This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2018 at 05:52:17 (UTC).

Hunt v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 Hunt filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00140

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Wesley Hunt, Sr

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cale H. Conley

Attorney at Conley Griggs Partin LLP

1380 W. Paces Ferry Road N.W., Suite 2100

Atlanta, GA 30327

Defendant Attorney

Stephen B. Devereaux

1180 Peachtree Street N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

11 #1

*Restricted*

#11

(#11) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Middle. Case number 5:17-cv-00419. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#10

(#10) MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring proceedings Eastern District of Kentucky for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (ans) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCKESSON CORPORATION (Devereaux, Stephen) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (Devereaux, Stephen) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC, Other Affiliate AstraZeneca AB, Other Affiliate Zeneca, Inc for ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP. (Devereaux, Stephen) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION (Devereaux, Stephen) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to MCKESSON CORPORATION. (ans) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP. (ans) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. (ans) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

#2

(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JOHN WESLEY HUNT, SR (ans) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

1 #4

Summons Summons: McKesson Corporation

1 #3

Summons Summons: Astrazeneca

1 #2

Summons Summons: Bristol-Myers

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2735274, $400 filed by John Wesley Hunt, Sr (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons: Bristol-Myers, #3 Summons Summons: Astrazeneca, #4 Summons Summons: McKesson Corporation)(CONLEY, CALE) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (CBD) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Middle. Case number 5:17-cv-00419. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Eastern District of Kentucky. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 3/6/2018. (ans) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring proceedings Eastern District of Kentucky for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (ans) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCKESSON CORPORATION (Devereaux, Stephen) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (Devereaux, Stephen) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC, Other Affiliate AstraZeneca AB, Other Affiliate Zeneca, Inc for ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP. (Devereaux, Stephen) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION (Devereaux, Stephen) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to MCKESSON CORPORATION. (ans) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP. (ans) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. (ans) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JOHN WESLEY HUNT, SR (ans) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2735274, $400 filed by John Wesley Hunt, Sr (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons: Bristol-Myers, #3 Summons Summons: Astrazeneca, #4 Summons Summons: McKesson Corporation)(CONLEY, CALE) [Transferred from gamd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less