This case was last updated from PACER on 01/28/2019 at 08:15:18 (UTC).

Hutchison v. Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC et al (RLJ2)

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 Hutchison filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC RLJ2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are R Leon Jordan and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00510

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R Leon Jordan

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donnie Hutchison

Defendants

Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC

Tim Short Chrysler, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David H Dunaway

Attorney at Law Office of David H. Dunaway & Associates

100 S. Fifth Street, Po Box 280

Lafollette, TN 37766

Defendant Attorneys

Marcia Dawn McShane

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, LLP (Nashville)

401 Commerce Street, Suite 1010

Nashville, TN 37219

Jarrett Michael Dean Spence

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks & Smith (Atlanta)

230 Peachtree Street Nw, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30303-1557

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#12

(#12) ORDER re: Scheduling order and Deadlines. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 12/21/18. (ABF) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC, Tim Short Chrysler, LLC.(McShane, Marcia) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

10 #1

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC. (McShane, Marcia) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the Honorable Pamela L. Reeves, United States District Judge, has recused herself in this cause. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable R. Leon Jordan, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/4/18. (ABF) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/3/18. (ABF) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/30/18. (ABF) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/30/18. (ABF) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/30/18. (ABF) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC. (McShane, Marcia) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

1 #4

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit c: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Campbell County Circuit Court, case number 16846. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3829039), filed by Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B: Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit c: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(McShane, Marcia) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 12/21/2018. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (JTS) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 12/21/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER re: Scheduling order and Deadlines. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 12/21/18. (ABF) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC, Tim Short Chrysler, LLC.(McShane, Marcia) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jarrett Spence ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3838885.) filed by Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC (ABF) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jarrett Spence ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3838885.) by Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(McShane, Marcia) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Based upon the lack of opposition from Plaintiff, Defendant Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC shall have up to and including Thursday, December 20, 2018, in which to file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint.Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 12/6/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court.) (JTS) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC. (McShane, Marcia) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the Honorable Pamela L. Reeves, United States District Judge, has recused herself in this cause. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable R. Leon Jordan, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/4/18. (ABF) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/3/18. (ABF) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/30/18. (ABF) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/30/18. (ABF) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/30/18. (ABF) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC. (McShane, Marcia) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Campbell County Circuit Court, case number 16846. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3829039), filed by Short-Redmond Ford of LaFollette, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B: Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit c: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(McShane, Marcia) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.