This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 16:46:41 (UTC).

IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co. v. Feldberg et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Feldberg. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Stearns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-12293

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.

IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co. doing business as Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Government Employees Insurance Company

Philip L. Feldberg

K.F.

Dawn Fasani-Feldberg

Claudia B. Feldberg

Jonathan Simms

Withlacoochee River Electric Cooperative, Inc.

Alyna Phromsopha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey H. Katzenstein

Attorney at Halaby Law Group, PC

14 Main Street

Hingham, MA 02043

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Ronald E. Harding

Attorney at Weston Patrick P.A.

84 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Nicholas S. Guerrera

Attorney at Shaheen Guerrera & O'Leary, LLC

820A Turnpike Street

North Andover, MA 01845

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Philip L. Feldberg and Claudia B. Feldberg ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co. by Claudia B. Feldberg, Philip L. Feldberg.(Guerrera, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas S. Guerrera on behalf of Claudia B. Feldberg, Philip L. Feldberg (Guerrera, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#13

(#13) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. K.F. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Dawn Fasani-Feldberg served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Withlacoochee River Electric Cooperative, Inc. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Jonathan Simms served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Alyna Phromsopha served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Government Employees Insurance Company.(Harding, Ronald) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Claudia B. Feldberg served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Philip L. Feldberg served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Government Employees Insurance Company served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Dawn Fasani-Feldberg, Claudia B. Feldberg, Philip L. Feldberg, Government Employees Insurance Company, K.F., Alyna Phromsopha, Jonathan Simms. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Ameriprise Financial, Inc. for IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co... (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/2/2018) (McKillop, Matthew). (Entered: 11/02/2018)

1 #2

Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7394628 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co., d/b/a Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/2/2018) (McKillop, Matthew). (Entered: 11/02/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • Docket(#16) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. This is a straight-forward coverage case. Several Answers having been filed in this case, the court enters the following pretrial schedule.Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) will be completed by 1/14/19; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties are due by 2/22/19; All fact discovery to be completed by 5/24/19; dispositive motions will be filed by 6/14/19, with any opposition by 7/5/19, reply only with leave of court. If the parties intend to utilize experts, they will inform the court by 2/22/19, so it can amend the pretrial schedule. If both parties are interested in mediation and would like to participate in the federal court's program, they will inform the session clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 3/8/19.(Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Philip L. Feldberg and Claudia B. Feldberg ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co. by Claudia B. Feldberg, Philip L. Feldberg.(Guerrera, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas S. Guerrera on behalf of Claudia B. Feldberg, Philip L. Feldberg (Guerrera, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. K.F. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Dawn Fasani-Feldberg served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Withlacoochee River Electric Cooperative, Inc. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Jonathan Simms served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Alyna Phromsopha served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Government Employees Insurance Company.(Harding, Ronald) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Claudia B. Feldberg served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Philip L. Feldberg served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. Government Employees Insurance Company served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. Acknowledgement filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co.. (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Dawn Fasani-Feldberg, Claudia B. Feldberg, Philip L. Feldberg, Government Employees Insurance Company, K.F., Alyna Phromsopha, Jonathan Simms. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Ameriprise Financial, Inc. for IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co... (Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/2/2018) (McKillop, Matthew). (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7394628 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co., d/b/a Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Katzenstein, Jeffrey) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/2/2018) (McKillop, Matthew). (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WITHLACOOCHEE RIVER ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where K.F. is a litigant

Latest cases where IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant