This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2018 at 07:33:44 (UTC).

Hyde v. IATSE Local Union 64 et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 Hyde filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against IATSE Local Union 64. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00145

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frederick P. Stamp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christie Hyde

Defendants

Frank Scarnechia

Wheeling Municipal Auditorium Bd

Greater Wheeling Sport and Entertainment Authority

IATSE Local Union 64

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Teresa C. Toriseva

Attorney at Toriseva Law

1446 National Road

Wheeling, WV 26003

Joshua D. Miller

Attorney at Toriseva Law

1446 National Road

Wheeling, WV 26003

Defendant Attorneys

Paul J. Harris

Attorney at Harris Law Offices

Po Box 1200, Fifteenth & Eoff Streets

Wheeling, WV 26003

Thomas E. Buck

Attorney at Bailey & Wyant, PLLC

1219 Chapline St.

Wheeling, WV 26003

Morgan S. McKee

Attorney at Bailey & Wyant, PLLC - Wheeling

1219 Chapline St.

Wheeling, WV 26003

Ernest B. Orsatti

Attorney at Rothman Gordon, P.C.

310 Grant Street - Third Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

James F. Companion

Attorney at Schrader Companion Duff & Law, PLLC

401 Main Street

Wheeling, WV 26003

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 3/29/2019. Discovery due by 5/31/2019. Motions due by 6/14/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/11/2019. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 9/16/2019 01:30 PM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 10/1/2019 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 10/16/18. (soa) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#14

(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Buck, Thomas) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#13

(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Christie Hyde. (Toriseva, Teresa) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by Frank Scarnechia.(Harris, Paul) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Greater Wheeling Sport and Entertainment Authority, Wheeling Municipal Auditorium Bd. (Buck, Thomas) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Christie Hyde. (Toriseva, Teresa) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendant IATSE Local Union 64 by IATSE Local Union 64 re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant IATSE Local Union 64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Companion, James) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant IATSE Local Union 64, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by IATSE Local Union 64. (Companion, James) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

7 #1

Attachment Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Greater Wheeling Sport and Entertainment Authority. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support)(Buck, Thomas) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#6

(#6) JOINDER AND CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Greater Wheeling Sport and Entertainment Authority. (Buck, Thomas) Modified on 9/6/2018 to correct title of document(soa). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER : Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Ernest Orsatti. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/5/18. (soa) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ernest B. Orsatti by IATSE Local Union 64. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/4/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/11/2018. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 11/1/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/4/18. (soa) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Certified State Court Record

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 3/29/2019. Discovery due by 5/31/2019. Motions due by 6/14/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/11/2019. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 9/16/2019 01:30 PM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 10/1/2019 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 10/16/18. (soa) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Buck, Thomas) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Christie Hyde. (Toriseva, Teresa) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint by Frank Scarnechia.(Harris, Paul) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Greater Wheeling Sport and Entertainment Authority, Wheeling Municipal Auditorium Bd. (Buck, Thomas) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Christie Hyde. (Toriseva, Teresa) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendant IATSE Local Union 64 by IATSE Local Union 64 re #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant IATSE Local Union 64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Companion, James) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant IATSE Local Union 64, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by IATSE Local Union 64. (Companion, James) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Greater Wheeling Sport and Entertainment Authority. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support)(Buck, Thomas) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JOINDER AND CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Greater Wheeling Sport and Entertainment Authority. (Buck, Thomas) Modified on 9/6/2018 to correct title of document(soa). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER : Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Ernest Orsatti. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/5/18. (soa) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PHV fee for Ernest Orsatti: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW001975. (soa) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ernest B. Orsatti by IATSE Local Union 64. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/4/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/11/2018. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 11/1/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/4/18. (soa) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Ohio County, West Virginia, (case number 18-C-176), filed by Greater Wheeling Sport and Entertainment Authority. Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2657649. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Local 64 Contract with the Greater Wheeling Sport and Entertainment Authority, #4 Certified State Court Record, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less