This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 04:26:58 (UTC).

IN RE: ASHLEY MADISON CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION

Case Summary

On 12/09/2015 IN RE ASHLEY MADISON CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Ross. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:15-MD-02669

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Does 1-21

David Miller

Nhung Truong

CHRIS HRIVNAK

John Doe

John Doe No. 2

J. Doe 4

Keith Macomber

David Poyet

Michael Pauly

Lee E. Campbell

John Hiles, III

J. Doe 2

Grant Deloach

Todd Witengier

J. Doe 5

Petitioner

Amicus Doe 1

Defendants

Avid Dating Life, Inc.

Noel Biderman

Barnes & Thornburg LLP

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allison P. Fry

Attorney at Jackson, MS 39201

101 North State Street

Jackson, MS 39201

John J. Driscoll

Attorney at DRISCOLL FIRM, P.C.

211 N. Broadway, Suite 4050

St. Louis, MO 63102

Richard R Gordon

Attorney at Gordon Law Offices, Ltd.

211 W. Wacker Dr., Suite 500

Chicago, IL 60606

Taylor C. Bartlett

Attorney at HENINGER AND GARRISON, LLC

2224 1St Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

William Bernard Federman

Attorney at FEDERMAN AND SHERWOOD

10205 N. Pennsylvania Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73120

Carin L. Marcussen

Attorney at Federman & Sherwood

10205 N Pennsylvania Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73120

Kevin A. Seely

Attorney at ROBBINS ARROYO LLP

600 B Street, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Thomas A. Withers

Attorney at Gillen Withers & Lake, LLC

P.O. Box 10164

Savannah, GA 31412

Defendant Attorneys

Richard P. Cassetta

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP - ST. LOUIS

One Metropolitan Square, 211 N. Broadway, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63102

Helen Claire Looney

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP

2676 Pine Street, Apt. B

San Francisco, CA 94115

Robert A. Atkins

Attorney at PAUL AND WEISS

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

E. B. Chiles, IV

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

James C Barton, Jr

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

One Federal Place, 1819 5Th Avenue North Suite 1000

Birmingham, AL 35203

Christopher M. Green

Attorney at BOIES AND SCHILLER LLP

333 Main Street

Armonk, NY 10504

Other Attorneys

Julian Ari Hammond

Attorney at HammondLaw PC

1180 S. Beverly Drive, Suite 610

Los Angeles, CA 90035

Polina Pecherskaya

Attorney at HammondLawPC

1829 Reisterstown Road Suite 410

Baltimore, MD 21208

David Louis Gershner

Attorney at Davidson Law Firm, Ltd.

Post Office Box 1300

Little Rock, AR 72203-1300

Charles D. Davidson

Attorney at Davidson Law Firm, Ltd.

Post Office Box 1300

Little Rock, AR 72203-1300

M Scott Harwell

Attorney at THE HARWELL LAW FIRM

1063 Narrows Way, Suite A

Birmingham, AL 35242

Steven W. Ritcheson

Attorney at HENINGER AND GARRISON, LLC

9800 D Topanga Canyon Blvd., Suite 347

Chatsworth, CA 91311

62 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#392

(#392) FINAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this MDL action is finally closed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to notify the Panel that this action is closed and that no further proceedings are required. (cc: D. Braun, D. O'Leary). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/26/19. (KKS) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#391

(#391) REMAND ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Sarah S. Vance Chair of the Panel...IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action 4:15-cv-01920-JAR is remanded to the Southern District of Mississippi. (See Order for details) (DLB) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#390

(#390) ORDER: Pursuant to the Settlement Agreement and this Courts orders, Plaintiffs and Class Counsels second and final accounting of all funds from the Settlement Fund was filed on July 16, 2018. (Doc. No. #389 ) This case can now be closed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall close this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order shall be filed in all member cases: 4:15-cv-1132; 4:15-cv-01876; 4:15-cv-01877; 4:15-cv-01878; 4:15- cv-01879; 4:15-cv-01923; 4:15-cv-01924; 4:15-cv-01925; 4:15-cv-01926; 4:15-cv- 01927; 4:15-cv-01928; 4:15-cv-01930; 4:15-cv-01920; 4:15-cv-01943; 4:15-cv- 01945; 4:16-cv-00174; 4:16-cv-01940; 4:17-cv-01322. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/17/18. (JAB) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

389 #1

Exhibit A

#389

(#389) REPORT TO COURT ORDER re #383 Order Granting Final Approval of Settlement, Cy Pres Distribution, and Award of Attorneys Fees and Service Awards to the Class Representatives by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Driscoll, John) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#388

(#388) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' AND CLASS SETTLEMENT COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF ADDITIONAL LITIGATION EXPENSES INCURRED AFTER THE MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL WAS FILED - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' and Class Settlement Counsel's Motion for Reimbursement of Additional Litigation Expenses Incurred After the Motion for Final Approval was Filed #385 is GRANTED.The Court orders reimbursement for $12,185.39 in expenses to be distributed to Plaintiffs' counsel by the Settlement Administrator within seven (7) days of this Order as follows: Firm Amount : Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC - $8,667.63 ; Rosen Law Firm - $3,517.76. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the July 2, 2018 deadline for filing a second notice of accounting with the Court to account for and document the distributions done with the Reserve is CONTINUED to Monday, July 16, 2018. The Court shall maintain continuing jurisdiction over these proceedings for the benefit of the Class as defined in this Order. ( Response to Court due by 7/16/2018.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 06/29/18. (KKS) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

#387

(#387) ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any objections to Plaintiffs' and Class Settlement Counsel's Motion for Reimbursement of Additional Litigation Expenses Incurred After the Motion for Final Approval was Filed (Doc. No. #385 ) must be filed no later than Monday, June 25, 2018. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/20/2018. (CLO) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

386 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#385

(#385) First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pf's and Class Settlement Counsel's Motion for Reimbursement of Add'l Litigation Expenses Incurred after the Motion for Final Approval was Filed by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

#383

(#384) REPORT TO COURT ORDER re #383 Order Granting Final Approval of Settlement, Cy Pres Distribution, and Award of Attorneys Fees and Service Awards to the Class Representatives by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Driscoll, John) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#1

(#1) TRANSFER ORDER with Schedule A Attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Sarah S. Vance on 12/9/15. DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., Northern District of Alabama, C.A. No. 6:15-01464, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., Central District of California, C.A. No. 2:15-06405, DOE 1, ET AL. v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., Central District of California, C.A. No. 8:15-01347, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., Eastern District of Missouri, C.A. No. 4:15-01132, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., Northern District of Texas, C.A. No. 3:15-02750. (DLB) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

#2

(#2) TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the PanelIN RE: ASHLEY MADISON CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION MDL No. 2669; DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:15-02750, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV01876 JAR, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., N.D. Alabama, Case No. 6:15-01464, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV01877 JAR, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., C.D. California, Case No. 2:15-06405, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV01878 JAR, DOE 1, ET AL. v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., C.D. California, Case No. 8:15-01347, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV01879 JAR. (DJO) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

#3

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Deadlines in Cases Transferred Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 and Cases that are Subsequently Transferred, and to Set an Initial Status Conference for January 2016 #3 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an initial status conference is set in this matter on Tuesday, January 26, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 12 N, United States District Court, 111 S. 10th Street, St. Louis, Missouri. All participating counsel may appear either in person or by telephone with leave of Court.The conference will encompass preliminary issues regarding setting a Case Management Order. Counsel may file written suggestions for items to be included on the agenda for this conference no later than January 22, 2016. ( Status Conference set for 1/26/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/23/15. (KKS) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: ASHLEY MADISON CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION MDL No. 2669 by Clerk of the Panel; Doe v. Avid Life Media Inc et al, E.D. Arkansas, Case No. 4:1500640, John Does et al v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1506619, Szilvia Berki et al v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1508208, David Poyet v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al. C.D. California, Case No. 2:1508456, Gustavo Alfaro v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 5:1502295, Deloach v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, S.D. Georgia, Case No. 4:1500299, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1507760, Doe v. Avid Life Media et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1508270, Pauly v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1508842, Russell v. Avid Life Media Inc. et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 8:1502693, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, S.D. Mississippi, Case No. 3:1500658, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1507017, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2:1500386. (DJO) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#5

