This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2017 at 02:44:34 (UTC).

Hydrodec of North America LLC v. API Heat Transfer, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 Hydrodec of North America LLC filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against API Heat Transfer, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence J. Vilardo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-00764

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. Vilardo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hydrodec of North America LLC

Defendant

API Heat Transfer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David G. Kern

Attorney at FisherBroyles - Cincinnati

201 East Fifth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Diem N. Kaelber

Attorney at FisherBroyles - Columbus

20 South Third Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant Attorneys

Carolyn M. Cappel

Attorney at Weston Hurd - Cleveland

1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Monica L. Frantz

Attorney at Weston Hurd - Cleveland

1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

John G. Farnan

Attorney at Weston Hurd - Cleveland

1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

25 #1

*Restricted*

#25

20 #10

Exhibit C Timothy Connell Depo Transcript

20 #9

Exhibit B-8 July 10, 2014 Purchase Order

20 #8

Exhibit B-7 February 28, 2014 Price Quotation

20 #7

Exhibit B-6 December 10, 2013 Purchase Order

20 #2

Exhibit B - David Beckman Depo Transcript

20 #1

Exhibit A Christian Pawlak Depo Transcript

#20

#7

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - Contract of Sale

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2017
  • AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (KLH) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 5:16-cv-02207. (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Memorandum Opinion and Order of Transfer: API's motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. #20 ) is granted, insofar as it seeks to transfer venue. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/2/2017. (P,J) (Correction made to party name on last page and correct document added on 8/2/2017: # 1 Main Document) (P,J). Modified text and regenerated to attorneys on 8/2/2017 (P,J). [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Reply in support of #20 Motion for summary judgment On The Issue Of Which Terms and Conditions Apply to the Instant Dispute filed by API Heat Transfer, Inc. (Farnan, John) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 03/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Opposition to #20 Motion for summary judgment filed by Hydrodec of North America LLC. (Kern, David) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 03/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order [non-document] granting #21 plaintiff's motion for extension of time until 3/10/2017 to file a response to defendant's summary judgment motion. Defendant is granted leave until 3/24/2017 to file a reply. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/2/2017.(P,J) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 03/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Motion for extension of time until 3/10/17 to file a Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's #20 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Hydrodec of North America LLC. (Kern, David) Modified text to match document on 3/9/2017 (M,TL). [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 03/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Christian Pawlak Depo Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - David Beckman Depo Transcript, #3 Exhibit B-2 Settlement Agreement, Assignment Release & Indemnity, #4 Exhibit B-3 API Heat Terms and Conditions, #5 Exhibit B-4 Zeton General Terms and Conditions, #6 Exhibit B-5 December 4, 2013 Price Quotation, #7 Exhibit B-6 December 10, 2013 Purchase Order, #8 Exhibit B-7 February 28, 2014 Price Quotation, #9 Exhibit B-8 July 10, 2014 Purchase Order, #10 Exhibit C Timothy Connell Depo Transcript, #11 Exhibit D Craig Soulsby Depo Transcript, #12 Exhibit D-13 August 2015 Email Exchange between Timothy Connell and Craig Soulsby)(Farnan, John) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 02/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Notice of Service of Answers and Objections to Plaintiff Hydrodec of North America, LLC's First Set of Limited Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Cappel, Carolyn) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 12/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Attorney Appearance by David G. Kern filed by on behalf of Hydrodec of North America LLC. (Kern, David) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 09/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Contract of Sale)(Farnan, John) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 09/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/7/2016. (P,J) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 09/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Attorney Diem N. Kaelber. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (G,CA) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 09/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 09/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,TL) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 09/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 09/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by API Heat Transfer, Inc. (Farnan, John) Modified text to match document on 9/2/2016 (M,TL). [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 09/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Farnan, John) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 09/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal from Stark County Common Pleas, case number 2016CV01815 with jury demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0647-7787807. Filed by API Heat Transfer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint) (Farnan, John) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/8/2017.] (Entered: 09/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where API Heat Transfer Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carolyn M. Cappel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica L. Frantz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John G Farnan