This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2018 at 07:42:31 (UTC).

Hyde v. Franklin American Mortgage Company

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 Hyde filed a Finance - Banking lawsuit against Franklin American Mortgage Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04113

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Banking

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brady Hyde

Defendant

Franklin American Mortgage Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shawn M. Nichols

Attorney at Cadwell, Sanford, Deibert & Garry, LLP

200 E 10Th Street, Suite 200

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin J. Mann

Attorney at Halliday, Watkins & Mann, P.C.

376 East 400 South, Suite 300

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/1/2019 Motions due by 5/1/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/1/2018. (SLT) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/2/2018) (SLT). (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#9

(#9) Discovery Report re #8 Order for Discovery Report by Brady Hyde. Related document: #8 Order for Discovery Report.(Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/3/18. (SLW) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Franklin American Mortgage Company. (Mann, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Franklin American Mortgage Company on 09-19-18 (Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

5 #2

Exhibit Franklin Letter and copy of check

5 #1

Exhibit automatic payment enrollment

#5

(#5) REDACTED DOCUMENT Complaint with Exhibits A and B by Brady Hyde. Redacted version of previously filed document #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit automatic payment enrollment, #2 Exhibit Franklin Letter and copy of check) (Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#4

(#4) Filing Fee Received from Brady Hyde. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400048010. (JLS) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Franklin American Mortgage Company. 1 original summons, 2 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (JLS) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Letter from Franklin American Mortgage Company to Hyde dated 9-6-18

1 #1

Exhibit A - ACH Email

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Brady Hyde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ACH Email, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from Franklin American Mortgage Company to Hyde dated 9-6-18) (JLS) Modified security on exhibit B pursuant to e-government act on 9/19/2018 (JLS). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/1/2019 Motions due by 5/1/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/1/2018. (SLT) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/2/2018) (SLT). (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Discovery Report re #8 Order for Discovery Report by Brady Hyde. Related document: #8 Order for Discovery Report.(Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/3/18. (SLW) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Franklin American Mortgage Company. (Mann, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Franklin American Mortgage Company on 09-19-18 (Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REDACTED DOCUMENT Complaint with Exhibits A and B by Brady Hyde. Redacted version of previously filed document #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit automatic payment enrollment, #2 Exhibit Franklin Letter and copy of check) (Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing Fee Received from Brady Hyde. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400048010. (JLS) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Franklin American Mortgage Company. 1 original summons, 2 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (JLS) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Brady Hyde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ACH Email, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from Franklin American Mortgage Company to Hyde dated 9-6-18) (JLS) Modified security on exhibit B pursuant to e-government act on 9/19/2018 (JLS). (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.