This case was last updated from PACER on 02/05/2019 at 08:07:45 (UTC).

I. Broomfield & Son, Inc. v. Hallamore Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 I Broomfield Son, Inc filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Hallamore Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00661

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.

Defendants

Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange

Hallamore Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric E. Renner

Attorney at Renner Law, LLC

50 South Main Street, Suite 202

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorney

Melina J. Trudeau

Attorney at Olenn & Penza

530 Greenwich Avenue

Warwick, RI 02886

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Melina J. Trudeau on behalf of Hallamore Corporation (Trudeau, Melina) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension of Defendants to Answer filed by Hallamore Corporation. (Trudeau, Melina) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc. for Summons Hallamore Corporation served on 12/24/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Renner, Eric) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Hallamore Corporation, Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Request filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Request filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1296842 ), filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Renner, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • Reset Deadlines: Hallamore Corporation answer due 2/28/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER Entering #7 Stipulation filed by Hallamore Corporation. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/24/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Melina J. Trudeau on behalf of Hallamore Corporation (Trudeau, Melina) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension of Defendants to Answer filed by Hallamore Corporation. (Trudeau, Melina) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc. for Summons Hallamore Corporation served on 12/24/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Renner, Eric) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Hallamore Corporation, Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Request filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Request filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1296842 ), filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Renner, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Hallamore Corporation, Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Request filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Request filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1296842 ), filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Renner, Eric) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less