This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2018 at 05:22:00 (UTC).

In Re ACF Basin Water Litigation

Case Summary

On 05/08/2018 In Re ACF Basin Water Litigation was filed as an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-MI-00043

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of Alabama

Apalachicola Bay and River Keeper, Inc.

Florida Wildlife Federation

National Wildlife Federation, Inc.

Defendants

ACF Basin Water Litigation

C. David Turner

Robert M. Speer

James A. DeLapp

Douglas Lamont

U.S. Army Corps of Engineers

Todd T. Semonite

Intervenor Defendants

City of Atlanta, Georgia

Forsyth County

Atlanta Regional Commission

City of Gainesville, Georgia

Fulton County

Cobb County-Marietta Water Authority

DeKalb County

Gwinnett County

State of Georgia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Starr Drum

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale -AL

1901 Sixth Avenue North, 2400 Amsouth/Harbert Plaza

Birmingham, AL 35203-2602

Michael Coleman Gretchen

Attorney at Fellows La Briola, LLP

225 Peachtree Street, N.E., South Tower, Suite 2300

Atlanta, GA 30303-1731

Stephen Thomas La Briola

Attorney at Fellows La Briola, LLP

225 Peachtree Street, N.E., South Tower, Suite 2300

Atlanta, GA 30303-1731

Brandt P. Hill

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale -AL

1901 Sixth Avenue North, 2400 Amsouth/Harbert Plaza

Birmingham, AL 35203-2602

John C. Neiman, Jr.

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale -AL

1901 Sixth Avenue North, 2400 Amsouth/Harbert Plaza

Birmingham, AL 35203-2602

Alisa Coe

Attorney at EARTHJUSTICE

111 S. Martin Luther King Jr. Blvd

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Tania Galloni

Attorney at EARTHJUSTICE

4500 Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 201

Miami, FL 33137

Neil Edward Gormley

Attorney at EARTHJUSTICE

1625 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw, Suite 702

Washington, DC 20036

John Patton Dycus

Attorney at Patton Dycus Law, LLC

Suite 842, 315 W. Ponce De Leon Ave.

Decatur, GA 30030

Defendant Attorney

William E. Gerard

Attorney at US Department of Justice

601 D St Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Alexander McCullers

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP - ATL

1180 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Ashley C. Parrish

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis-DC

655 Fifteenth Street, N.W., Suite 1200

Washington, DC 20005

John L. Fortuna

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP - ATL 36

1180 Peachtree Street, Ne, 36Th Floor

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Lewis B. Jones

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP - ATL 36

1180 Peachtree Street, Ne, 36Th Floor

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Christopher Michael Carr

Attorney at Georgia Department of Law

40 Capitol Square, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

Sarah Hawkins Warren

Attorney at Georgia Department of Law

40 Capitol Square, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

John Curtis Allen

Attorney at Kazmarek Mowrey Cloud Laseter LLP

Suite 3600, 1230 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309

Craig S. Primis

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis-DC

655 Fifteenth Street, N.W., Suite 1200

Washington, DC 20005

Kenneth Winn Allen

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis-DC

655 Fifteenth Street, N.W., Suite 1200

Washington, DC 20005

Shelly Jacobs Ellerhorst

Attorney at Kazmarek Mowrey Cloud Laseter LLP

Suite 3600, 1230 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#106

(#106) ORDER directing Clerk to open a new MI case (1:18-mi-043-TWT) and to consolidate the dockets of 18-cv-1530 and 18-cv-1529 in the MI case. All future filings will only be made in 1:18-mi-043-TWT and not in the individual civil cases. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/8/2018. (jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

#105

(#105) Certification of Consent to Substitute Reuben S. Schifman for attorney William E. Gerard. (Gerard, William) Modified on 5/9/2018 (jkl).(Entered: 05/08/2018) (1:18-cv-01530-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

#104

(#104) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Status Conference held on 5/7/2018. The parties were directed to confer and attempt to reach an agreement for Case Management Order # 1 and submit to the Court within 30 days. The Court directed the Clerk to consolidate this case with National Wildlife Federation, Inc., et al v Army Corps of Engineers, et al case no. 1:18cv1530 by creating a new docket to include all the parties in both of these cases and all the filings of both cases and that all future filings will be done in the new case styled IN RE: ACF BASIN LITIGATION. (ORDER TO FOLLOW) Attorney Michael Coleman Gretchen added for State of Alabama. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(jkl) (Entered: 05/08/2018) (1:18-cv-01529-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

