This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2018 at 07:58:21 (UTC).

In Re: Charles Francis Gugliuzza, II

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 In Re Charles Francis Gugliuzza, II was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-01590

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Appellant, Defendant and Debtor

Charles Francis Gugliuzza, II

Appellee

Federal Trade Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Michael B Reynolds

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-7689

Jeffrey M Singletary

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-7689

Appellee Attorneys

Stacy Rene Procter

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

10990 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Kimberly L Nelson

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

600 Pennsylvania Avenuenw Mail Stop M-8102B

Washington, DC 20508

Michele Arington

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

600 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw Room H-576

Washington, DC 20580

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER GRANTING APPELLEE FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWERING BRIEF #18 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appellee Federal Trade Commission's answering brief is due by December 10, 2018. (iv) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief #18 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arington, Michele) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

18 #1

Declaration

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief filed by appellee Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Arington, Michele) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

17 #3

Excerpt of Record - Volume II

17 #2

Excerpts of Record - Volume I continued

17 #1

Excerpts of Record - Volume I

#17

(#17) APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF filed by Appellant Charles Francis Gugliuzza, II. (Attachments: #1 Excerpts of Record - Volume I, #2 Excerpts of Record - Volume I continued, #3 Excerpt of Record - Volume II, #4 Certificate of Service)(Reynolds, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#5

(#5) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION filed by Appellant Charles Francis Gugliuzza, II. #1 (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Notice of Appeal does not include entered stamped copy of order, judgment, or decree forwarded to Judge Cormac J. Carney. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appeal Deficiency to Appellant (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 9/5/2018. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

1 #1

USBC Docket

#1

(#14) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability; Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal #1 . (twdb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER GRANTING APPELLEE FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWERING BRIEF #18 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appellee Federal Trade Commission's answering brief is due by December 10, 2018. (iv) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief #18 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arington, Michele) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief filed by appellee Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Arington, Michele) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF filed by Appellant Charles Francis Gugliuzza, II. (Attachments: #1 Excerpts of Record - Volume I, #2 Excerpts of Record - Volume I continued, #3 Excerpt of Record - Volume II, #4 Certificate of Service)(Reynolds, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION: On September 21, 2018, the Court issued an Order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution #9 . On September 21, 2018, Appellant filed a Response to the Court's Order #10 . On September 25, 2018, the Court received and issued a Notice re: Bankruptcy Record Complete #15 . In light of this responsive filings, the Court hereby orders the OSC discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 10/25/2018. (twdb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability; Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal #1 . (twdb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #8 Non-Resident Attorney Michele Arington APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Federal Trade Commission a, designating Stacy Rene Procter as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • (#12) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Cormac J. Carney. Effective October 9, 2018, Judge Cormac J. Carney will be located in the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 7C, on the 7th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 7C of the First Street U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the First Street Courthouse. Judge Carney's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Melissa H. Kunig, may be reached at (714) 338-2849.The location for filing civil and/or criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing is at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180, Los Angeles, California 90012. Documents under this exemption may also be filed in the Santa Ana or Riverside courthouses.Please refer to Judge Carney's Procedures & Schedules Page on the Court's website **UPDATED AS OF SEPTEMBER 24, 2018** for updated procedures regarding mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michele Arington to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Appellee Federal Trade Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Other error(s) with document(s): Failed to list VA. (lt) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE filed by Appellant Charles Francis Gugliuzza, IIto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #9 (Singletary, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Appellant is hereby ordered to show cause in writing, on or before 9/26/2018 why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Failure of Appellant to make an adequate and/or timely response to this Order will result in the dismissal of the appeal. (jp) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michele Arington to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Appellee Federal Trade Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Appellee Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Procter, Stacy) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION filed by Appellant Charles Francis Gugliuzza, II. #1 (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Notice of Appeal does not include entered stamped copy of order, judgment, or decree forwarded to Judge Cormac J. Carney. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appeal Deficiency to Appellant (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 9/5/2018. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order Denying Defendants Motion for Costs and Fees and Defendants Bill of Costs. entered on 8/13/2018 by Bankruptcy Judge Catherine E. Bauer, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 8/27/2018. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:12-bk-22893-CB, Adversary number: 8:13-ap-01078-CB, BAP case number: None., filed by Appellant Charles Francis Gugliuzza, II. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.