This case was last updated from PACER on 02/27/2020 at 22:05:05 (UTC).

In Re: Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation

Case Summary

On 06/15/2018 In Re Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04171

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Levy Roth IRA

LRI Invest S.A.

Eric J. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated

FTC Capital GMBH

Avril E. Levy, Living Trust UA Dated

Haldeman Realty Co., Inc.

William Tad Berger

Tony Elich

Nathan L. Terwilliger

David Samuel

Spencer Roland Bueno

Amy Huang

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

Haldeman Realty Co., Inc.

David Samuel

Defendants and In Re

Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation

Citigroup Financial Products Inc

LRI Invest S.A.

John Does 1-50

CBOE Global Markets, Inc.

Chicago Board Options Exchange Inc.

Citigroup Derivatives Market, Inc.

Wolverine Trading L.P.

Respondent

LJM Partners, Ltd.

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

Anna Marie Horning Nygren

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.l.l.p.

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Michael Jerry Freed

Attorney at Freed Kanner London & Millen, LLC

2201 Waukegan Road, Suite 130

Bannockburn, IL 60015

Fred T Isquith

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz Llp

270 Madison Ave.

New York, NY 10016

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 2Nd Ave., Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

David W. Mitchell

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Frank Anthony Richter

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd

200 S. Wacker, 31St Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Daniel L. Brockett

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Floor 22, 51 Madison Ave

New York, NY 10010

Jonathan Scott Crevier

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Other Attorneys

Christian T. Kemnitz

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

525 West Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60661

Daniel V. Dorris

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Julie B. Porter

Attorney at Salvatore Prescott & Porter PLLC

1010 Davis Street

Evanston, IL 60201

Lesley E. Weaver

Attorney at Bleichmar Fonti & Auld LLP

Suite 1600, 555 12Th Street

Oakland, CA 94607

Daniel O. Herrera

Attorney at Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP

150 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Kellie Lerner

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

399 Park Avenue, Suite 3600

New York, NY 10022

Kenneth A. Wexler

Attorney at Wexler Wallace LLP

55 West Monroe, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60603

Adam M. Prom

Attorney at DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC

Eleventh Floor, Ten North Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Walter W. Noss

Attorney at Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP

600 W. Broadway, Suite 3300

San Diego, CA 92101

Adam J. Levitt

Attorney at DiCello Levitt Gutzler LLC

Ten North Dearborn Street, Eleventh Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Randall P. Ewing, Jr.

Attorney at Korein Tillery, Llc

205 No. Michigan Ave., Ste. 1950

Chicago, IL 60601

Joseph Michael Bresnahan

Attorney at Foley & Lardner Llp

321 N. Clark, 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

139 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#297

(#297) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time to file response/reply #295 is granted. Cboe's responses are now due 3/13/20. Plaintiffs' replies are due 3/20/20. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#296

(#296) NOTICE of Motion by Gregory M. Boyle for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, #295 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 3/3/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Boyle, Gregory) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#295

(#295) MOTION by Defendants CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b), #290 , motion to expedite #294 , motion for discovery, #292 (Unopposed) (Boyle, Gregory) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

294 #1

Exhibit Subpoena

#294

(#294) MOTION by Respondent LJM Partners, Ltd. to expedite discovery and memorandum of law in support filed jointly with Two Roads Shared Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Cortazar, Ryan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

293 #1

Exhibit 1

#293

(#293) MEMORANDUM by Richard S. Aaron, Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) in support of motion for discovery, #292 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bunge, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#292

(#292) MOTION by Plaintiffs Richard S. Aaron, Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel for discovery to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference (Bunge, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#290

(#290) MOTION by Plaintiffs Richard S. Aaron, Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b) (Bunge, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14645096. Kristen McCulloch (McCulloch, Kristen) (Entered: 06/28/2018)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nathan L. Terwilliger by Mark Thomas Vazquez (Vazquez, Mark) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Barry by John Shannon Marrese (Marrese, John) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Barry by Steven Alan Hart (Hart, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Barry by William Reiss (Reiss, William) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 7/9/18, parties may file memoranda no longer than five pages in length stating their position on the following: 1. briefing plaintiff Bueno's motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and counsel; 2. setting deadlines for served defendants to respond to (one or more) complaints; and 3. initiating discovery to identify Doe defendants. Joint submissions are encouraged, and the parties may include other suggestions for early coordination of these cases. The memoranda must be filed on the master docket for the MDL, 18-cv-4171. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

