This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2018 at 07:57:29 (UTC).

Hutter, Mason v. Huneke, Rick et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Hutter, Mason filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Huneke, Rick. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00576

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mason L. Hutter

Ellsworth, WI 54011

Defendants

Pierce County Sheriff's Department

Rick Huneke

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Timothy M. Johnson

Attorney at Crivello Carlson, S.C.

710 North Plankinton Avenue, Suite 500

Milwaukee, WI 53203

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) ORDER directing the clerk of court to close case 16-cv-717-jdp under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The clerk of court is directed to open case no. 18-cv-576-jdp with a copy plaintiff Mason L. Hutter's complaint in this case. In case no. 18-cv-576-jdp, plaintiff is GRANTED leave on Fourth Amendment and Wisconsin-law infliction-of-emotional-distress and defamation claims against defendants Rick Huneke and Pierce County. This case is CONSOLIDATED with case no. 16-cv-718-jdp. The clerk of court is directed to forward the complaint and summons to the United States Marshal for service on defendants. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/27/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

2 #1

Judgment of Dismissal/Acquittal

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #3

Cover Letter

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT (from case 16-cv-717-jdp) against All Defendants filed by Mason L. Hutter. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Judgment of Dismissal/Acquittal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Letter) (jef) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

3 #1

Summons as to Pierce County Sheriff's Office

#3

(#3) Summonses Issued as to Rick Huneke and Pierce County Sheriff's Department. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Pierce County Sheriff's Office) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

4 #1

Envelope

4 #24

(#4) Letter from Mason Hutter regarding legal mail and requesting forms. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

#27

(#27) Certificate of Service by Defendants Rick Huneke, Pierce County Sheriff's Department as to (26 in 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 44 in 3:16-cv-00718-jdp) Brief in Reply,. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 3:16-cv-00718-jdp (Johnson, Timothy),(ps) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#26

(#26) Brief in Reply by Defendants Rick Huneke, Pierce County Sheriff's Department in Support of (15 in 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 33 in 3:16-cv-00718-jdp) Motion to Dismiss Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 3:16-cv-00718-jdp (Johnson, Timothy),(ps) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#25

(#25) Notice of filing Notice of Claim and request to hold case in abeyance by Plaintiff Mason L. Hutter. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Injury and Claim dated 9/10/2018, #2 Letter to Pierce County Clerk, #3 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 3:16-cv-00718-jdp (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

25 #3

Envelope

25 #1

Notice of Injury and Claim dated 9/10/2018

25 #2

Letter to Pierce County Clerk

#24

(#24) Motion to Dismiss Defendants Counsel Crivello Carlson, S.C. by Plaintiff Mason L. Hutter. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 3:16-cv-00718-jdp (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

23 #1

Exhibit Copy of Letter to Clerk's/DA Office dated 4/28/2017

#23

(#23) Answer to Declaration of Jamie Feuerhelm by Plaintiff Mason L. Hutter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Letter to Clerk's/DA Office dated 4/28/2017) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 3:16-cv-00718-jdp (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Certificate of Service by Defendants Rick Huneke, Pierce County Sheriff's Department as to (26 in 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 44 in 3:16-cv-00718-jdp) Brief in Reply,. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 3:16-cv-00718-jdp (Johnson, Timothy),(ps) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Brief in Reply by Defendants Rick Huneke, Pierce County Sheriff's Department in Support of (15 in 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 33 in 3:16-cv-00718-jdp) Motion to Dismiss Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 3:16-cv-00718-jdp (Johnson, Timothy),(ps) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Notice of filing Notice of Claim and request to hold case in abeyance by Plaintiff Mason L. Hutter. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Injury and Claim dated 9/10/2018, #2 Letter to Pierce County Clerk, #3 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 3:16-cv-00718-jdp (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Motion to Dismiss Defendants Counsel Crivello Carlson, S.C. by Plaintiff Mason L. Hutter. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 3:16-cv-00718-jdp (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Answer to Declaration of Jamie Feuerhelm by Plaintiff Mason L. Hutter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Letter to Clerk's/DA Office dated 4/28/2017) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 3:16-cv-00718-jdp (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Plaintiff's Brief in Support of State Law Claims re (33 in 3:16-cv-00718-jdp, 15 in 3:18-cv-00576-jdp) MOTION TO DISMISS State Law Claims in 18cv576 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 8/6/2018 Response to Open Records Request) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 3:16-cv-00718-jdp (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Mason L. Hutter re: (15 in 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 33 in 3:16-cv-00718-jdp) Motion to Dismiss State Law Claims filed by Pierce County Sheriff's Department, Rick Huneke Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 3:16-cv-00718-jdp (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Response to Affirmative Defenses by Plaintiff Mason L. Hutter (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00576-jdp, 3:16-cv-00718-jdp (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Response to Answer by Plaintiff Mason L. Hutter (Attachments: #1 September 1, 2015 Letter from Clerk of St. Croix County Wisconsin, #2 Envelope) Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00718-jdp, 3:18-cv-00576-jdp (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Briefing Deadlines as to #15 Motion to Dismiss State Law Claims in 18cv576. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 9/14/2018. Defendants' Brief in Reply due 9/24/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel C. Hall, Jr for Defendants Jane Doe, Shelly Fox, St. Croix County. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00718-jdp, 3:18-cv-00576-jdp (Hall, Samuel),(ps) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Benjamin Andrew Sparks for Defendants Jane Doe, Shelly Fox, St. Croix County. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00718-jdp, 3:18-cv-00576-jdp (Sparks, Benjamin),(ps) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel Mark Mitchell for Defendants Jane Doe, Shelly Fox, St. Croix County. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00718-jdp, 3:18-cv-00576-jdp (Mitchell, Samuel),(ps) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Mason L. Hutter. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Lieutenant Steven Albarado to Plaintiff re Open Records Request dates 8/5/18, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Marshal Service Return Executed. Rick Huneke served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018; Pierce County Sheriff's Department served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Form Executed as to Pierce County Sheriff's Department) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Clerk's Office response to letter from Mason Hutter regarding legal mail and requesting forms. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Mason Hutter regarding legal mail and requesting forms. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summonses Issued as to Rick Huneke and Pierce County Sheriff's Department. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Pierce County Sheriff's Office) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT (from case 16-cv-717-jdp) against All Defendants filed by Mason L. Hutter. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Judgment of Dismissal/Acquittal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Letter) (jef) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) ORDER directing the clerk of court to close case 16-cv-717-jdp under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The clerk of court is directed to open case no. 18-cv-576-jdp with a copy plaintiff Mason L. Hutter's complaint in this case. In case no. 18-cv-576-jdp, plaintiff is GRANTED leave on Fourth Amendment and Wisconsin-law infliction-of-emotional-distress and defamation claims against defendants Rick Huneke and Pierce County. This case is CONSOLIDATED with case no. 16-cv-718-jdp. The clerk of court is directed to forward the complaint and summons to the United States Marshal for service on defendants. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/27/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.