This case was last updated from PACER on 05/02/2018 at 05:58:41 (UTC).

Huff v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2018 Huff filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00299

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Addie Huff

Defendants

Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

McKesson Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laurel Li Harris

Attorney at Porter & Malouf, P.A.

825 Ridgewood Road, P.O. Box 12768

Jackson, MS 39236-2768

Randi Alyson Kassan

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Timothy W. Porter

Attorney at Porter & Malouf, P.A.

825 Ridgewood Road, P.O. Box 12768

Jackson, MS 39236-2768

Patrick C. Malouf

Attorney at Porter & Malouf, P.A.

825 Ridgewood Road, P.O. Box 12768

Jackson, MS 39236-2768

 

Court Documents

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona. Case number 2:18-cv-01036. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet & 2809 ECF form to non-registered filers (Entered: 05/01/2018)

#7

(#7) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-11) Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Kentucky Re MDL-2809. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2018)

5 #2

Summons

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (Kassan, Randi) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15343000. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Holland H Russell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 2:CV-18-01036-PHX-HRH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Addie Huff. (Kassan, Randi) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO) [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15343000 filed by Addie Huff. (Kassan, Randi) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (CBD) (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona. Case number 2:18-cv-01036. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet & 2809 ECF form to non-registered filers (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Case Transferred to the Eastern District of Kentucky via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-11) Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Kentucky Re MDL-2809. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Addie Huff. Document not in compliance with LRCiv LRCiv 7.1(a)(1). No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO) [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (Kassan, Randi) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15343000. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Holland H Russell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 2:CV-18-01036-PHX-HRH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Addie Huff. (Kassan, Randi) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO) [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15343000 filed by Addie Huff. (Kassan, Randi) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) [Transferred from azd on 5/1/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less