This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2018 at 07:28:07 (UTC).

Hustle Industries, LLC et al v. BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 Hustle Industries, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nanette K. Laughrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00729

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nanette K. Laughrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hustle Industries, LLC

Robert Holcomb

Defendants

Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.

John Does 1-5

Teamsters Local 955

BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Schermerhorn

Attorney at The Klamann Law Firm

4435 Main Street, Suite 150

Kansas City, MO 64111

Paul Douglas Anderson

Attorney at The Klamann Law Firm

4435 Main Street, Suite 150

Kansas City, MO 64111

Michael J. Fleming

Attorney at Kapke & Willerth, LLC

3304 Ne Ralph Powell Rd.

Lee'S Summit, MO 64064

John M. Klamann

Attorney at The Klamann Law Firm

4435 Main Street, Suite 150

Kansas City, MO 64111

George E. Kapke, Jr.

Attorney at Kapke & Willerth, LLC

3304 Ne Ralph Powell Rd.

Lee'S Summit, MO 64064

Defendant Attorneys

Charles M. Poplstein

One Us Bank Plaza, Suite 2700

St. Louis, MO 63101-1686

Brian Lamping

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP-2700

One Us Bank Plaza, Suite 2700

St. Louis, MO 63101-1686

Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP-2700

One Us Bank Plaza, Suite 2700

St. Louis, MO 63101-1686

Michael Amash

Attorney at Blake & Uhlig, PA

New Brotherhood Building, 753 State Avenue, Suite 475

Kansas City, KS 66101

 

Court Documents

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#17

#7

4 #1

Exhibit A: CBA

#3

2 #1

MAP General Order

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Notice of Exhibit Attachment Notice of Removal to State Court

1 #2

Notice of Exhibit Attachment Notice of Removal to Plaintiff

1 #1

Exhibit Notice of Removal - Exhibit A

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Bill Sanders(Kapke, George) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of appearance by Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC (Attorney Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki added to party Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki added to party Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC(pty:dft))(Sanocki, Kristen) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Poplstein, Charles) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955.(Amash, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Robert Holcomb, Hustle Industries, LLC.(Kapke, George) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Robert Holcomb, Hustle Industries, LLC. (Schermerhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/24/2018: Main document replaced. Per Administrative Procedures, proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Amash, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiffs Robert Holcomb, Hustle Industries, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 10/31/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #9 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiffs Robert Holcomb, Hustle Industries, LLC. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Robert Holcomb, Hustle Industries, LLC.(Kapke, George) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schermerhorn, Andrew) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUGGESTIONS in support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Amash, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Amash, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of appearance by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC (Poplstein, Charles) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply Responsive Pleading filed by Brian Lamping on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/9/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lamping, Brian) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM in support of Notice of Removal filed by Bimbo (Document 1) filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: CBA)(Attorney Michael Amash added to party Teamsters Local 955(pty:dft))(Amash, Michael) Modified on 10/5/2018 to correct docket entry title and to terminate this entry as a pending motion.(Matthes Mitra, Renea). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brian Lamping on behalf of Defendants BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC, Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc..(Lamping, Brian) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT e-mailed to all attorneys listed for Hustle Industries, LLC, Robert Holcomb, BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC, Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., John Does 1-5. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 10/9/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixteenth Judicial Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1816-CV21289, filed by Brian Lamping on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., BIMBO Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5938718. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal - Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Exhibit Attachment Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, #3 Notice of Exhibit Attachment Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lamping, Brian) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Douglas Anderson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George E. Kapke, Jr.