This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2018 at 07:56:19 (UTC).

Huls et al v. Meyer et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2018 Huls filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Meyer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04126

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Mark A. Huls

David L. Skoglund

Catherine M. Peterson

Steven E. Peterson

Defendants and Counter Claimants

David M. Meyer

Nancy R. Meyer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Michael E. Unke

341 North Main Street, Po Box 529

Salem, SD 57058-0529

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Timothy R. Rahn

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

101 South Reid Street, Suite 302

Sioux Falls, SD 57103

Daniel R. Fritz, II

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

101 South Reid Street, Suite 302

Sioux Falls, SD 57103

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting plaintiff's #3 Motion to Remand and denying plaintiff's motion for attorney fees and sanctions. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/25/2018. (SAC) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#15

(#15) Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2018 re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by Steven E. Peterson, David L. Skoglund, Mark A. Huls, Catherine M. Peterson before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. (Court Reporter: Jill Connelly) (JLS) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

14 #1

Michael E. Unke Itemized Attorney Fees

#14

(#14) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Michael E. Unke Itemized Attorney Fees) (Unke, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

13 #8

Transcript of complete Motion Hearing September 14, 2018

13 #7

David Meyer Balance Sheet

13 #6

Remington, LLC appraisal letter

13 #5

Rawhide, LLC appraisal letter

13 #4

Windmill Ridge, LLC appraisal letter

13 #3

Magnum 43, LLC appraisal letter

13 #2

David Skoglund Deposition Exhibit 50 Information

13 #1

David Meyer Financial Plan

#13

(#13) REPLY to Motion Response re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 David Meyer Financial Plan, #2 David Skoglund Deposition Exhibit 50 Information, #3 Magnum 43, LLC appraisal letter, #4 Windmill Ridge, LLC appraisal letter, #5 Rawhide, LLC appraisal letter, #6 Remington, LLC appraisal letter, #7 David Meyer Balance Sheet, #8 Transcript of complete Motion Hearing September 14, 2018) (Unke, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

12 #2

Certified Letter September 15, 2017 to Defendants

12 #1

Order After Hearing Held September 14, 2018

#12

(#12) REPLY to Motion Response re #4 MOTION for Hearing Expedited filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Order After Hearing Held September 14, 2018, #2 Certified Letter September 15, 2017 to Defendants) (Unke, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Hearing Expedited by Mark A. Huls, Catherine M. Peterson, Steven E. Peterson, David L. Skoglund. (Unke, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions by Mark A. Huls, Catherine M. Peterson, Steven E. Peterson, David L. Skoglund. (Unke, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting plaintiff's #3 Motion to Remand and denying plaintiff's motion for attorney fees and sanctions. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/25/2018. (SAC) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2018 re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by Steven E. Peterson, David L. Skoglund, Mark A. Huls, Catherine M. Peterson before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. (Court Reporter: Jill Connelly) (JLS) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Michael E. Unke Itemized Attorney Fees) (Unke, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPLY to Motion Response re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 David Meyer Financial Plan, #2 David Skoglund Deposition Exhibit 50 Information, #3 Magnum 43, LLC appraisal letter, #4 Windmill Ridge, LLC appraisal letter, #5 Rawhide, LLC appraisal letter, #6 Remington, LLC appraisal letter, #7 David Meyer Balance Sheet, #8 Transcript of complete Motion Hearing September 14, 2018) (Unke, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to Motion Response re #4 MOTION for Hearing Expedited filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Order After Hearing Held September 14, 2018, #2 Certified Letter September 15, 2017 to Defendants) (Unke, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion Hearing re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court set for 10/22/2018 at 01:00 PM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 2* before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/16/18. (JLS) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE EXPEDITED REPLY. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/16/18. (DJP) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to #4 Motion for Hearing filed by All Defendants. (Rahn, Timothy) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by All Defendants. (Rahn, Timothy) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants. (Rahn, Timothy) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS TO FILE AN EXPEDITED RESPONSE. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/10/18. (DJP) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions, #4 MOTION for Hearing Expedited filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Original Complaint, #2 Answer & Counterclaim, #3 Verified Amended Complaint, #4 Order After Hearing Held September 14, 2018) (Unke, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Hearing Expedited by Mark A. Huls, Catherine M. Peterson, Steven E. Peterson, David L. Skoglund. (Unke, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Remand to McCook County Circuit Court For Attorney Fees and Sanctions by Mark A. Huls, Catherine M. Peterson, Steven E. Peterson, David L. Skoglund. (Unke, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Filing Fee Received from David M. Meyer, Nancy R. Meyer. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2885309. (JLS) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial Circuit Court in McCook County, South Dakota, case number 44CIV18-000004. Filed in shell case on 9/27/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons, #2 Exhibit 2-Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3-Sheriff's Return of Personal Service, #4 Exhibit 4- Answer and Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit 5-Reply to Counterclaim, #6 Exhibit 6-Certificate of Service, #7 Exhibit 7- Certificate of Service, #8 Exhibit 8- Certificate of Service, #9 Exhibit 9- Motion to Compel, #10 Exhibit 10- Motion to Establish a Scheduling Order and Other Further Relief, #11 Exhibit 11- Affidavit of M. Unke, #12 Exhibit 12- Notice of Motions Hearing, #13 Exhibit 13- Exhibit 1 filed at Motions Hearing, #14 Exhibit 14- Exhibit 1 Volume 2 filed at Motions Hearing, #15 Exhibit 15- Order denied, #16 Exhibit 16- Order, #17 Exhibit 17- Notice of Entry, #18 Exhibit 18- Notice of Deposition of D. Meyer, #19 Exhibit 19- Notice of Deposition of M. Huls, #20 Exhibit 20- Notice of Deposition of S. Peterson, #21 Exhibit 21- Notice of Deposition of D. Skoglund, #22 Exhibit 22- Notice of Deposition of J. Grady, #23 Exhibit 23-Notice of Deposition of K.Blagg, #24 Exhibit 24- Motion to Amend Complaint, #25 Exhibit 25- Brief in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint, #26 Exhibit 26- Notice of Hearing, #27 Exhibit 27- Motion for Trial Date, #28 Exhibit 28- Motion to Find Defendants in Contempt of Court, #29 Exhibit 29- Affidavit of M. Unke, #30 Exhibit 30- Notice of Hearing, #31 Exhibit 31- Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to find Defendants in Contempt of Court, #32 Exhibit 32- Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs motion to amend complaint, #33 Exhibit 33- Affidavit for Attorneys Fees, #34 Exhibit 34- Veryified Amended Complaint, #35 Exhibit 35- Order After Hearing Held September 14,2018, #36 Exhibit 36- Deposition Transcript, #37 Exhibit 37- Lease Agreement)(JLS) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less