This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2018 at 07:35:56 (UTC).

Ifill v. United States Sugar Corp., et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2018 Ifill filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against United States Sugar Corp . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. Steele and Carol Mirando. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00713

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E. Steele

Referral Judge

Carol Mirando

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Ifill

Defendants

T. J. Graham

International Association of Machinist and Aerospace Workers - Local Lodge 57

United States Sugar Corp.,

Mark Osborn

International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William R. Amlong

Attorney at The Amlong Firm

2Nd Floor, 500 Ne 4Th St

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Gregory Vincent Alcaro

Attorney at Amlong & Amlong, P.A.

Second Floor, 500 N.E. 4Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Karen Coolman Amlong

Attorney at The Amlong Firm

2Nd Floor, 500 Ne 4Th St

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Barbara Goolsby

Attorney at Barbara Goolsby Esq. PLLC

1769 Braman Ave

Ft Myers, FL 33901-6916

Defendant Attorneys

Brian M. McPherson

Attorney at Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, PA

Suite 500 E, 777 S Flagler Dr

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-6194

Roger William Feicht

Attorney at Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, PA

Suite 500 E, 777 S Flagler Dr

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-6194

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim [Partial], MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction [Partial] by United States Sugar Corp.,. (Feicht, Roger) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#25

(#25) RETURN of service executed on 12/06/2018 by Jason Ifill as to International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. (Amlong, William) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#24

(#24) SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Jason Ifill as to Mark Osborn. (Amlong, William) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#23

(#23) SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Jason Ifill as to T. J. Graham. (Amlong, William) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#22

(#22) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #17 Interested persons order by United States Sugar Corp.,. (McPherson, Brian) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Roger William Feicht on behalf of United States Sugar Corp., (Feicht, Roger) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#20

(#20) RETURN of service executed as to United States Sugar Corp. on 11/28/18 by Jason Ifill (Amlong, William) Modified on 12/6/2018 to edit filing event and docket text (drn). (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice of pendency of other actions per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jason Ifill. Related case(s): no (Alcaro, Gregory) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#17

(#17) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to United States Sugar Corp. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/17/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/3/2018. (drn) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jason Ifill. (Amlong, William) Modified on 11/6/2018. Incorrect PDF form - counsel to resubmit (drn). (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jason Ifill. (Amlong, William) Modified on 11/6/2018. Incorrect PDF form - counsel to resubmit (drn). (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jason Ifill. (Amlong, William) Modified on 11/6/2018. Incorrect PDF form - counsel to resubmit (drn). (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jason Ifill. (Amlong, William) Modified on 11/6/2018. Incorrect PDF form - counsel to resubmit. (drn). (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#5

(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/19/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/5/2018. (WRW) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#4

(#19) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice of pendency of other actions per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jason Ifill. Related case(s): no (Alcaro, Gregory) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/29/2018. (drn) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14758752) filed by Jason Ifill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Amlong, William) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit docket text (drn). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim [Partial], MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction [Partial] by United States Sugar Corp.,. (Feicht, Roger) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) RETURN of service executed on 12/06/2018 by Jason Ifill as to International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. (Amlong, William) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Jason Ifill as to Mark Osborn. (Amlong, William) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Jason Ifill as to T. J. Graham. (Amlong, William) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #17 Interested persons order by United States Sugar Corp.,. (McPherson, Brian) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Roger William Feicht on behalf of United States Sugar Corp., (Feicht, Roger) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RETURN of service executed as to United States Sugar Corp. on 11/28/18 by Jason Ifill (Amlong, William) Modified on 12/6/2018 to edit filing event and docket text (drn). (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice of pendency of other actions per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jason Ifill. Related case(s): no (Alcaro, Gregory) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Vincent Alcaro on behalf of Jason Ifill (Alcaro, Gregory) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to United States Sugar Corp. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/17/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/3/2018. (drn) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jason Ifill. (Amlong, William) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jason Ifill. (Amlong, William) Modified on 11/6/2018. Incorrect PDF form - counsel to resubmit (drn). (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jason Ifill. (Amlong, William) Modified on 11/6/2018. Incorrect PDF form - counsel to resubmit (drn). (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jason Ifill. (Amlong, William) Modified on 11/6/2018. Incorrect PDF form - counsel to resubmit (drn). (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jason Ifill. (Amlong, William) Modified on 11/6/2018. Incorrect PDF form - counsel to resubmit. (drn). (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/19/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/5/2018. (WRW) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/19/2018. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 11/5/2018. (WRW) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/29/2018. (drn) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. New case number: 2:18-cv-713-FtM-29CM. (NAS) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14758752) filed by Jason Ifill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Amlong, William) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit docket text (drn). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District No. 9 is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian M. McPherson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roger William Feicht