#103

RESTRICTED

#102

RESTRICTED

#100

RESTRICTED

#99

RESTRICTED

#96

RESTRICTED

#95

RESTRICTED

1 #8

Summons Division Commander

1 #7

Summons Commander

1 #6

Summons Assistant Secretary

1 #5

Summons Secretary

1 #4

Summons Corps of Engineers

1 #3

Summons Attorney General

1 #2

Summons U.S. Attorney

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4902851) filed by STATE OF ALABAMA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons Corps of Engineers, #5 Summons Secretary, #6 Summons Assistant Secretary, #7 Summons Commander, #8 Summons Division Commander, #9 Summons District Commander)(Neiman, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2017) (1:18-cv-01529-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

258 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) ORDER directing Clerk to open a new MI case (1:18-mi-043-TWT) and to consolidate the dockets of 18-cv-1530 and 18-cv-1529 in the MI case. All future filings will only be made in 1:18-mi-043-TWT and not in the individual civil cases. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/8/2018. (jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) Certification of Consent to Substitute Reuben S. Schifman for attorney William E. Gerard. (Gerard, William) Modified on 5/9/2018 (jkl).(Entered: 05/08/2018) (1:18-cv-01530-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to John C. Neiman and Brandt P. Hill re #102 Order on Application for Admission PHV, #103 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jkl) (Entered: 05/08/2018) (1:18-cv-01529-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Tania Galloni and Alisa Coe re #100 Order on Application for Admission PHV, #99 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jkl) (Entered: 05/08/2018) (1:18-cv-01530-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Status Conference held on 5/7/2018. The parties were directed to confer and attempt to reach an agreement for Case Management Order # 1 and submit to the Court within 30 days. The Court directed the Clerk to consolidate this case with National Wildlife Federation, Inc., et al v Army Corps of Engineers, et al case no. 1:18cv1530 by creating a new docket to include all the parties in both of these cases and all the filings of both cases and that all future filings will be done in the new case styled IN RE: ACF BASIN LITIGATION. (ORDER TO FOLLOW) Attorney Michael Coleman Gretchen added for State of Alabama. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(jkl) (Entered: 05/08/2018) (1:18-cv-01529-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) ORDER granting Brandt P. Hill's #96 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/7/18. (jkl) (Entered: 05/08/2018) (1:18-cv-01529-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) ORDER granting John C. Neiman's #95 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/7/2018. (jkl) (Entered: 05/08/2018) (1:18-cv-01529-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Status Conference held on 5/7/2018. The parties were directed to confer and attempt to reach an agreement for Case Management Order # 1 and submit to the Court within 30 days. The Court will consolidate this case with 1:18cv1529, written order to follow. (Court Reporter Susan Baker)(jkl) (Entered: 05/08/2018) (1:18-cv-01530-TWT) (jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) ORDER granting Alisa Coe's #98 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/7/2018. (jkl) (Entered: 05/08/2018) (1:18-cv-01530-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) ORDER GRANTING Tania Galloni's #97 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/7/2018. (jkl) (Entered: 05/08/2018) (1:18-cv-01530-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by APALACHICOLA RIVERKEEPER, FLORIDA WILDLIFE FEDERATION, INC., NATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION, INC. (Gormley, Neil) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 04/28/2017) (1:18-cv-01530-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (sth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 05/03/2017) (1:18-cv-01530-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) COMPLAINT against all Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4930136) filed by FLORIDA WILDLIFE FEDERATION, INC., APALACHICOLA RIVERKEEPER, NATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Gormley, Neil) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 04/27/2017) (1:18-cv-01530-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. C. DAVID TURNER served on 4/17/2017 (Neiman, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 04/25/2017) (1:18-cv-01529-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES A. DELAPP served on 4/14/2017 (Neiman, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 04/25/2017) (1:18-cv-01529-TWT) (jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/19/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/18/2017. (Neiman, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 04/25/2017) (1:18-cv-01529-TWT) (jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/19/17. (Neiman, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 04/25/2017) (1:18-cv-01529-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to JAMES A. DELAPP, DOUGLAS LAMONT, TODD T. SEMONITE, ROBERT M. SPEER, C. DAVID TURNER, U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent)(md) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 04/07/2017) (1:18-cv-01529-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (md) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 04/06/2017) (1:18-cv-01529-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4902851) filed by STATE OF ALABAMA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons Corps of Engineers, #5 Summons Secretary, #6 Summons Assistant Secretary, #7 Summons Commander, #8 Summons Division Commander, #9 Summons District Commander)(Neiman, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2017) (1:18-cv-01529-TWT)(jkl) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less