This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/22/2022 at 06:11:27 (UTC).

In re Capacitors Antitrust Litigation (No.III)

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 In re Capacitors Antitrust Litigation No III was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-MD-02801

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chip-Tech, Ltd.

Michael Brooks

Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated

Gossett Motor Cars, Inc.

WE 3 Gossett, LLC

Beverly Hills Leasing LLC

BHRAC, LLC

Walker Component Group, Inc.

Autorama, Inc.

Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated

Dependable Component Supply Corp.

Johnny Walker

Defendants

Capacitors Antitrust Litigation (No.III)

Panasonic Corporation

KEMET Corporation

NEC Tokin America, Inc.

Shinyei Capacitor Co., Ltd.

Toshin Kogyo Co., Ltd.

Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated

Respondent

Cisco Systems, Inc.

101 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

C. Andrew Dirksen

Attorney at Cera LLP

800 Boylston Street, 16Th Floor

Boston, MA 02199

Andrew Michael Purdy

Attorney at Brown, Neri, Smith & Khan LLP

15615 Alton Parkway, Suite 450

Irvine, CA 92618

Scott N. Wagner

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 2500

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey L. Kessler

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Matthew Robert DalSanto

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-5802

Claire M Maddox

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Danyll W Foix

Attorney at BakerHostetler

1050 Connecticut Ave., Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Other Attorneys

James Kent Emison

Attorney at Langdon and Emison

911 Main Street, Po Box 220

Lexington, MO 64067

Ian Kiely Bausback

Attorney at Morrison Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jack Wing Lee

Attorney at Minami Tamaki LLP

360 Post Street, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Michael Harrison Pearson

Attorney at Pearson Simon & Warshaw, LLP

15165 Ventura Blvd., Suite 400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Philip S. Van Der Weele

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

One Sw Columbia Street, #1900

Portland, OR 97258

Adam J. Zapala

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Mallory Ann Jensen

Attorney at O'Melveny and Myers LLP

2 Embarcadero Center, 28Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mikal J. Condon

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

450 Golden Gate Ave

Rm 10-0101, BO 36046

Lauren M. Ige

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Todd Anders Noteboom

Stinson Leonard Street Llp, 50 South Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Robert Gil Kidwell

Attorney at Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky, and Popeo

555 12Th Street Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20004

Michelle Park Chiu

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

Jacklin Chou Lem

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

450 Golden Gate Avenue

Room 10-0101, BO 36046

257 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

1681 #1

Proposed Order

1681 #1681

Main Document

1667 #13

Exhibit C

1667 #12

Exhibit B

1667 #10

Declaration of Kendall S. Zylstra in Support of DPC's Motion for Preliminar

1667 #6

Exhibit E

1667 #5

Exhibit D (Redacted)

1667 #2

Exhibit A

1667 #1

Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri in Support of DPC's Motion for Preliminary

6 #6

Exhibit F

6 #5

Exhibit E

6 #3

Exhibit C

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

5,045 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1681) NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #1667 MOTION for Settlement Direct Purchaser Class's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Defendants Matsuo Electric Co., LTD., Nippon Chemi-Con Corp. and United Chemi-Con, Inc. Direct Purchaser Class's Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement With Defendants Matsuo Electric Co., LTD., Nippon Chemi-Con Corp. and United Chemi-Con, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/21/2022) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1680) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice by Flextronics International USA, Inc. and Matsuo Electric Co., Ltd. filed by Flextronics International USA, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) (Filed on 4/20/2022) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1679) ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #1677 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brittany Ngo. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2022) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1678) RESPONSE to Plaintiff Flextronics Inc.'s and Defendants NCC and UCC's Joint Pretrial Status Conference Statement [Dkt. No. 2928] and Certain Defendants' Statement Regarding Joint Status Conference [Dkt. No. 1673] by Arrow Electronics, Inc.. (Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 4/19/2022) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1677) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17099458.) filed by Matsuo Electric Co, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ngo, Brittany) (Filed on 4/19/2022) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1676) RESPONSE re #1671 Pretrial Conference Statement, #1673 Statement by Avnet, Inc., Benchmark Electronics De Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V., Benchmark Electronics Huntsville Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Inc, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions (Moorpark) Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Manufacturing Solutions Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Phoenix Incorporated, Benchmark Electronics Tijuana S. de R.L. de C.V., Jaco Electronics Incorporated, The AASI Beneficiaries Trust, by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 4/19/2022) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1675) EXHIBITS re #1672 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Filed Under Seal Pursuant to L.R. 79-5(f) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [1672-3] filed byRubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation. (Related document(s) #1672 ) (Cove, John) (Filed on 4/15/2022) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1674) NOTICE by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America of Withdrawal of Counsel, Frank S. Restagno (Restagno, Frank) (Filed on 4/15/2022) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1673) Statement of Certain Defendants' Regarding Joint Status Conference by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation. (Cove, John) (Filed on 4/14/2022) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1672) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Filed Under Seal Pursuant to L.R. 79-5(f) filed by Rubycon America Inc., Rubycon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 **REFILED AT #1675 ** Declaration of Djordje Petkoski ISO of Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Cove, John) (Filed on 4/14/2022) Modified on 4/18/2022 (ecg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,672 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 7 and 8 to Joint Letter Regarding the End Date for Defendants' Document Production, and Plaintiffs' Compromise Proposal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Demetrius Lambrinos in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/24/2018) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding the End Date for Defendants' Document Production, and Plaintiffs' Compromise Proposal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7 Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 8 Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/24/2018) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter Brief Response to Plaintiffs' 11/3 and 11/17 Letter Briefs filed byHoly Stone Enterprise Co., Ltd., HolyStone International, Milestone Global Technology, Inc., Vishay Polytech Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Ozurovich, Kelly) (Filed on 1/23/2018) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter Brief response to Plaintiffs' 11/3/17 and 11/17/2017 Letter Briefs filed byNippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Bial, Joseph) (Filed on 1/22/2018) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration of Chris Megaw in Support of #4 Brief filed byElna Co. Ltd., Elna America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Megaw, Christopher) (Filed on 1/19/2018) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration of Bonnie Lau in Support of #4 Brief DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed byMatsuo Electric Co, Ltd.. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/18/2018) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Brief DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed byMatsuo Electric Co, Ltd.. (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/18/2018) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Digi-Key Corporation of JPML Panel Entry related to Docket Entry 2006 in Case No. 3:14-cv-03264-JD, motion to relate case (Zahid, Judith) (Filed on 1/18/2018) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing, Discovery Hearing and Status Conference held on 1/11/2018. Total Time in Court: 1:36. Court Reporter: Kathy Sullivan. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2018) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District of California creating MDL No. 3:17-md-2801 JD. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017) (Entered: 12/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chip-Tech, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated is a litigant