This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2019 at 08:02:53 (UTC).

Huston, Michael v. State of Wisconsin et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 Huston, Michael filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Wisconsin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01056

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Huston

Hudson, WI 54016

Defendants

State of Wisconsin

The Court

The St. Croix Co Police

The Probation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 66.66 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 2/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/6/2019. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER on ifp request: Petitioner to submit $400 or Motion for IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/18/2018. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

9 #1

IPP Calculation

#9

(#9) Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Michael Huston. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef). (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#8

(#8) Supplemental filed by Plaintiff Michael Huston. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#7

(#7) Letter / submission filed by Plaintiff Michael Huston. (Attachments: #1 State court documents, 2018sc1118,, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) Submission titled supplemental brief regarding filing fee and legal mail, filed by Michael Huston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#4

(#4) Letter from Plaintiff Michael Huston re: his ability to pay $400 filing fee and that he requested inmate account statement to provide to the court. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

3 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Huston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Huston. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 66.66 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 2/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/6/2019. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Michael Huston. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef). (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Supplemental filed by Plaintiff Michael Huston. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter / submission filed by Plaintiff Michael Huston. (Attachments: #1 State court documents, 2018sc1118,, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Submission titled supplemental brief regarding filing fee and legal mail, filed by Michael Huston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **On December 19, 2018, I entered an order directing plaintiff Michael Huston to either submit the $400 filing fee or a motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee along with a six-month inmate account statement. Dkt. #2 . Now plaintiff has submitted a motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee along with a letter explaining plaintiff's financial circumstances and the efforts he has taken to obtain an inmate account statement from the St. Croix County Jail. Dkt. #3 and #4 . I construe plaintiff's letter as a request for additional time to submit the six-month inmate account statement. Plaintiff's request is GRANTED. Plaintiff may have until February 8, 2019 to submit a six-month inmate account statement. If by February 8 plaintiff fails to submit the six-month inmate account statement or show cause for his failure to do so, plaintiff will be held to have withdrawn this case voluntarily and the case will be closed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/17/2019. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Plaintiff Michael Huston re: his ability to pay $400 filing fee and that he requested inmate account statement to provide to the court. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Huston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER on ifp request: Petitioner to submit $400 or Motion for IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/18/2018. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Huston. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.