James M. Dombroski's #355 Motion for Consideration of his Response in Lieu of Oral Argument. This Motion may be renewed at a later date. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/14/19. (DM) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

300 #30

Exhibit 28

300 #29

Exhibit 27

300 #26

Exhibit 24

300 #25

Exhibit 23

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Edward Mason on behalf of SHAWN JAIN (Mason, Gary) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabet C. Pritzker on behalf of LARISSA D. KOSITS (Pritzker, Elizabet) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Joseph Bruckner on behalf of JONATHAN SCHUMACHER (Bruckner, W.) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven N. Williams on behalf of STEPHANIE JUNG. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#5

(#5) ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Azra Z. Mehdi on behalf of James L Stewart Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-01404-CKK, 1:15-cv-01816-CKK(Mehdi, Azra) Modified on 11/4/2015 (znmw). (Entered: 11/03/2015)

#4

MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). Pursuant to the Court's #4 Initial Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, no more than one attorney for each Plaintiff may enter an appearance on the Master Docket. The Order further indicates that "Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of the Court with the name of one counsel to be the attorney of record, and the Clerk shall remove all other listed attorneys for that Plaintiff from the Master Docket." The parties shall notify the Clerk of the Court of the one counsel of record for each Plaintiff by filing an Entry of Appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) on the Master Docket. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 4, 2015. (NS) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#3

(#3) COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) dated 8/28/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2656) (ztnr) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

#2

(#2) COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) dated 10/23/2015 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Colleen Kollar-Kotelly for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2656) (ztnr) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#1

(#1) COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER dated 10/13/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2656) (ztnr) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

687 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#379) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sweeny on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS, CHEROKII VERDUZCO (Sweeny, Charles) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#378) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Heaphy on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS, CHEROKII VERDUZCO (Heaphy, Matthew) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#377) NOTICE of Appearance by Cadio Zirpoli on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS, CHEROKII VERDUZCO (Zirpoli, Cadio) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#376) ORDER denying as premature James M. Dombroski's #355 Motion for Consideration of his Response in Lieu of Oral Argument. This Motion may be renewed at a later date. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/14/19. (DM) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#375) ORDER GRANTING in part and STAYING in part Plaintiffs' #300 Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Reasonable Litigation Expenses and Award of Future Litigation Expenses. Plaintiffs' request for reimbursement of litigation expenses in the total amount of $1,573,192.48 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' request for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Future Litigation Expenses remains STAYED by this Court, pursuant to its January 4, 2019 Minute Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/14/19. (DM) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#374) MEMORANDUM OPINION Re: Plaintiffs' #299 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreements with Southwest and American. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/09/2019. (DM) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#373) ORDER granting #299 Motion for Settlement with Southwest Airlines Co. and American Airlines, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/9/19.(dot) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#372) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth R. Gassman on behalf of STEVEN YENINAS (Gassman, Seth) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#371) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Thomas Gallagher on behalf of STEVEN YENINAS (Gallagher, Paul) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#370) STIPULATION Regarding Travel Agents and Brokers by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Scherrer, Hilary) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
421 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Edward Mason on behalf of SHAWN JAIN (Mason, Gary) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabet C. Pritzker on behalf of LARISSA D. KOSITS (Pritzker, Elizabet) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Joseph Bruckner on behalf of JONATHAN SCHUMACHER (Bruckner, W.) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven N. Williams on behalf of STEPHANIE JUNG. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). Pursuant to the Court's #4 Initial Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, no more than one attorney for each Plaintiff may enter an appearance on the Master Docket. The Order further indicates that "Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of the Court with the name of one counsel to be the attorney of record, and the Clerk shall remove all other listed attorneys for that Plaintiff from the Master Docket." The parties shall notify the Clerk of the Court of the one counsel of record for each Plaintiff by filing an Entry of Appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) on the Master Docket. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 4, 2015. (NS) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Azra Z. Mehdi on behalf of James L Stewart Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-01404-CKK, 1:15-cv-01816-CKK(Mehdi, Azra) Modified on 11/4/2015 (znmw). (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INITIAL PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 30, 2015. (NS) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) dated 8/28/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2656) (ztnr) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) dated 10/23/2015 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Colleen Kollar-Kotelly for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2656) (ztnr) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER dated 10/13/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2656) (ztnr) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas P. Pier

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent K. Nakamura

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Thomas Denis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cheryl A. Falvey