This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2018 at 07:24:21 (UTC).

Ibarra v. Century Security Management of Las Vegas Corp

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 Ibarra filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Century Security Management of Las Vegas Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Miranda M. Du and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01706

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Miranda M. Du

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Isabel Ibarra

Defendant

Century Security Management of Las Vegas Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin A Sprenz

Attorney at Sprenz Law

9960 W. Cheyenne, Suite 170

Las Vegas, NV 89129

James P. Kemp

Attorney at Kemp & Kemp

7435 W. Azure Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89130

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph P Garin

Attorney at Lipson Neilson P.C.

9900 Covington Cross Drive, Suite 120

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Lisa J Zastrow

Attorney at Lipson Neilson, P.C.

9900 Covington Cross Drive, Suite 120

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Jessica A Green

Attorney at Lipson, Neilson, Cole, Seltzer & Garin, P.C.

9900 Covington Cross Drive, Suite 120

Las Vegas, NV 89144

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to ECF No. #12 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/17/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#12

(#12) PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Isabel Ibarra (Kemp, James) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jessica A Green on behalf of Defendant Century Security Management of Las Vegas Corp.. (Green, Jessica) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#9

(#9) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Century Security Management of Las Vegas Corp.. (Zastrow, Lisa) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, Answer to Complaint filed by Century Security Management of Las Vegas Corp.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/3/2018.(Zastrow, Lisa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Century Security Management of Las Vegas Corp.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Zastrow, Lisa) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Isabel Ibarra. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kemp, James) (Entered: 09/08/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER - Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 10/25/2018 at 9:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Written evaluation statements due by 3:00 PM on 10/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/6/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/21/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-18-776023-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5230244) by Century Security Management of Las Vegas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Zastrow, Lisa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/06/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • (#14) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (LH) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to ECF No. #12 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/17/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Isabel Ibarra (Kemp, James) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • (#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/2018. This case is scheduled for an early neutral evaluation. Docket No. 5. In reviewing the statements provided, it appears the early neutral evaluation is more likely to be fruitful once the parties have exchanged initial disclosures, reviewed those disclosures, and had the opportunity for preliminary discussions with one another. Accordingly, the early neutral evaluation is hereby CONTINUED to 9:30 a.m. on November 14, 2018, and amended statements shall be submitted to the undersigned's box in the Clerk's Office no later than 3:00 p.m. on November 9, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jessica A Green on behalf of Defendant Century Security Management of Las Vegas Corp.. (Green, Jessica) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Century Security Management of Las Vegas Corp.. (Zastrow, Lisa) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, Answer to Complaint filed by Century Security Management of Las Vegas Corp.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/3/2018.(Zastrow, Lisa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Century Security Management of Las Vegas Corp.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Zastrow, Lisa) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Isabel Ibarra. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kemp, James) (Entered: 09/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER - Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 10/25/2018 at 9:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Written evaluation statements due by 3:00 PM on 10/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/7/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/6/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/21/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • (#2) NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MMM) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-18-776023-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5230244) by Century Security Management of Las Vegas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Zastrow, Lisa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.