(#5) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER (SEE ORDER); 4. All documents shall be filed only in the main case number 4:15MD2669 JAR. Nothing shall be filed in any of the individual case files.... Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/23/15. (KKS) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Deadlines in Cases Transferred Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 and Cases that are Subsequently Transferred, and to Set an Initial Status Conference for January 2016 #3 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an initial status conference is set in this matter on Tuesday, January 26, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 12 N, United States District Court, 111 S. 10th Street, St. Louis, Missouri. All participating counsel may appear either in person or by telephone with leave of Court.The conference will encompass preliminary issues regarding setting a Case Management Order. Counsel may file written suggestions for items to be included on the agenda for this conference no later than January 22, 2016. ( Status Conference set for 1/26/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/23/15. (KKS) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

#7

(#8) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Stay December 14, 2015 Order Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint using Real Name by December 23, 2015 [ #7 ] is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/28/15. (JAB) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

#8

(#8) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Stay December 14, 2015 Order Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint using Real Name by December 23, 2015 [ #7 ] is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/28/15. (JAB) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

746 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#392) FINAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this MDL action is finally closed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to notify the Panel that this action is closed and that no further proceedings are required. (cc: D. Braun, D. O'Leary). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/26/19. (KKS) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#391) REMAND ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Sarah S. Vance Chair of the Panel...IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action 4:15-cv-01920-JAR is remanded to the Southern District of Mississippi. (See Order for details) (DLB) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#390) ORDER: Pursuant to the Settlement Agreement and this Courts orders, Plaintiffs and Class Counsels second and final accounting of all funds from the Settlement Fund was filed on July 16, 2018. (Doc. No. #389 ) This case can now be closed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall close this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order shall be filed in all member cases: 4:15-cv-1132; 4:15-cv-01876; 4:15-cv-01877; 4:15-cv-01878; 4:15- cv-01879; 4:15-cv-01923; 4:15-cv-01924; 4:15-cv-01925; 4:15-cv-01926; 4:15-cv- 01927; 4:15-cv-01928; 4:15-cv-01930; 4:15-cv-01920; 4:15-cv-01943; 4:15-cv- 01945; 4:16-cv-00174; 4:16-cv-01940; 4:17-cv-01322. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/17/18. (JAB) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***REMARK- Copy of #383 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, CY PRES DISTRIBUTION, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES mailed to the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation at Thurgood Marshall Federal Judiciary Building One Columbus Circle, NE Room G-255, North Lobby Washington, DC 20544-0005 as of this date. (CLO) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#389) REPORT TO COURT ORDER re #383 Order Granting Final Approval of Settlement, Cy Pres Distribution, and Award of Attorneys Fees and Service Awards to the Class Representatives by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Driscoll, John) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#388) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' AND CLASS SETTLEMENT COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF ADDITIONAL LITIGATION EXPENSES INCURRED AFTER THE MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL WAS FILED - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' and Class Settlement Counsel's Motion for Reimbursement of Additional Litigation Expenses Incurred After the Motion for Final Approval was Filed #385 is GRANTED.The Court orders reimbursement for $12,185.39 in expenses to be distributed to Plaintiffs' counsel by the Settlement Administrator within seven (7) days of this Order as follows: Firm Amount : Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC - $8,667.63 ; Rosen Law Firm - $3,517.76. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the July 2, 2018 deadline for filing a second notice of accounting with the Court to account for and document the distributions done with the Reserve is CONTINUED to Monday, July 16, 2018. The Court shall maintain continuing jurisdiction over these proceedings for the benefit of the Class as defined in this Order. ( Response to Court due by 7/16/2018.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 06/29/18. (KKS) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#387) ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any objections to Plaintiffs' and Class Settlement Counsel's Motion for Reimbursement of Additional Litigation Expenses Incurred After the Motion for Final Approval was Filed (Doc. No. #385 ) must be filed no later than Monday, June 25, 2018. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/20/2018. (CLO) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#386) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #385 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pf's and Class Settlement Counsel's Motion for Reimbursement of Add'l Litigation Expenses Incurred after the Motion for Final Approval was Filed filed by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Driscoll, John) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#385) First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pf's and Class Settlement Counsel's Motion for Reimbursement of Add'l Litigation Expenses Incurred after the Motion for Final Approval was Filed by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#384) REPORT TO COURT ORDER re #383 Order Granting Final Approval of Settlement, Cy Pres Distribution, and Award of Attorneys Fees and Service Awards to the Class Representatives by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Driscoll, John) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
394 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2015
  • ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Mon Dec 28 12:36:32 CST 2015 (Bernsen, John) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Stay December 14, 2015 Order Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint using Real Name by December 23, 2015 [ #7 ] is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/28/15. (JAB) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION to Stay December 14, 2015 Order Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint Using Real Name By December 23, 2015 by Plaintiff John Doe #. (Linam, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5,6. Mailed to party not notified electronically. Wed Dec 23 12:50:24 CST 2015 (Stamm, Katie) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Deadlines in Cases Transferred Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 and Cases that are Subsequently Transferred, and to Set an Initial Status Conference for January 2016 #3 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an initial status conference is set in this matter on Tuesday, January 26, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 12 N, United States District Court, 111 S. 10th Street, St. Louis, Missouri. All participating counsel may appear either in person or by telephone with leave of Court.The conference will encompass preliminary issues regarding setting a Case Management Order. Counsel may file written suggestions for items to be included on the agenda for this conference no later than January 22, 2016. ( Status Conference set for 1/26/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/23/15. (KKS) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER (SEE ORDER); 4. All documents shall be filed only in the main case number 4:15MD2669 JAR. Nothing shall be filed in any of the individual case files.... Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/23/15. (KKS) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: ASHLEY MADISON CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION MDL No. 2669 by Clerk of the Panel; Doe v. Avid Life Media Inc et al, E.D. Arkansas, Case No. 4:1500640, John Does et al v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1506619, Szilvia Berki et al v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1508208, David Poyet v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al. C.D. California, Case No. 2:1508456, Gustavo Alfaro v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 5:1502295, Deloach v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, S.D. Georgia, Case No. 4:1500299, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1507760, Doe v. Avid Life Media et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1508270, Pauly v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1508842, Russell v. Avid Life Media Inc. et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 8:1502693, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, S.D. Mississippi, Case No. 3:1500658, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1507017, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2:1500386. (DJO) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent MOTION to Stay Deadlines in Cases Transferred Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 And Cases That Are Subsequently Transferred, And to Set an Initial Status Conference for January 2016 by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the PanelIN RE: ASHLEY MADISON CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION MDL No. 2669; DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:15-02750, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV01876 JAR, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., N.D. Alabama, Case No. 6:15-01464, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV01877 JAR, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., C.D. California, Case No. 2:15-06405, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV01878 JAR, DOE 1, ET AL. v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., C.D. California, Case No. 8:15-01347, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV01879 JAR. (DJO) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRANSFER ORDER with Schedule A Attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Sarah S. Vance on 12/9/15. DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., Northern District of Alabama, C.A. No. 6:15-01464, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., Central District of California, C.A. No. 2:15-06405, DOE 1, ET AL. v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., Central District of California, C.A. No. 8:15-01347, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., Eastern District of Missouri, C.A. No. 4:15-01132, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., Northern District of Texas, C.A. No. 3:15-02750. (DLB) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less