This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2018 at 07:01:45 (UTC).

In Re Derrick Paul Chan and Cynthia Reiko Chan

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 In Re Derrick Paul Chan and Cynthia Reiko Chan was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-05582

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Appellants

Derrick Paul Chan

Cynthia Reiko Chan

Defendant

Derrick Paul Chan and Cynthia Reiko Chan

Trustees

Martha G. Bronitsky

Hayward, CA 94540

Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak,

450 Golden Gate Avenue, 5Th Floor, #05-0153

San Francisco, CA 94102

Sarah Little

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

David Alan Boone

Attorney at Law Offices of David A. Boone

1611 The Alameda

San Jose, CA 95126

Trustee Attorney

Gregg Steven Kleiner

Attorney at Rincon Law LLP

268 Bush Street, Suite 3335

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING EMERGENCY #4 MOTION TO STAY ORDER OF BANKRUPTCY COURT.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

(#10) Declaration of David A. Boone Regarding Transcript of the September 11, 2018 Hearing re 9 Order filed by Cynthia Reiko Chan, Derrick Paul Chan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 9 ) (Boone, David) (Filed on 10/26/2018) Modified on 10/29/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

8 #4

Transmittal Letter

8 #3

Docket Report

8 #2

Statement of Issues

8 #1

Appellants Designation

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF USBC RECORD ON APPEAL: Bankruptcy Record on Appeal is Available Electronically at https://ecf.canb.uscourts.gov/. (Attachments: #1 Appellants Designation, #2 Statement of Issues, #3 Docket Report, #4 Transmittal Letter)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#7

(#7) REPLY (re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byCynthia Reiko Chan, Derrick Paul Chan. (Boone, David) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

6 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#6

(#6) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) (Appellees Opposition to Appellants Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal) filed bySarah Little. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kleiner, Gregg) (Filed on 10/3/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

5 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appellee's Intent to Oppose #4 Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal by Sarah Little. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kleiner, Gregg) (Filed on 9/27/2018) Modified on 9/28/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/27/2018)

4 #4

Proposed Order

4 #3

Exhibit 1-16

4 #2

Declaration of David A. Boone in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Ap

4 #1

Declaration of Appellants in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal

#4

(#4) Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Cynthia Reiko Chan, Derrick Paul Chan. Responses due by 10/3/2018. Replies due by 10/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Appellants in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, #2 Declaration of David A. Boone in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, #3 Exhibit 1-16, #4 Proposed Order)(Boone, David) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING EMERGENCY #4 MOTION TO STAY ORDER OF BANKRUPTCY COURT.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Declaration of David A. Boone Regarding Transcript of the September 11, 2018 Hearing re 9 Order filed by Cynthia Reiko Chan, Derrick Paul Chan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 9 ) (Boone, David) (Filed on 10/26/2018) Modified on 10/29/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • (#9) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING Appellants to file an official transcript of the September 11, 2018 hearing on the Motion for Stay Pending Appeal on or before October 26, 2018. The Court DENIES Appellants' request for a temporary stay pending the filing of the transcript. See Dkt. No. 7 at 1. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF USBC RECORD ON APPEAL: Bankruptcy Record on Appeal is Available Electronically at https://ecf.canb.uscourts.gov/. (Attachments: #1 Appellants Designation, #2 Statement of Issues, #3 Docket Report, #4 Transmittal Letter)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPLY (re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byCynthia Reiko Chan, Derrick Paul Chan. (Boone, David) (Filed on 10/10/2018) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) (Appellees Opposition to Appellants Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal) filed bySarah Little. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kleiner, Gregg) (Filed on 10/3/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appellee's Intent to Oppose #4 Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal by Sarah Little. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kleiner, Gregg) (Filed on 9/27/2018) Modified on 9/28/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Cynthia Reiko Chan, Derrick Paul Chan. Responses due by 10/3/2018. Replies due by 10/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Appellants in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, #2 Declaration of David A. Boone in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, #3 Exhibit 1-16, #4 Proposed Order)(Boone, David) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 14-41673 RLE. Filed byDerrick Paul Chan, Cynthia Reiko Chan. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Court's Certification of Mailing, #3 Docket Report, #4 Order Converting Case to Chapter 7)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.