#3

(#3) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Manish S. Shah is presiding in MDL 2842 (18 CV 4171, In Re: Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation); and It further appearing that, 18 CV 1754, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC v. CBOE Global Markets, Inc. et al., and the related cases associated to 18 CV 1754 (listed below) are currently pending before the Hon. Manish S. Shah and the designate Magistrate Judge Maria Valdez, fall within the scope of MDL 2842; therefore It is hereby ordered that the Clerk is to reassign the cases listed below to MDL 2842 (18 CV 4171, In Re: Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation). Signed by Executive Committee on 6/26/2018. (td, ) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

#2

(#2) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring cases to become part of MDL 2842. (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

#1

(#1) TRANSFER Order of 6/15/2018 from MDL Panel establishing MDL 2842. Case No.18cv04171 master docket. (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/15/2018)

387 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#297) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time to file response/reply #295 is granted. Cboe's responses are now due 3/13/20. Plaintiffs' replies are due 3/20/20. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#296) NOTICE of Motion by Gregory M. Boyle for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, #295 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 3/3/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Boyle, Gregory) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#295) MOTION by Defendants CBOE Exchange, Inc., CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC, CBOE Global Markets, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b), #290 , motion to expedite #294 , motion for discovery, #292 (Unopposed) (Boyle, Gregory) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#294) MOTION by Respondent LJM Partners, Ltd. to expedite discovery and memorandum of law in support filed jointly with Two Roads Shared Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Cortazar, Ryan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#293) MEMORANDUM by Richard S. Aaron, Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) in support of motion for discovery, #292 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bunge, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#292) MOTION by Plaintiffs Richard S. Aaron, Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel for discovery to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference (Bunge, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#291) MEMORANDUM by Richard S. Aaron, Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) in support of motion for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b), #290 (Bunge, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#290) MOTION by Plaintiffs Richard S. Aaron, Brian Barry, William Tad Berger, Spencer Roland Bueno, Dale Cary, Victor Choa, FTC Capital GMBH, Amy Huang, LRI Invest S.A., John Pels, Projection Capital Markets, LLC, David Samuel for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b) (Bunge, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#289) PETITION Joint Application for Appointment of Plaintiffs' Leadership Counsel (Bunge, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#288) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/06/2020 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 37780. Court Reporter Contact Information: Rosemary Scarpelli, Rosemary_Scarpelli@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312)435-5885, on behalf of Mary Hacker. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2020. (Scarpelli, Rosemary) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
276 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The court's order requesting memoranda is clarified as follows. The request related to briefing plaintiff Bueno's motion for appointment as lead plaintiff/counsel was not intended to solicit substantive information about the merits or qualifications of any plaintiff or counsel for any particular role in the case. The court is interested in initial suggestions for a process by which plaintiffs and their counsel can be coordinated at this early stage of the MDL. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14645096. Kristen McCulloch (McCulloch, Kristen) (Entered: 06/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nathan L. Terwilliger by Mark Thomas Vazquez (Vazquez, Mark) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Barry by John Shannon Marrese (Marrese, John) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Barry by Steven Alan Hart (Hart, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brian Barry by William Reiss (Reiss, William) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 7/9/18, parties may file memoranda no longer than five pages in length stating their position on the following: 1. briefing plaintiff Bueno's motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and counsel; 2. setting deadlines for served defendants to respond to (one or more) complaints; and 3. initiating discovery to identify Doe defendants. Joint submissions are encouraged, and the parties may include other suggestions for early coordination of these cases. The memoranda must be filed on the master docket for the MDL, 18-cv-4171. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Manish S. Shah is presiding in MDL 2842 (18 CV 4171, In Re: Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation); and It further appearing that, 18 CV 1754, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC v. CBOE Global Markets, Inc. et al., and the related cases associated to 18 CV 1754 (listed below) are currently pending before the Hon. Manish S. Shah and the designate Magistrate Judge Maria Valdez, fall within the scope of MDL 2842; therefore It is hereby ordered that the Clerk is to reassign the cases listed below to MDL 2842 (18 CV 4171, In Re: Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation). Signed by Executive Committee on 6/26/2018. (td, ) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring cases to become part of MDL 2842. (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRANSFER Order of 6/15/2018 from MDL Panel establishing MDL 2842. Case No.18cv04171 master docket. (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LJM Partners, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where FTC Capital GMBH is a litigant